City of Almaty, Kazakhstan et al v. Sater et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-02645-AJN-KHP
District Judge Alison J. Nathan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 14, 2021 at 2:31 PM DT (2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BTA Bank JSC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Lane Schwartz +1 212 446 2300 +1 212 446 2350 mlschwartz@bsfllp.com
No Logo City of Almaty, Kazakhstan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Lane Schwartz +1 212 446 2300 +1 212 446 2350 mlschwartz@bsfllp.com
v.
No Logo Bayrock Group, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Ridloff, Defendant
No Logo Sater, Felix H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Felix Sater"
No Logo Ferrari Holdings LLC (NJ), Defendant
No Logo Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo MeM Energy Partners LLC, Defendant
No Logo RRMI-DR LLC, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 3/25/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332fr Diversity-Fraud
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (347) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 10/14/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/14/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 10/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 10/12/2021, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/11/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Quash
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Brief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Ferrari's motion to dismiss is administratively denied without prejudice to re-filing should it enter an appearance in this case. It is further ORDERED that the Kazakh Entities notify the court by December 4, 2020, whether they intend to move for default judgment against any defendant at this time and, if so, a date by which they intend to do so. It is further ORDERED that the Kazakh Entities shall serve a copy of this Order on Ferrari and file an affidavit of service on the public docket no later than December 4, 2020. This Order resolves Docket Numbers 99 and 141. SO ORDERED. Denying without prejudice to renewal by formal motion [99] Motion to Dismiss; Denying without prejudice to renewal by formal motion [141] Motion to Dismiss. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/30/2020) (rjm)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 244 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                    OPINION AND ORDER. The Court GRANTS the Sater Defendants' motion to dismiss as to the Kazakh Entities' claims for fraud and unlawful means conspiracy, and it dismisses those claims with prejudice. The Court otherwise DENIES the motion. This resolves Docket Number 105. SO ORDERED. re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., Bayrock Group, Inc, Felix Sater. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/30/2020) (rjm)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Notice - other
                                                                                        NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The Case management teleconference in this matter scheduled for Monday, January 11, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. is only for case ****19CV2645-AJN-KHP**** Counsel is directed to call into Judge Parker's teleconference line at the scheduled time. Please dial: (868) 434-5269, Access code: 4858267 re: [242] Order.(ca)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: 11/24/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A telephonic settlement conference in this matter is scheduled for Wednesday, February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's court conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access code: 4858267. Corporate parties must send the person with decision making authority to settle the matter to the conference. The parties are instructed to complete the Settlement Conference Summary Report and prepare pre-conference submissions in accordance with the Judge Parker's Individual Rules of Practice. Pre-conference submissions must be received by the Court no later than February 17, 2021 by 5:00 p.m. ( Telephone Conference set for 2/24/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/24/2020) (mro)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Proposed Default Judgment
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: 11/24/2020 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [241] Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are also advised that there will be a Case management teleconference in this matter on Monday, January 11, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel is directed to call into Judge Parker's teleconference line at the scheduled time. Please dial: (868) 434-5269, Access code: 4858267 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/24/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 1/16/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Deposition due by 1/13/2021., Responses due by 12/18/2020), Set/Reset Hearings:( Telephone Conference set for 1/11/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (rro)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/16/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: 11/23/2020, Terminated: 11/24/2020 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Depose Felix Sater and for other relief addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Craig Wenner dated November 23, 2020. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/16/2021, Entered: None Proposed Default Judgment
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: 11/23/2020 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER denying as moot [145] LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections Pursuant to FRCP 72(a) addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jill Levi dated December 19, 2019. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. The request for an extension of time is DENIED as moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/23/2020) (rjm)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/16/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 239 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: 11/23/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall meet and confer regarding a schedule for document production and a new date for Sater's deposition and submit the schedule by 11/24/2020. If the parties cannot resolve their disputes on the scope of plaintiff's requests, plaintiffs shall file their motion to compel by 12/11/2020 and defendants shall file their reply by 12/16/2020. No replies. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/16/2021, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: telephonic Status Conference held on 11/23/2020. AT&T Conference Line. (ca)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/16/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice - other
                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO COUNSEL: REMINDER of the Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. The parties shall dial Judge Parker's posted AT&T number (866) 434-5269, Access code: 4858267. re: [220] Scheduling Order.(ca)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Craig Wenner dated November 18, 2020 re: Status update concerning the privilege review of documents produced by non-party Arnie Herz, Esq.. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 11/15/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [236] Letter, filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/15/2020) (mro)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/5/2021. Responses due by 1/26/2021 Replies due by 2/9/2021. (mro)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Craig Wenner dated November 13, 2020 re: Status update concerning a third-party subpoena issued to Moses & Singer LLP. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Letters Rogatory issued.
