Hilton Resorts Corporation v. Resorts Legal Team, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-02415-APG-NJK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 9, 2019 at 3:16 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 19 Motion to Dismiss (Second Request). Responses due by 12/21/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Hold FRCP 26(f) Conference and Submit proposed Stipulation Scheduling Order (First Request). Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 19 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 12/7/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 0 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?