DERIPASKA v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-00727-APM
District Judge Amit P. Mehta, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 6, 2021 at 6:17 PM DT (2.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Deripaska, Oleg V., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "OLEG DERIPASKA"

Toggle Switch Represented by FERRARI LEGAL, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erich Christopher Ferrari +1 202 280 6370 +1 877 448 4885 ferrari@ferrariassociatespc.com
v.
No Logo ANDREA M. GACKI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas P. Cartier +1 202 616 8351 nicholas.cartier@usdoj.gov
Mnuchin, Steven Mnuchin, Steven, Defendant
Officially listed as "STEVEN T. MNUCHIN"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas P. Cartier +1 202 616 8351 nicholas.cartier@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas P. Cartier +1 202 616 8351 nicholas.cartier@usdoj.gov
No Logo UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas P. Cartier +1 202 616 8351 nicholas.cartier@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/15/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE-E
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Joint Appendix
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendant's Notice of Withdrawal of Opposition and the parties' Joint Request to File Status Report, the December 9, 2019 Status Conference is hereby vacated, and the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by February 19, 2020. Further consideration of the Pending Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment is hereby stayed until further order of the court. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/6/2019. (lcapm1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Notice - other
                                          NOTICE of Defendants Withdrawal of Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading and Joint Request to File Status Report within 75 Days in Lieu of December 9, 2019 Status Conference by ANDREA M. GACKI, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Notice of hearing
                                              NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [16] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading filed by OLEG DERIPASKA. (Ferrari, Erich)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [16] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading filed by ANDREA M. GACKI, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL. (Cartier, Nicholas)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re [11] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by OLEG DERIPASKA. (Ferrari, Erich)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 motion for leave to file
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading by OLEG DERIPASKA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit)(Ferrari, Erich)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [9] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ANDREA M. GACKI, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL. (Cartier, Nicholas)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [11] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ANDREA M. GACKI, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL. (Cartier, Nicholas)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Reply and Opposition due by 10/11/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/11/2019.(zjd)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [13] Defendants' Unopposed Extension Motion. Defendants' Reply and Opposition shall be due on or before October 11, 2019; Plaintiff's Reply shall be due on or before November 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/03/2019. (lcapm1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019, Terminated: 10/3/2019 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to by ANDREA M. GACKI, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Reply and Opposition due by 10/8/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/6/2019. (zjd)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [12] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion shall be due on or before October 8, 2019; Plaintiff's Reply shall be due on or before November 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/25/2019. (lcapm1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019, Terminated: 9/25/2019 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply Brief by ANDREA M. GACKI, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/2/2019, Entered: 9/2/2019 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                    Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by OLEG DERIPASKA (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Erich)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/2/2019, Entered: 9/2/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [9] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by OLEG DERIPASKA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Erich)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: 8/2/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by ANDREA M. GACKI, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 8/6/2019 (zjf).
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: 7/12/2019, Terminated: 7/12/2019 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file combined Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment by ANDREA M. GACKI, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Responsive Pleading due by 8/2/2019. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/2/2019. Defendants' Reply and Opposition due by 10/1/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 10/30/2019. (zjd)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [8] Defendants' Unopposed Extension Motion. Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be due on or before August 2, 2019; Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Combined Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before September 2, 2019; Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Reply shall be due on or before October 1, 2019; Plaintiff's Reply shall be due on orbefore October 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/12/2019. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: 6/20/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by OLEG DERIPASKA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Ferrari, Erich)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Record by ANDREA M. GACKI, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Administrative Record)(Cartier, Nicholas)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Certified List of Contents of Administrative Record by ANDREA M. GACKI, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL (Attachments: # (1) Certified Index of Administrative Record)(Cartier, Nicholas)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Order on Motion for Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting Joint [3] Motion for Scheduling Order. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/16/2019. (lcapm1)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Administrative Record due by 5/21/2019. Plaintiff Amendment To The Complaint due by 6/20/2019. Defendants' Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due 7/19/2019. Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Combined Motion To Dismiss And Motion For Summary Judgment And Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 8/19/2019. Defendants Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment And Defendants Reply In Support Of Their Combined Motion To Dismiss And Motion For Summary Judgment due by 9/17/2019. Plaintiff's Reply Ibn Support Of His Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/16/2019. (mac)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: 5/15/2019, Terminated: 5/16/2019 Motion for Scheduling Order
                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: 3/18/2019 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                                                                            SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to ANDREA M. GACKI, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, and U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: # (1) Notice and Consent)(zef, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                              Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/15/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6003249) filed by OLEG DERIPASKA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Summons, # (3) Summons, # (4) Summons, # (5) Summons, # (6) Summons, # (7) Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferrari, Erich) (Attachment 7 replaced on 3/15/2019) (zef, ).
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?