                                                                                                                                          LETTERS ROGATORY ISSUED on November 13, 2020, and picked up by Boies Schiller Flexner LLP, and to be served on Geneva Civil Court of the First Instance of the Swiss Confederation (2 letters rogatory issued).(km)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Part I Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/12/2020) (ama) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSED on LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Part I Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/12/2020) (ama) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [232] LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Craig Wenner dated November 11, 2020 re: Proposed Hague Request to Switzerland. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. ENDORSEMENT: The Kazakh Entities' request is hereby GRANTED for the reasons stated in this letter. The letters may be picked up from the Clerk's Office. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken, sitting in Part I on 11/12/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 11/11/2020, Entered: 11/11/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Craig Wenner dated November 11, 2020 re: Proposed Hague Request to Switzerland. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1).(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 11/8/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [230] Letter, filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/8/2020) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Craig Wenner dated November 6, 2020 re: Status update concerning a third-party subpoena issued to Moses & Singer LLP. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: 10/27/2020 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER from Diane Artal-Burger, re: I hereby revoke my consent to the Electronic Filing System, effective as of today, and request to be removed from the Electronic Filing System. Document filed by Diane Artal-Burger.(sc)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [226] Letter, filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/20/2020) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jill Levi dated October 20, 2020 re: Rule 3(H) of Individual Practices in Civil Cases. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater..(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/19/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Craig Wenner dated October 19, 2020 re: Status update concerning a third-party subpoena issued to Moses & Singer LLP. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/15/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Telephone Conference proceeding held on 10/7/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.(rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/15/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Telephone Conference held on 10/7/2020 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2021..(rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Felix Sater shall appear in his capacity as the corporate representative of Bayrock Group Inc. and Global Habitat Solutions, Inc. at their corporate deposition under Rule 30(b)(6) at 9:30 AM on October 29, 2020. Should the combined corporate deposition take fewer than sevenhours, Plaintiffs may begin the deposition of Mr. Sater in his individual capacity. 2. Felix Sater shall appear in his individual capacity for his deposition at 9:30 AM on November 30, 2020. 3. Nothing in this Order prevents any party from seeking further relief from the Court concerning the depositions of Bayrock Group Inc., Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., or Felix Sater. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/14/2020) (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [221] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. WHEREAS, the COVID-19 pandemic continues to make certain discovery efforts difficult; WHEREAS, while the parties have made progress in discovery in this complex matter, substantial discovery remains; WHEREAS, the parties agree that an extension of the current discovery deadlines is in the interest of the parties; WHEREAS, good cause exists to modify and extend the discovery schedule; It is ORDERED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b)(4), that all fact discovery shall be completed by April 2, 2021. All expert discovery shall be completed by August 6, 2021. Requests for admission shall be served by April 30, 2021. Responses thereto shall be due on May 28, 2021. Any final document requests and/or interrogatories shall be served by no later than March 1, 2021. All depositions shall be completed by April 2, 2021. Nothing in this Order modifies the deadlines previously set by the Court concerning the responses to third-party subpoenas issued to Arnie Herz, Esq., or Moses & Singer LLP. [ECF No. 219.] Nothing in this Order prevents the parties from seeking to further modify the pretrial schedule in this action in light of the COVID-19 pandemic (or for any other good cause). Prior to seeking such relief, the parties must, as always, meet and confer (via remote means) in a good faith effort to reach agreement on how best to fulfill the goals of Rule 1 while avoiding unnecessary health risks. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/14/2020) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 4/2/2021. Expert Discovery due by 8/6/2021. Fact Discovery due by 4/2/2021. (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: 10/13/2020, Terminated: 10/14/2020 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Craig Wenner dated October 13, 2020. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order 2).(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 220 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. The parties shall dial Judge Parker's posted AT&T number. Status Report due by 11/18/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: telephonic Status Conference held on 10/7/2020. AT&T Conference Line. (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO COUNSEL: REMINDER of the Telephonic Status Conference scheduled for 10/7/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Please call (866)434-5269, Access Code: 4858267 re: [213] Scheduling Order.(ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: granting [218] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/05/2020) (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: 10/2/2020, Terminated: 10/5/2020 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for entry of proposed schedule concerning the third-party subpoena issued to attorney Arnie Herz, Esq., addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Craig Wenner dated October 2, 2020. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (214 in 1:19-cv-02645-AJN-KHP) Letter, filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 9/22/2020) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Telephone Conference proceeding held on 8/20/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days..(rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Telephone Conference held on 8/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2020..(rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Craig Wenner dated September 21, 2020 re: Status update concerning subpoenas issued to non-parties Moses & Singer LLP and Arnie Herz, Esq.. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 213 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: 8/20/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. The parties should use Judge Parker's posted AT&T number. Status Report regarding subpoenas and privilege review due by 9/21/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Status Conference held on 8/20/2020. AT&T Conference Line. (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Letters Rogatory issued.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTERS ROGATORY ISSUED on August 7, 2020, and picked up by Boies Schiller Flexner LLP, and to be served to the Ministry of Justice of the French Republic. (2 originals signed, sealed and issued).(km)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Letters Rogatory issued.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTERS ROGATORY ISSUED on August 7, 2020, and picked up by Boies Schiller Flexner LLP, and to be served to the Ministry of Justice and Public Order of the Republic of Cyprus. (2 originals signed, sealed and issued).(km)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: 8/6/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS. This Court, in the spirit of comity and reciprocity, hereby requests international judicial assistance in the form of this Letter of Request seeking information, testimony, and things described herein, from the Ministry of Justice. This Court extends to all judicial and other authorities of the French Republic the assurances of its highest consideration. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/4/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: 8/6/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS. This Court, in the spirit of comity and reciprocity, hereby requests international judicial assistance in the form of this Letter of Request seeking information, documents, testimony, and things described herein, from the Ministry of Justice and Public Order. This Court extends to all judicial and other authorities of the Republic of Cyprus the assurances of its highest consideration. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/4/20) (yv) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: 8/4/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (208 in 1:19-cv-02645-AJN-KHP) Letter, filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. ENDORSEMENT: The Kazakh Entities' request is hereby GRANTED for the reasons stated in this letter. The letters may be picked up from the Clerk's Office. