United States v. Moore
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00797
District Judge Michael H. Simon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2019 at 1:42 PM ST (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeremy N Hendon +1 202 353 2466 +1 202 307 0054 Jeremy.Hendon@usdoj.gov
Space Jeremy N Hendon +1 202 353 2466 +1 202 307 0054 Jeremy.Hendon@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Casa Del Cedro Condominium Homeowners Association, Defendant
No Logo Joy M. Moore, Defendant
No Logo Kathryn Lynn Lewis, Defendant
No Logo Multnomah County, Defendant
No Logo Portland General Electric, Defendant
No Logo State of Oregon Department of Human Resources, Defendant
No Logo State of Oregon Department of Human Services, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7403
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Deposit Funds
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Deposit Funds
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER - The Government's Motion for Entry of Default (ECF 12 ) is GRANTED. Default is entered against Joy M. Moore aka Joy M. Lewis, Multnomah County, Portland General Electric Company, Casa Del Cedro Condominium Homeowners Association, State of Oregon Department of Human Resources, and Kathryn Lynn Lewis. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding # 12 Motion for default. The PDF attached to this entry at filing was incorrect. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (eo) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Declaration of Jeremy N. Hendon . Filed by United States of America. (Related document(s): Motion for default, 12 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Hendon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Motion for Entry of Default Joy M. Moore aka Joy M. Lewis, Multnomah County, Portland General Electric Company, Casa Del Cedro Condominium Homeowners Association, State of Oregon Department of Human Resources, and Kathryn Lynn Lewis. Filed by United States of America. (Hendon, Jeremy) (Main Document 12 replaced on 8/1/2018) (eo). (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Portland General Electric waiver sent on 5/10/2018. Filed by United States of America. (Hendon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Multnomah County waiver sent on 5/10/2018. Filed by United States of America. (Hendon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by State of Oregon Department of Human Resources waiver sent on 5/10/2018. Filed by United States of America. (Hendon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Casa Del Cedro Condominium Homeowners Association waiver sent on 5/10/2018. Filed by United States of America. (Hendon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Affidavit of Service upon Kathryn Lynn Lewis served on 6/4/2018 Filed by United States of America. (Hendon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Affidavit of Service upon Joy M. Moore served on 5/14/2018 Filed by United States of America. (Hendon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Summons Issued Electronically as to Casa Del Cedro Condominium Homeowners Association, Kathryn Lynn Lewis, Joy M. Moore, Multnomah County, Portland General Electric, State of Oregon Department of Human Resources. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None
                                    First Amended Complaint to Foreclose Federal Tax Liens on Real Property. Filed by United States of America against All Defendants. (Hendon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/6/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/9/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 10/9/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jtj) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Notice of Lis Pendens by United States of America Filed by United States of America. (Hendon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                          Complaint. to Foreclose Federal Tax Liens on Real Property (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Joy M. Moore aka Joy M. Lewis, # 3 Proposed Summons Multnomah County, # 4 Proposed Summons Portland General Electric, # 5 Proposed Summons Casa Del Cedro Condominium Homeowners Association, # 6 Proposed Summons State of Oregon Department of Human Services, # 7 Proposed Summons State of Oregon, Attorney General, # 8 Proposed Summons Kathryn Lynn Lewis). (Hendon, Jeremy) Modified docket text to reflect Complaint caption parties on 5/9/2018 (jtj). (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?