SCHUCK, et al v. AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-05293-JHR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo K & S LEASING SERVICE, INC., Plaintiff
No Logo K & S LEASING, INC., Plaintiff
No Logo KENNETH G. SCHUCK, Plaintiff
No Logo KENNETH SCHUCK TRUCKING, INC., Plaintiff
No Logo K.s.t. Inc., Plaintiff
v.
Aetna, Inc. Aetna, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "AETNA LIFE AND CASUALTY GROUP"
No Logo AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE PLANS SERVICE OFFICES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Methfessel & Werbel, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARC L. DEMBLING +1 732 248 4200 dembling@methwerb.com
No Logo CENTRAL ANALYSIS BUREAU, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schindel Farman & Lipsius LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurence Jay Rabinovich +1 212 563 1710 +1 212 695 6602 larryr@sfl-legal.com
No Logo CHARLES LANGNER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo IRA LIPSIUS, Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY"
No Logo New Hampshire Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo PAUL ARNOLD ASSOCIATES, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD D. CATENACCI +1 973 535 0500 rcatenacci@connellfoley.com
No Logo PAUL GOLDMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD D. CATENACCI +1 973 535 0500 rcatenacci@connellfoley.com
Progressive Progressive, Defendant
Officially listed as "PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE GROUP"
No Logo RAYMOND A. URSIN, Defendant
No Logo Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "SCHNADER, HARRISON, SEGAL & LEWIS"
No Logo THE DILK'S INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo THE FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANIES, Defendant
No Logo Travelers Indemnity Company, Defendant
Office Camden
Filed 10/10/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Camden
Terminated 9/9/1996
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 95cv3553(DHH)[E.D.P.A.]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 51 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER amending Order of 9/4/96 to reflect party defendants listed ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (femp)
    LREF
    Blank 50 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [47-1] motion to dismiss terminating [47-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 5/17/96 on [47 -1] motion terminating [49-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/16/96 on [45-1] motion granting [45-1] motion to dismiss Counts I, II, III, IV, V, VI, VII of Amended Complaint granting [44-1] motion to dismiss terminating [44-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/16/96 on [44-1] motion granting [43-1] motion to dismiss Amended Complaint terminating [43-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 4/4/96 on [43-1] motion ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (femp)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 Terminated Case
      Case closed (femp)
        LREF
        Blank 49 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/8/1996 Stipulation
        STIPULATION of Dismissal as to defts. The Cashan Agency and Paul Miola, with prejudice (femp) Modified on 08/13/1996
          LREF
          Blank 48 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/25/1996 Remark
          Rule 12G Statement (femp) Modified on 08/13/1996
            LREF
            Blank 47 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/25/1996, Terminated: 9/9/1996 Motion to Dismiss
            Notice of MOTION to dismiss by PAUL ARNOLD ASSOCIAT, PAUL GOLDMAN, Motion hearing set for 9:30 5/17/96 on [47 -1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (femp) Modified on 08/14/1996
              LREF
              Blank 46 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: 3/18/1996 Response in Opposition to Motion
              RESPONSE by KENNETH G. SCHUCK, KENNETH SCHUCK, K & S LEASING, INC., KST, INC. in opposition to [43-1] motion to dismiss Amended Complaint (femp) Modified on 08/13/1996
                LREF
                Blank 45 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996 Motion to Dismiss
                Notice of MOTION to dismiss Counts I, II, III, IV, V, VI, VII of Amended Complaint by CENTRAL ANALYSIS, Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/16/96 on [45-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (femp) Modified on 08/14/1996
                  LREF
                  Blank 44 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996 Motion to Dismiss
                  Notice of MOTION to dismiss by IRA LIPSIUS, Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/16/96 on [44-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (femp) Modified on 08/14/1996
                    LREF
                    Blank 43 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996 Motion to Dismiss
                    Notice of MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint by AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY, THE FIREMAN'S FUND, AETNA LIFE, NEW HAMPSHIRE, LAWRENCE IACOI Motion hearing set for 9:30 4/4/96 on [43-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (femp) Modified on 03/11/1996
                      LREF
                      Blank 42 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/7/1996 Response to Motion
                      PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER to defendants' Motion to dismiss Amended Complaint. (lc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 41 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 Response to Motion
                        PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO IRA S. LIPSIUS'S LETTER MOTION. (lc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 40 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: 1/26/1996 Order
                          ORDER granting [35-1] motion for William M. Hannay, Joseph A. Cancila, Jr., Heidi Dalenberg and David F. Jacobs to appear pro hac vice terminating [35-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 1/19/96 on [35-1] motion ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 39 Filed: 1/24/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                            Minute entry: Minutes of: 1/19/96; The following actions were taken, granting [35-1] motion for William M. Hannay, Joseph A. Cancila, Jr., Heidi Dalenberg and David F. Jacobs to appear pro hac vice By Magistrate Joel B. Rosen (femp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 38 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/2/1996 Amended Complaint
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT (femp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 36 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/15/1995 Affidavit