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/4/2020) (rro) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Craig Wenner dated July 31, 2020 re: Second status update regarding subpoenas served on Todd & Levi LLP and Moses & Singer LLP. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Craig Wenner dated July 31, 2020 re: Proposed Hague Requests to Cyprus and France. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2).(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Clerk's Certificate of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Ferrari Holdings LLC, issued July 16, 2020.(dt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Craig Wenner in Support re: [204] Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1).(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Deleted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document entry. Minute Entry Bill of Costs. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (dt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Craig Wenner to RE-FILE Document [205] Affirmation in Support,. Use the event type Declaration in Support of a Non-Motion found under the event list Other Answers. (dt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: 7/15/2020 Affirmation in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIRMATION of Craig Wenner in Support re: [204] Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1).(Wenner, Craig) Modified on 7/16/2020 (dt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: 7/15/2020 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Diane F. Artal-Burger consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Diane Artal-Burger.(sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a status conference proceeding held on 6/22/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.(rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: status conference held on 6/22/2020 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2020..(rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 200 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: 6/22/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER Telephone Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Dial in number 866-434-5269 code 4858267. Defendants request for a stay of discovery denied. All discovery deadlines extended 120 days. Ferrari Holdings did not appear for the conference and is reminded that the deadline has passed to substitute counsel. A corporate entity must be represented by counsel and cannot proceed pro se. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephonic Status Conference - AT&T Conference Line held on 6/22/2020. (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/21/2020, Entered: 6/21/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 06/21/2020 re: Response to 06/18/2020 Letter (ECF No. [198]). Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jill Levi dated June 18, 2020 re: Conference scheduled for June 22, 2020. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater..(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 197 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:The Court thanks the parties for the update. Another Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Craig Wenner dated June 15, 2020 re: Status update regarding subpoenas served on Todd & Levi LLP and Moses & Singer LLP [See Order at docket entry dated April 30, 2020]. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: 6/5/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/5/2020 re: status of in-default defendant MeM Energy Partners LLC. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPINION & ORDER ON MOTION TO QUASH re: [175] MOTION to Quash., [174] MOTION to Quash., [184] MOTION to Quash. For the reasons set forth above, Ms. Artal-Burger's motions to quash the subpoenas are denied. Ms. Artal-Burger shall make herself available for one day (seven hours) in June or July 2020 to be deposed in this action. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/28/2020) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED NON-WAIVER AGREEMENT AND ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502: During the Document Review, if counsel for any 502 Party discovers ("Discovering Counsel") that they have received or reviewed one or more Herz Documents that may contain another 502 Party's Privileged Material, Discovering Counsel shall promptly notify Herz and the counsel for the relevant 502 Party that such Herz Documents have been disclosed and identify the documents by Bates number(s). If counsel for the 502 Party to which the Privileged Material pertains agrees that the identified documents contain Privileged Material, such documents shall be returned to that 502 Party, who will then include such Herz Documents on a privilege log. No copies of the identified Privileged Material will be retained by Discovering Counsel or by counsel to any other 502 Party. The review by Discovering Counsel during the Document Review of any Privileged Material pertaining to another 502 Party shall not constitute or result in the waiver of any privilege applicable to the Privileged Material reviewed by Discovering Counsel; as further set set forth herein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/28/2020) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater..(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jill Levi dated May 27, 2020 re: Stipulation Pursuant to F.R.E. 502. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater..(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Status Conference held on 4/30/2020. (kgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order. A telephonic status call is scheduled for 6/22/2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Parker. To the extent there are issues relating to Plaintiffs subpoena on the law firm Moses & Singer, a representative from Moses & Singer is invited to attend. Defense counsel from Todd & Levi shall provide a copy of this order to Moses & Singer. The dial in number for the 6/22/2020 conference is 866-434-5269 code 4858267. The parties shall file a joint status letter by 6/15/2020 outlining any disputes concerning Plaintiffs subpoenas on Todd & Levi and Moses & Singer. Moses & Singer is invited to include its position as to the subpoena on it in the letter or to file a separate letter by 6/15/2020. The Court will address the subpoena disputes and a briefing schedule for motions pertaining to the subpoenas at the 6/22/2020 conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/17/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/17/2020 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Craig Wenner in Opposition re: [174] MOTION to Quash.. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11).(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [174] MOTION to Quash. . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Diane F. Artal-Burger consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Diane Artal-Burger. (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Diane Artal-Burger. (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DIANE ARTAL-BURGER'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS OR TO PERMIT INSPECTION OF PREMISES IN A CIVIL ACTION. (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Diane Artal-Burger. (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: 4/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: On April 3, 2020, Diane Artal-Burger filed a motion to quash. (Dkt. No. 175.) Opposition briefs, if any, are due by no later than April 24, 2020. There will be no reply. Plaintiffs are directed to serve a copy of this Order on Ms. Artal-Burger. ( Responses due by 4/24/2020) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/10/2020) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [169] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel to Defendant Ferrari Holdings, LLC, filed by Archer & Greiner. P.C. and the declarations in support thereof and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Rules of the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, it is hereby ORDERED that Archer & Greiner, P.C.'s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Ferrari Holdings, LLC is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Ferrari Holdings, LLC shall have 60 days to retain new counsel in this matter and, in light of the COIVD-19 pandemic, may apply for an extension of time if needed. Attorney Michael Stuart Horn and Michael Lauricella terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/9/2020) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 180 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. The Court thanks the parties for their letter dated April 7, 2020 regarding the Herz subpoena and adopts the proposed schedule. Any motion to compel/quash due 6/1/20; opposition due 6/15/20; reply due 6/30/2020. Plaintiffs counsel shall provide a copy of this order to Herz. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) Copies of Notice of Electronic Filing Mailed By Chambers. (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Craig Wenner dated April 7, 2020 re: Status update and proposed schedule regarding subpoena served on attorney Arnie Herz [see ECF No. 168]. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. [176] Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DIANE ARTAL-BURGER'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS OR TO PERMIT INSPECTION OF PREMISES IN A CIVIL ACTION re: [175] MOTION to Quash. Document filed by Diane Artal-Burger.(rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Diane Artal-Burger in Support re: [175] MOTION to Quash. Document filed by Diane Artal-Burger. (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DIANE ARTAL-BURGER'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS OR TO PERMIT INSPECTION OF PREMISES IN A CIVIL ACTION. Related Document Number: [175]. (rro) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. .
