Think Computer Foundation v. Free Law Project
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HS19010259

Tags
Last Updated July 1, 2019 at 3:31 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Case Summary (Last Edited by Aaron Greenspan)

Think Computer Foundation sued the Free Law Project in small claims court for the return of a $5,000 donation from 2014 that was conditioned upon proper recognition and involvement with the RECAP court document transparency project. Free Law Project Director Mike Lissner never completed the planned Internet Explorer version of the RECAP plug-in, removed functionality from the existing Firefox plug-in, and in 2017 unilaterally cut off access to RECAP metadata unless bulk users agreed to pay an arbitrary, undisclosed, unwritten price—something that might have been avoided had Think Computer Foundation been involved on an ongoing basis. In 2019, Lissner publicly and falsely stated, "PlainSite refuses to support us at any level," ignoring $15,000 in total contributions to the RECAP project, $10,000 of which were additionally matched by Princeton University. The sudden revocation of access to RECAP contributed to another site's decision to shut down. The Free Law Project refused several attempts to settle the dispute. Ultimately, Judge Karin Schwartz decided that the written contract did not explicitly require the Free Law Project to make the law available for free.
Think Computer Foundation Think Computer Foundation, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Free Law Project, Defendant
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Claim of Plaintiff
Case Subtype Small Claims
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Judgment Entered (4 Pages)
    Blank 17 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Small Claims Court Trial Judgment for Defendant on Claim of Plaintiff
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 15 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed
          Blank 14 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 12 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 06/25/2019 09:00 AM D- 512
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Hearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 06/25/2019 09:00 AM D- 511 (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Request Re: Postponement Granted (1 Page)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 06/13/2019 09:00 AM D- 519
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Request Re: Postponement Filed for Free Law Project (3 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Hearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 06/13/2019 09:00 AM D- 511 (1 Page)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Request Re: Postponement Granted (1 Page)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Request Re: Postponement Filed for Think Computer Foundation (2 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed (1 Page)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 3 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Small Claims Court Trial 05/28/2019 01:30 PM D- 511
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Claim of Plaintiff Filed (11 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Claim of Plaintiff Filed (11 Pages)

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 4,802 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?