                                AFFIDAVIT of David F. Jacobs Re: [35-1] motion for William M. Hannay, Joseph A. Cancila, Jr., Heidi Dalenberg and David F. Jacobs to appear pro hac vice (femp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 35 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/15/1995, Terminated: 1/24/1996 Motion for Limited Admission
                                  Notice of MOTION for William M. Hannay, Joseph A. Cancila, Jr., Heidi Dalenberg and David F. Jacobs to appear pro hac vice by AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE, LAWRENCE IACOI, RAYMOND A. URSIN [35-1] motion referred to Magistrate Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 9:30 1/19/96 on [35-1] motion . (femp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 34 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Scheduling Order
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER I ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 33 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Order
                                      ORDER, consolidating civ. 95-5293 and 92-1369 FOR DISCOVERY ONLY ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 32 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Substitution of Attorney
                                        Substitute attorney for THE DILK'S INSURANCE, CHARLES LANGNER ; Added, WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE (femp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 11/28/1995 Scheduling Conference
                                          Scheduling conference held before Magistrate Joel B. Rosen on 11/22/95. (femp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 31 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of attorney appearance for defendants Paul Arnold Associates, Inc. and Paul Goldman by RICHARD D. CATENACCI, Esquire. (ar1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 30 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of attorney appearance for CENTRAL ANALYSIS by LAURENCE J. RABINOVICH (femp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 29 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995 Stipulation
                                                STIPULATION dismissing all claims against the Cashan Agency and Paul Miola, with prejudice (femp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Order
                                                  ORDER, set scheduling conference for 9:30 11/22/95 ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                    NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (ar1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                      Letter advising all counsel of the need for parties to obtain local counsel. (ar1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                        ORDER, THAT DEFENDANTS' UNCONTESTED MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK SHALL TRANSFER THE COURT'S FILE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TRANSFER STIPULATION, DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS FROM THE DATE NOTICE IS GIVEN BY THE CLERK OF THE COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY THAT TRANSFER OF THIS ACTION HAS OCCURRED TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. PENDING MOTIONS SHALL BE DECIDED BY THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. (SIGNED BY JUDGE DANIEL H. HUYETT 3rd), 9/28/95 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 9/27/95. (ar1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                          Joint supplemental memorandum by DEFENDANTS, AIPSO, PENNSYLVANIA ASSIGNED RISK PLAN, NEW JERSEY AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE PLAN, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, ALAN M. LIEBERMAN, ESQUIRE, SCHNADER, HARRISON, SEGAL & LEWIS, INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, RAYMOND A. URSIN, THE FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANIES, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE GROUP, THE AETNA AND LAWRENCE IACOI, ESQUIRE in support of MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), certificate of service; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 9/27/95. (ar1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                            Answer by PLAINTIFFS to DEFENDNATS, THE CASHAN AGENCY AND PAUL MIOLA'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b) (6), memorandum, certificate of service; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 9/8/95. (ar1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER, THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANTS PAUL ARNOLD ASSOCIATES, INC. AND PAUL GOLDMAN MAY ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT BE AND THE SAME IS HEREBY EXTENDED FOR A PERIOD OF THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. (SIGNED BY JUDGE CLIFFORD S. GREEN), 8/25/95 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 8/24/95. (ar1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                MOTION BY DEFENDANT THE CASHAN AGENCY, DEFENDANT PAUL MIOLA TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12 (b) (6), MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 8/23/95. (ar1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER, THAT THE TIME ALLOWED FOR DEFENDNATS TO FILE THEIR ANSWERS OR OTHER RESPONSES, INCLUDING MOTIONS UNDER FED.R.CIV.PROC. 12, TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED IS HEREBY ENLARGED. RESPONSES SHALL BE NOT BE DUE UNTIL THE 30TH DAY AFTER THE DATE THE COURT ENTERS AN ORDER DISPOSING OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. (SIGNED BY JUDGE DANIEL H. HUYETT 3RD), 8/18/95 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 8/18/95. (ar1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                    Answer by PLAINTIFFS to DEFENDNANTS THE DILK'S AGAENCY, INC. AND CHARLES LANGNER SR.'S MOTION TO DISMISS T PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b) (6), certificate of service; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 8/9/95. (ar1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                      Memorandum of law by DEFENDANT AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE PLAN SERVICES, ET AL. in support of their MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); Filed in E.D.P.A. on 8/7/95. (ar1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                        MOTION BY DEFENDANT AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE PLANS SERVICES, DEFENDNAT LAWRENCE IACOI, DEFENDANT PENNSYLVANIAA ASSIGNED RISK PLAN, DEFENDNAT NEW JERSEY AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE PLAN, DEFENDANT RAYMOND