Marradi v. Strega Pizzeria & Cafe Corp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-12178
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 10, 2019 at 12:06 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Raoul Marradi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward N. Garno +1 978 687 7805 +1 978 688 8892 nedgarno@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shulby, Todd William

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd William Shulby +1 954 530 2236 +1 954 530 6628 tshulby@shulbylaw.com
v.
No Logo King Jade Realty LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by fordlawpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter B. Morin +1 781 985 0789 pmorin@fordlawpc.com
No Logo Strega Pizzeria & Cafe Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by fordlawpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter B. Morin +1 781 985 0789 pmorin@fordlawpc.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1218(2)
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Raoul Marradi. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. The Court having been advised on March 13, 2018 that the above-entitled action has been settled; IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right of any party, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action within thirty (30) days if settlement is not consummated. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Settlement by Raoul Marradi (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING AND INSTRUCTION ORDER. The court adopts the deadlines in the joint statement # 13 . Please see the attached order for full information and session requirements. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Morin, Peter) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell added. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin no longer assigned to case. (adminn, ) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling 1/5/18 scheduling conference. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Cabell. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Peter B. Morin (Morin, Peter) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Strega Pizzeria & Cafe Corp. (Morin, Peter) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference is set for 1/5/2018 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: # 1 sample of scheduling order, # 2 standing order on motions for summary judgments)(Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by King Jade Realty LLC.(Morin, Peter) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed King Jade Realty LLC served on 11/9/2017, answer due 11/30/2017. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Strega Pizzeria & Cafe Corp.(Morin, Peter) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Todd W. Shulby. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Todd W. Shulby, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6880144 by Raoul Marradi. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Fla Bar Letter of Good Standing)(Garno, Edward) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 2/5/2018. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Summons Issued as to King Jade Realty LLC, Strega Pizzeria & Cafe Corp. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            COMPLAINT against King Jade Realty LLC, Strega Pizzeria & Cafe Corp Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6872298 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Raoul Marradi. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Garno, Edward) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?