Caluag v. Johnson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-00356
District Judge Michael Seabright, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 10, 2019 at 3:37 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nadine A. Caluag, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dillingham Transportation Bldg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William Fenton Sink
v.
No Logo Arbor Systems, Group Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Topa Financial Center Bishop St Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Newton J. Chu +1 808 961 0406

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Vaughn G.T. Cook vcook@torkildson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tamara M. Gerrard +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 tmg@torkildson.com
No Logo Charles A. Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Topa Financial Center Bishop St Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Newton J. Chu +1 808 961 0406

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Vaughn G.T. Cook vcook@torkildson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tamara M. Gerrard +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 tmg@torkildson.com
No Logo DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Doe Partnerships 1-10, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Mary Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Other Entities 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Thomas W. Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Topa Financial Center Bishop St Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Newton J. Chu +1 808 961 0406

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Vaughn G.T. Cook vcook@torkildson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tamara M. Gerrard +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 tmg@torkildson.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TRANSMITTAL of Stipulation for Remand and DOCUMENTS to the Circuit Court for the Third Court (Kona Division), State of Hawaii (gls, ) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION For Remand of Civil Action From Federal Court to State Court. Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/25/09. (gls, )No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 08/28/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      EP: Status Conference held on 8/12/2009. Parties have one week to file stipulation to remand to state court. (Court Reporter Gloria Bediamol.) (JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(edm, )No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 08/12/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        EO: Status Conference set for 8/12/2009 09:00 AM before JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(edm, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 08/11/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER to Complaint by Charles A. Johnson.(Gerrard, Tamara) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER to Complaint by Arbor Systems, Group Inc., Thomas W. Johnson.(Gerrard, Tamara) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 248447 (gls, ) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 11/2/2009 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG.. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/3/09. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Memo)(gls, ) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arbor Systems, Group Inc., Charles A. Johnson, Thomas W. Johnson from Third Circuit Court (Kona), State of Hawaii, case number CV 09-1-0232K. ( Filing fee $ 350), filed by Arbor Systems, Group Inc., Charles A. Johnson, Thomas W. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(gls, ) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Space Space

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 5 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?