A. URSIN, DEFENDANT TRAVELERS IDEMNITY COMPANY, DEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, DEFENDANT THE FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANIES, DEFENDANT IDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, DEFENDANT PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE GROUP, DEFENDANT NEW HAMPSHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, DEFENDANT AETNA LIFE AND SURETY COMPANY TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Filed in E.D.P.A. 8/7/95. COMPANY (ar1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                          MOTION BY DEFENDANT THE DILK'S INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., DEFENDNAT CHARLES LANGER SR. TO DISMISS T PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b) (6), BRIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 8/1/95. (ar1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                            Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to DEFENDANT AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE PLANS SERVICE OFFICES on 6/9/95; Answer due on 8/8/95 for AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE PLANS SERVICES OFFICES; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/31/95. (ar1)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                              Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to DEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (signed by William F. Cupelo) on 6/9/95; Answer due on 8/8/95 for LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/24/95. (ar1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                Answer by PLAINTIFFS TO DEFENDANT CENTRAL ANALYSIS BUREAU'S MOTION TO DISMISS, memorandum, certificate of service; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/24/95. (ar1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                  Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to DEFENDANT NEW HAMPSHIRE INSURANCE CO. on 6/9/95; Answer due on 8/8/95 for NEW HAMPSHIRE INSURANCE CO; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/19/95. (ar1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                    Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to DEFENDANT PROGRESSIVE MOTOR CARRIER DIVISION on 6/9/95; Answer due on 8/8/95 for PROGRESSIVE MOTOR CARRIER DIVISION; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/19/95. (ar1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                      Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to DEFENDANT THE FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY on 6/9/95; Answer due on 8/8/95 for THE FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/19/95. (ar1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                        Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to DEFENDNAT AETNA LIFE AND CASUALTY GROUP on 6/9/95; Answer due on 8/8/95 for AETAN LIFE AND CASUALTY GROUP; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/19/95. (ar1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                          Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to DEFENDANT IDEMNITY INSURANCE, DEFENDANT RAYMOND A. URSIN, DEFENDANT TRAVELERS IDEMNITY, DEFENDANT CHARLES LANGER SR., DEFENDANT PAUL GOLDMAN on 6/9/95; Answer due on 8/8/95 for IDEMNITY INSURANCE, for RAYMOND A. URSIN, for TRAVELERS IDEMNITY, for CHARLES LANGER, SR., for PAUL GOLDMAN; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/11/95. (ar1)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                            Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to DEFENDANT P PENNSYLVANIA ASSIGNED RISK PLAN on 6/9/95; Answer due on 8/8/95 for PENNSYLVANIA ASSIGNED RISK PLAN; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/11/95. (ar1)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                              Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to DEFENDANT SCHNADER, HARRISON, SEGAL & LEWIS on 6/9/95; Answer due on 8/8/95 for SCHNADER, HARRISON, SEGAL & LEWIS; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/11/95. (ar1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                                Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to DEFENDANT ALAN M. LIEBERMAN on 6/9/95; Answer due on 8/8/95 for DEFENDANT ALAN M. LIEBERMAN; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/11/95. (ar1)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                                  Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to DEFENDANT LAWRENCE IACOI on 6/9/95; Answer due on 8/8/95 for LAWRENCE IACOI; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/11/95. (ar1)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                                    Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to DEFENDANT AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE PALNS SERVICE OFFICERS on 6/9/95; Answer due on 8/8/95 for AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE PLANS SERVICE OFFICERS; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/11/95. (ar1)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                                      MOTION by DEFENDANT CENTRAL ANALYSIS TO DISMISS, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/3/95. (ar1)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                                        Appearance of JOHN J. SPEICHER for DEFENDANT CENTRAL ANALYSIS; jury demand; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 7/3/95. (ar1)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                                          Complaint. filing fee $ 120.00; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 6/6/95. (ar1)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER, transferring case from E.D.P.A. to the district of New Jersey (Signed by Judge Daniel H. Huyett 3rd) (ar1)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                                              Filing Fee Paid; filing fee $120.00 receipt #558943; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 6/6/95. (ar1)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                Standard Case Management Track; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 6/6/95. (ar1)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                  Demand for jury trial by PLAINTIFF KENNETH G. SCHUCK, PLAINTIFF KENNETH SCHUCK TRUCK, PLAINTIFF K&S LEASING, INC., PLAINTIFF K&S LEASING SERVICE, PLAINTIFF KST, INC; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 6/6/95. (ar1)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                    Summons (es) issued Forwarded to: counsel 6/7/95; Filed in E.D.P.A. on 6/6/95. (ar1)
                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?