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DIANE ARTAL-BURGER'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS OR TO PERMIT INSPECTION OF PREMISES IN A CIVIL ACTION. Document filed by Diane Artal-Burger.(rro) Modified on 4/7/2020 (rro).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION TO QUASH. Document filed by Diane Artal-Burger. (rro) Modified on 4/7/2020 (rro).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Your Honor from Diane Artal-Burger dated 4/2/2020 re: please grant a two-week extension to the undersigned, Diane Artal-Burger, to file her motion to quash and ancillary documents. Document filed by Diane Artal-Burger. (rro) Modified on 4/7/2020 (rro).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 4/2/2020. (kgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: 3/30/2020 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Michael S. Horn, Esq. dated March 30, 2020 re: [169] MOTION for Michael S. Horn, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney . . Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC..(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 171 Filed: 3/28/2020, Entered: 3/28/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. The phone number for the ex parte phone call with Counsel for Ferrari Holdings and a representative from Ferrari Holdings on April 2, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. has changed. Counsel for Ferrari Holdings and the Ferrari Holdings representative shall call 866-434-5269 access code 4858267. The Court will email counsel for the parties a security code for the telephone conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: 3/26/2020 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated March 26, 2020 re: [169] MOTION for Michael S. Horn, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney . . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B).(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020, Terminated: 4/9/2020 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael S. Horn, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Ex Parte Declaration of Michael S. Horn in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Michael S. Horn, # (3) Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Michael S. Horn, # (4) Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Michael S. Horn, # (5) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # (6) Affidavit Affidavit of Service).(Horn, Michael) Modified on 4/10/2020 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 168 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Parties shall call 866-434-5269 code 4858267 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall meet and confer among themselves and also with subpoena recipients to narrow the scope of disputes about various subpoenas served by Plaintiffs. By April 7, 2020, the parties shall file a joint letter identifying the specific disputes regarding the scope of the subpoena served on attorney Herz and proposing a briefing schedule for motions to quash/compel. The parties shall ensure that attorney Herz and his clients can participate in such motion practice to the extent privileged communications are at issue. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/17/2020. (Court Reporter Paula Speer) (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: For the telephone conference scheduled for March 17, 2020 at 10:45 a.m., the parties should dial the following number: (866) 434-5269. The access code is: 4858267 (if prompted to put in security code, re-enter access code). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/16/2020) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: 3/16/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(3) and (b)(4), that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means, and may be recorded by any reliable audio or audiovisual means. This order does not dispense with the requirements set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(5), including the requirement that ("[u]nless the parties stipulate otherwise") the deposition be "conducted before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28," and that the deponent be placed under oath by that officer. In light of the current pandemic, the court reporter may attend the deposition and administer the oath via the same remote means (e.g., telephone conference call or video conference) used to connect all other remote participants, and so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. It is further ORDERED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4), that all unexpired deadlines for the completion of fact depositions, fact discovery, expert depositions, expert discovery, and/or all discovery are hereby EXTENDED for a period of 60 days, together with all post-discovery deadlines previously set by this Court. Nothing in this Order prevents the parties from seeking to further modify the pretrial schedule in this action in light of the COVID-19 pandemic (or for any other good cause). Prior to seeking such relief, the parties must, as always, meet and confer (via remote means) in a good faith effort to reach agreement on how best to fulfil the goals of Rule 1 while avoiding unnecessary health risks. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/16/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 3/12/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [162] Letter, filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. ENDORSEMENT: No pre-motion conference shall be required. Counsel for Ferrari Holdings shall file his application within 2 weeks from today and serve a copy on a client representative and file an affidavit of service. To the extent the application contains privileged information/client confidences, counsel may file a redacted application on the docket and email the unredacted application to Parker_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.com. To the extent any other party objects to counsel for Ferrari Holding's being permitted to withdraw, it shall file a letter on ECF within 2 weeks from today stating the reasons for the objection. Because the application involves client confidences, the Court will hold an ex parte telephone call with counsel for Ferrari Holdings and a representative from Ferrari Holdings on April 2, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for Ferrari Holdings shall call 212-805-0234 on that day and time with his client on the line. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/12/2020) (va)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 3/12/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: The Case Management Conference in this matter scheduled for Tuesday, March 17, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby rescheduled to Tuesday, March 17, 2020 at 10:45 a.m. and converted to a telephonic conference. Counsel for the parties are directed to set up a telephone conference line and email Judge Parker's Chambers with call-in information for the day of the conference. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/12/2020) (va)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order dated March 3, 2020 [ECF No. 161] served on MeM Energy Partners LLC on March 10, 2020. Service was accepted by Counsel to Mendel Mochkin, authorized agent. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Michael S. Horn, Esq. dated March 11, 2020 re: Request for a pre-motion conference for leave to file application to withdraw as counsel. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC..(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying as moot with leave to refile [68] Motion for Default Judgment. The Court therefore vacates the entry of default against MeM, Dkt. No. 58, as moot and denies Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment as moot with leave to refile. Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to serve a copy of this Order on MeM and file proof of service on the public docket. This resolves Dkt. No. 68. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/2/2020) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (159 in 1:19-cv-02645-AJN-KHP) Letter filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED: The Status Conference in this matter that is scheduled for Tuesday, March 10, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 is hereby rescheduled to Tuesday, March 17, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/27/2020) ( Status Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Michael S. Horn, Esq. dated February 25, 2020 re: request for adjournment of status conference. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC..(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (157 in 1:19-cv-02645-AJN-KHP) Letter filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for their letter. A case management conference is hereby scheduled for 3:30 p.m. on March 10, 2020. (Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/10/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated February 7, 2020 re: Discovery Status Update. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Case Management Conference proceeding held on 1/8/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.(rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Case Management Conference held on 1/8/2020 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2020.(rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: As discussed during the conference held on January 8, 2020, the motions to seal at Docket Numbers 103 and 108 are denied as moot. The parties shall file a joint status letter by February 7, 2020 advising the Court on the status of discovery and whether the parties wish to schedule a settlement conference. If the parties wish to schedule a settlement conference, they should also propose dates for the conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/10/2020) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying as moot [103] Motion to Seal Document ; denying as moot [108] Motion to Seal Document. As discussed during the conference held on January 8, 2020, the motions to seal at Docket Numbers 103 and 108 are denied as moot. The parties shall file a joint status letter by February 7, 2020 advising the Court on the status of discovery and whether the parties wish to schedule a settlement conference. If the parties wish to schedule a settlement conference, they should also propose dates for the conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/9/2020) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: 1/8/2020 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Matthew L. Schwartz in Opposition re: [146] Objection (non-motion). Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: 1/8/2020 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re: [146] Objection (non-motion) . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: 1/8/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Status Conference held on 1/8/2020 : See Transcript for Details. A transcript of this proceeding is available by utilizing the attached order form. (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: 12/27/2019 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [148] CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [146] Objection (non-motion). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/27/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: 12/27/2019, Terminated: 12/27/2019 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [146] Objection (non-motion) addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Matthew L. Schwartz dated December 27, 2019. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Objection to Magistrate's Opinion and Order on Motion to Stay. Document filed by Felix Sater. (Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Objection (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection Notice of Objection to Opinion and Order on Motion to Stay. Document filed by Felix Sater. (Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: 12/19/2019, Terminated: 11/23/2020 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections Pursuant to FRCP 72(a) addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jill Levi dated December 19, 2019. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater.(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPINION & ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY re: [77] MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration. filed by Felix Sater. For the reasons set forth above, Sater's motion to stay is denied. In denying the motion, the Court makes no comment as to the strength or validity of Sater's affirmative defense of release and waiver. That issue, if need be, will be decided later in this litigation. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motion at Doc. No. 77. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/6/2019) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael S. Horn, Esq. dated December 3, 2019 re: Courtesy Copies. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC.(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [141] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Service - Brief in Reply)(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019, Terminated: 11/30/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # (2) Brief in Support of Defendant Ferrari Holdings LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, # (3) Declaration of Michael S. Horn, # (4) Exhibit 1 - Complaint, # (5) Exhibit 2 - Transcript of Conference, # (6) Exhibit 3- July 8, 2019 Letter, # (7) Exhibit 4- First Amended Complaint, # (8) Exhibit 5 - Redline of First Amended Complaint, # (9) Declaration of Service)(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jill Levi dated December 3, 2019 re: Courtesy Binder of Dismissal Motion. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater.(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. (Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying as moot [85] Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Motion terminated as moot. (See Doc. No. 133.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/2/2019) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a STATUS CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/18/2019 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(kgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Mary Greco, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/23/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2020.(kgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jill Levi in Support re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. (Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 133 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Order on motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [74] Motion to Intervene for limited purpose of opposing motions to seal. Intervenor's motion to unseal granted in part as to documents referenced in ECF 111, 112, and 113 and denied in part as to Exhibit J filed at Docket No. 70. [74] Motion to seal Exhibit J to ECF 70 granted to the extent it is presently not relevant to any dispositive motion before the Court. To the extent Plaintiffs utilize the document in connection with any dispositive motion or trial, they shall file the document publicly or, alternatively, may move to seal based on the higher standard applicable for sealing of judicial documents. [130] (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker)(Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jill Levi dated November 25, 2019 re: Supplemental Memorandum of Law. Document filed by Felix Sater.(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [77] MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration. . Document filed by Felix Sater. (Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019, Terminated: 11/26/2019 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION to Seal Document [129] Declaration in Support of Motion,, under seal exhibits re-filed in response to ECF No. 113. addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 11/22/19. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Matthew L. Schwartz in Support re: [68] MOTION for Default Judgment as to MeM Energy Partners LLC.. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S)(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [68] MOTION for Default Judgment as to MeM Energy Partners LLC. Redactions amended in response to ECF No. 113. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 127 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot [117] Motion to Seal Document (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker)(Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot [110] Motion to Seal Document (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker)(Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated November 21, 2019 re: Withdrawal of sealing letter-motions at ECF Nos. 110 & 117. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [99] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint., [105] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot [61] Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot [65] Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, Defendants' motions to dismiss the Plaintiffs' original complaint are denied as moot. This Order resolves Dkt. Nos 61, 65. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/21/2019) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [77] MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration. . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Matthew L. Schwartz in Opposition re: [77] MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration.. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11)(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint, against Bayrock Group, Inc, Ferrari Holdings LLC, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., MeM Energy Partners LLC, RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. Related document: [1] Complaint,.