Harris v. CJ Star LLC an Idaho Limited Liability Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00247
District Judge Stanley A Bastian, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 9, 2019 at 11:25 PM EST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ashlie Harris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ackermann & Tilajef PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Craig Justin Ackermann +1 310 277 0614 +1 310 277 0635 cja@ackermanntilajef.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Denlinger +1 253 507 4619 bd@ackermanntilajef.com

Toggle Switch Represented by India Lin Bodien Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY India Lin Bodien +1 253 212 7913 india@indialinbodienlaw.com
v.
No Logo Carl's Jr. Restaurants LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert A Atkins +1 212 373 3183 +1 212 373 2225 ratkins@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam Jacob Bernstein +1 212 373 3297 +1 212 492 0297 abernstein@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel J. Howley +1 202 223 7372 +1 202 223 7420 dhowley@paulweiss.com
No Logo CJ Star LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael James Hines +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2490 mhines@lukins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reid Johnson +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 747 2323 rjohnson@lukins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly E Konkright +1 509 455 9555 kkonkright@lukins.com
No Logo Does 1 - 10, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Joinder
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
      NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 20 Response to Motion Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of her Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Bodien, India) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
        RESPONSE to Motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order ISO Response)(Bodien, India) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Joinder
          JOINDER re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CJ Star LLC. (Hines, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Carl's Jr Restaurants LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2019 at 02:00 PM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Defendant CJ Star LLC by CJ Star LLC. (Hines, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carl's Jr Restaurants LLC. (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re All Defendants. (Bodien, India) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Defendant Carl Jr. Restaurants, LLC's Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. 11, 12, and 13, are GRANTED. Adam J. Bernstein, Daniel J. Howley and Robert A. Atkins are hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Defendant's local counsel of record, Angelo Calfo, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW. THIS ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURTS RULING ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Robert A. Atkins. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2980688. by Carl's Jr Restaurants LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2018 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Daniel J. Howley. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2980677. by Carl's Jr Restaurants LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2018 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Adam J. Bernstein. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2980660. by Carl's Jr Restaurants LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2018 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Johnson on behalf of CJ Star LLC (Attorney Reid Johnson added to party CJ Star LLC(pty:dft))(Johnson, Reid) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E Konkright on behalf of CJ Star LLC (Attorney Kelly E Konkright added to party CJ Star LLC(pty:dft))(Konkright, Kelly) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Hines on behalf of CJ Star LLC (Attorney Michael James Hines added to party CJ Star LLC(pty:dft))(Hines, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER - The parties Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, ECF No. 6, is GRANTED. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to October 22, 2018. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW. THIS ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURTS RULING ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File AnswerCourt Filing
                                    Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Carl's Jr Restaurants LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Angelo J Calfo on behalf of Carl's Jr Restaurants LLC (Attorney Angelo J Calfo added to party Carl's Jr Restaurants LLC(pty:dft))(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to 2 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bodien, India) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. For reasons that are unnecessary to recite here, it has been determined that this case should be reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian for all further proceedings. The parties shall change the initials on the case number from TOR to SAB on all future pleadings to reflect this reassignment. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER / NO PDF DOCUMENT.(LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                            Summons Issued as to CJ Star LLC, Carl's Jr Restaurants LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Carl's Jr)(VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-2953928) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for CJ Star, # 2 Summons for Carl's Jr., # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bodien, India) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?