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Defendants shall have until November 25, 2019 to submit a supplemental brief, no more than 10 pages in length, addressing the additional cases raised by Plaintiffs at yesterday's oral argument and the appropriate standard of review. A status conference is scheduled for 11:15 a.m. on January 8, 2020 in courtroom 17D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/19/2019) ( Status Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Status Conference held on 11/18/2019 : See Transcript for Details. A transcript of this proceeding is available by utilizing the attached order form. (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019, Terminated: 11/22/2019 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED LETTER MOTION to Seal Document [116] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 11/15/19. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [99] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint., [105] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 Order on Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [114] Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application Denied. The Motion to stay is referred to the undersigned. The parties are requested to be prepared to address the motion to stay and the theories of agency, third-party beneficiary and estopped at the conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/15/2019) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019, Terminated: 11/15/2019 Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jill Levi dated November 15, 2019. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater.(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [71] Motion to Seal Document. Finally, the Court denies Plaintiffs' request to file certain sections of their brief in support of their Motion for Default under seal. The brief provides the arguments for entry of a default judgment against MeM and, having reviewed the supposedly confidential information, the Court finds that the need for public access to the full document outweighs any interest in maintaining the information confidential. See City of Almaty, 2019 WL 4747654, at *5. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to file an unredacted version of the brief filed at Docket Entry 69 and unredacted versions of certain exhibits filed at Docket Entry 70, Exhibits F, I, K, N, and S, to allow the Clerk of Court to substitute them for the redacted versions of those documents currently on ECF by no later than November 22, 2019. Plaintiffs' supplemental letter brief providing further justification for their request to file all or part of Exhibit J under seal shall be filed by no later than November 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/13/2019) (ks) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 112 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [91] Motion to Seal Document. The First Amendment accords a strong presumption of public access to pleadings and other judicial documents that have historically been open to the press and general public and play[ ] a significant positive role in the functioning of the [judicial] process. Bernstein v. Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP, 814 F.3d 132, 141 (2d Cir. 2016); see also Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 124 (2d Cir. 2006). The Court of Appeals has held that this presumption applies to complaints filed in civil actions, Bernstein, 814 F.3d at 140, as well as pretrial motions and written documents submitted in connection with them, and docket sheets. Newsday LLC v. County of Nassau, 730 F.3d 156, 164 (2d Cir. 2013) (citation omitted).Once triggered, the First Amendment requires a court to make specific, rigorous findings before sealing [a] document or otherwise denying public access to the judicial record. Bernstein, 814 F.3d at 141 (citation omitted). [T]he presumptive right of access prevails unless it is overcome by specific, on-the-record findings that sealing is necessary to preserve higher values and only if the sealing order is narrowly tailored to achieve that aim. Newsday, 730 F.3d at 165 (citation omitted). This is because what offends the First Amendment is the attempt to exclude the public without sufficient justification, not the simple act of exclusion itself. Id. (citation omitted). Plaintiffs' motion requests that information pertaining to defendant Sater that already has been made publicly available in open court proceedings or in defendant Sater's own public filings be filed under seal. The request clearly does not meet the standard for sealing. Accordingly, the request to seal is denied. Plaintiffs are directed to refile an unsealed version of their papers within one week of this Order. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker)(Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 111 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [84] Motion to Seal Document. On August 30, 2019, Plaintiffs filed a first amended complaint in this action and requested that certain portions of the complaint be filed under seal because the information had been designated by designated confidential by various entities and individuals, including Ilyas Khrapunov, Triadou SPV S.A., Felix Sater, and banks and financial institutions when it was produced in discovery in another related action pursuant to a Protective Order issued by this Court. It includes non-public corporate and financial information that falls within the scope of the Courts confidentiality orders granting sealing requests by the same parties and non-parties in the related action. [See, e.g., Case No. 15 Civ. 5345, ECF Nos. 994, 1017, 1018, 1082, 1121 & 1127.] While it is true that this Court previously permitted some of this information to be submitted under seal in the other case, it did so to facilitate discovery and solely in connection with discovery-related motions. The related case has nearly completed discovery and the parties anticipate dispositive motions. As a result, some of this information may no longer be permitted to be maintained under seal. Further, some of the confidential information in the related case has now become relevant and is the basis for the instant action, as set forth in the amended complaint. The First Amendment accords a strong presumption of public access to pleadings and other judicial documents that have historically been open to the press and general public and play[ ] a significant positive role in the functioning of the [judicial] process. Bernstein v. Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP, 814 F.3d 132, 141 (2d Cir. 2016); see also Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 124 (2d Cir. 2006). The Court of Appeals has held that this presumption applies to complaints filed in civil actions, Bernstein, 814 F.3d at 140, as well as pretrial motions and written documents submitted in connection with them, and docket sheets. Newsday LLC v. County of Nassau, 730 F.3d 156, 164 (2d Cir. 2013) (citation omitted). The motion to seal portions of the complaint makes only broad and conclusory allegations to justify sealing the charging document in this case. This is insufficient to justify sealing. Bernstein, 814 F.3d at 141. More importantly, the Court's review of the limited information that the parties' seek to file under seal is not so sensitive as to outweigh the public's and press interest in this case. See Next Caller Inc. v. Martire, 368 F. Supp. 3d 663 (S.D.N.Y. 2019) (denying motion to seal, among other documents, complaint in action because it was deemed to be a judicial document to which the First Amendment's presmptive right of access applies). Accordingly, the motion to seal is denied. Plaintiffs shall file an unredacted copy of the amended complaint on ECF. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker)(Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019, Terminated: 11/22/2019 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION to Seal Document [109] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 11/12/19. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [99] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint., [105] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019, Terminated: 1/9/2020 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION to Seal Document [106] Declaration in Support of Motion, [107] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jill Levi dated October 11, 2019. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater.(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. (Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Jill Levi in Support re: [105] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint)(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019, Terminated: 11/30/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. Responses due by 11/12/2019(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael S. Horn, Esq. in Support re: [99] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-4, # (2) Exhibit 5)(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019, Terminated: 1/9/2020 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION to Seal Document [101] Affidavit in Support of Motion, [100] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael S. Horn, Esq. dated 10/11/2019. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC.(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Michael S. Horn, Esq. in Support re: [99] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-4, # (2) Exhibit 5)(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [99] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019, Terminated: 11/30/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: A status conference in this matter is hereby scheduled for Monday, November 18, 2019 at 2:15 p.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/8/2019) Status Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Order on Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [96] Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker)(Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019, Terminated: 10/8/2019 Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference presently scheduled for October 8, 2019 [ECF No. 87] addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated October 7, 2019. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jill Levi dated September 25, 2019 re: Courtesy Copies of Motion for Stay. Document filed by Felix Sater.(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [77] MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration. . Document filed by Felix Sater. (Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Reply Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY AFFIRMATION of Jill Levi in Support re: [77] MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration.. Document filed by Felix Sater. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Excerpts from Transcript of Hearing on August 8, 2019)(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jill Levi dated September 12, 2019 re: [85] LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Current and Prospective Motion Papers THIS IS A MOTION FOR A SCHEDULING ORDER WHEREBYT THE COURT IS ASKED TO CONSOLIDATE PENDING MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL, SET A DATE FOR ANY OTHER PERSONS TO BE HEARD, AN . Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. (Attachments: # (1) Opinion and Order of Appellate Division Second Department)(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019, Terminated: 11/13/2019 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION to Seal Document [89] Declaration in Opposition to Motion, [90] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated September 11, 2019. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [77] MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration. . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Matthew L. Schwartz in Opposition re: [77] MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration.. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11)(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jill Levi dated September 6, 2019 re: [85] LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Current and Prospective Motion Papers THIS IS A MOTION FOR A SCHEDULING ORDER WHEREBYT THE COURT IS ASKED TO CONSOLIDATE PENDING MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL, SET A DATE FOR ANY OTHER PERSONS TO BE HEARD, AN . Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. (Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [86] Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED: Proposed Briefing Schedule adopted. The Case Management Conference in this matter that is scheduled for Wednesday, September 11, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 is hereby rescheduled to Tuesday, October 8, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Application Granted. (Motions due by 10/11/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 9/6/19) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: (Responses due by 11/12/2019, Replies due by 12/3/2019.), Set/Reset Hearings: (Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019, Terminated: 9/6/2019 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and To Set Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss and to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jill Levi dated September 5, 2019. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater.(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019, Terminated: 12/2/2019 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Current and Prospective Motion Papers THIS IS A MOTION FOR A SCHEDULING ORDER WHEREBYT THE COURT IS ASKED TO CONSOLIDATE PENDING MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL, SET A DATE FOR ANY OTHER PERSONS TO BE HEARD, AND SET A DATE FOR MOVANT PROSPECTIVE INTERVENOR OBERLANDER TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED REPLY TO THE PRECEDING addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Frederick M. Oberlander dated September 4, 2019. Document filed by Frederick M Oberlander.(Oberlander, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019, Terminated: 11/13/2019 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION to Seal Document [83] Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Craig Wenner dated August 30, 2019. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint, against Bayrock Group, Inc, Ferrari Holdings LLC, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., MeM Energy Partners LLC, RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. Related document: [1] Complaint,.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re: [74] MOTION to Intervene for the limited purpose of having the court adjudicate the incorporated. MOTION to Unseal Document [70] Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan, [71] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document [70] Declaration in Support of Motion,, [69] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [75] Motion for Leave to File Document. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/19/2019) (ne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [77] MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration. . Document filed by Felix Sater. (Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Jill Levi in Support re: [77] MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration.. Document filed by Felix Sater. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Complaint)(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Felix Sater in Support re: [77] MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration.. Document filed by Felix Sater. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Confidential Assistance Agreement, # (2) Exhibit Statement of Claim, # (3) Exhibit Procedural Order)(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration. Document filed by Felix Sater.(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/16/2019, Entered: 8/16/2019 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER terminating [72] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court will take Defendants' concerns under advisement. No further briefing on this issue is necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/15/2019) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019, Terminated: 8/20/2019 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File corrected memorandum of law (see attachment which is Memorandum of Law in Support, ECF 74). Document filed by Frederick M Oberlander. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Memorandum of Law (in re ECF 74))(Oberlander, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019, Terminated: 11/26/2019 Motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene for the limited purpose of having the court adjudicate the incorporated., MOTION to Unseal Document [70] Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan, [71] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document [70] Declaration in Support of Motion,, [69] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for entry of a default judgment against MeM Energy Partners LLC addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Matthew L. Schwar filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan . Document filed by Frederick M Oberlander. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion)(Oberlander, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Supporting Documents served on MeM Energy Partners LLC on August 6, 2019. Service was accepted by J. Simmons, Corporation Services Company, Registered Agent. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019, Terminated: 8/16/2019 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [68] MOTION for Default Judgment as to MeM Energy Partners LLC. addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jill Levi dated August 7, 2019. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater.(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019, Terminated: 11/13/2019 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION to Seal Document [70] Declaration in Support of Motion,, [69] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for entry of a default judgment against MeM Energy Partners LLC addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 31, 2019. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Matthew L. Schwartz in Support re: [68] MOTION for Default Judgment as to MeM Energy Partners LLC.. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order for Entry of Default Judgment, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit L, # (14) Exhibit M, # (15) Exhibit N, # (16) Exhibit O, # (17) Exhibit P, # (18) Exhibit Q, # (19) Exhibit R, # (20) Exhibit S)(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [68] MOTION for Default Judgment as to MeM Energy Partners LLC. . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019, Terminated: 3/3/2020 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Default Judgment as to MeM Energy Partners LLC. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [65] MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. (Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Jill Levi in Support re: [65] MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019, Terminated: 11/21/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. Responses due by 8/30/2019(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Michael S. Horn, Esq. in Support re: [61] MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Complaint)(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [61] MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019, Terminated: 11/21/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: As discussed during the conference, Defendants' moving brief for the motion to stay is due by August 19, 2019. Plaintiffs' opposition brief is due by September 11, 2019 and Defendants' reply is due by no later than September 24, 2019. The case management conference currently scheduled for July 31, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. is hereby adjourned to September 10, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/25/2019) ( Motions due by 8/19/2019., Responses due by 9/11/2019, Replies due by 9/24/2019., Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Pre-Motion Telephone Conference held on 7/24/2019: : See Transcript for Details. A transcript of this proceeding is available by utilizing the attached order form. (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019 Clerk's Certificate of DefaultCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 3/2/2020, Doc. #161 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to MEM Energy Partners LLC. (km) Modified on 3/3/2020 (kv).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019 Affirmation in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIRMATION of Matthew L. Schwartz in Support re: [56] Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [53] Letter Motion for Conference. A telephonic pre-motion conference is hereby scheduled for July 24, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's Chambers at the scheduled time with counsel for all parties on the line. Please dial (212) 805-0234.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/16/2019) Telephone Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 15, 2019 re: [53] LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jill Levi dated July 10, 2019. . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: 7/10/2019, Terminated: 7/16/2019 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jill Levi dated July 10, 2019. Document filed by Felix Sater. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Confidential Assistance Agreement (Redacted))(Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/10/2019 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [50] JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file initial disclosures, initial document requests, and interrogatories, and for the entry of a briefing schedule on any motions to dismiss the complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 8, 2019. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. Application granted. So ordered. (Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2019). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/9/2019) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Bayrock Group, Inc answer due 7/31/2019; Ferrari Holdings LLC answer due 7/31/2019; Global Habitat Solutions, Inc. answer due 7/31/2019; MeM Energy Partners LLC answer due 7/31/2019; RRMI-DR LLC answer due 7/31/2019; Daniel Ridloff answer due 7/31/2019; Felix Sater answer due 7/31/2019. Responses due by 8/30/2019. Replies due by 9/16/2019. (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... Motions terminated: [49] CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Discovery orders allowing for the production of confidential materials addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 3, 2019 filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/8/2019) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019, Terminated: 7/9/2019 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file initial disclosures, initial document requests, and interrogatories, and for the entry of a briefing schedule on any motions to dismiss the complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 8, 2019. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019, Terminated: 7/8/2019 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Discovery orders allowing for the production of confidential materials addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 3, 2019. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (Stipulation and Proposed Order for 15 Civ. 5345), # (2) Exhibit 2 (Proposed Stipulated Protective Order for 19 Civ. 2645), # (3) Exhibit 3 (Redline of Protective Orders))(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Craig Wenner dated June 28, 2019 re: Status update regarding joint letter and proposed protective order. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/4/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [44] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 6/24/2019) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/21/2019, Terminated: 6/24/2019 motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated June 21, 2019. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: 6/19/2019 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [42] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 6/19/2019) (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: 6/18/2019, Terminated: 6/19/2019 motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File joint letter addressing overlap of discovery and proposed discovery order [see ECF 41 at 3] addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Matthew L. Schwartz dated June 18, 2018. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: On June 4, 2019, the parties attended an Initial Case Management Conference before this Court. After conducting a review of the pleadings and consultation with the parties, the following Scheduling Order is entered pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure: Pleadings and Parties. The parties may amend the pleadings or join additional parties until July 17, 2019. Discovery. All fact discovery shall be completed by June 4, 2020. All expert discovery shall be completed by October 9, 2020. At this time, the parties may commence any third-party discovery that is not redundant. All depositions shall be completed by June 4, 2020. Motions to Dismiss and Time to Answer. Motions to dismiss should be filed by no later than July 31, 2019 and in accordance with the Hon. Alison J. Nathan's Individual Practices. See http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Nathan. Any Defendant that does not move to dismiss is directed to file an Answer by no later than July 31, 2019. Plaintiffs' Motion for a Default Judgment against Defendant MeM Energy Partners LLC is due by no later than July 31, 2019 and should be filed in accordance with the Judge Nathan's Individual Practices. A case management conference is hereby scheduled for July 31, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 6/6/2019) Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/17/2019. Motions due by 7/31/2019. Responses due by 7/31/2019 Deposition due by 6/4/2020. Fact Discovery due by 6/4/2020. Expert Discovery due by 10/9/2020. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (As further set forth in this order). (ks) Modified on 6/6/2019 (ks).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/4/2019. (Court Reporter Carol Ganley) (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Beresh Rosenberg on behalf of Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. (Rosenberg, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [35] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [1] Complaint,. Application Granted. (Bayrock Group, Inc answer due 6/19/2019; Ferrari Holdings LLC answer due 6/19/2019; Global Habitat Solutions, Inc. answer due 6/19/2019; RRMI-DR LLC answer due 6/19/2019; Daniel Ridloff answer due 6/19/2019; Felix Sater answer due 6/19/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/20/19) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/17/2019. Replies due by 7/31/2019. (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Lauricella on behalf of Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Lauricella, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Levi on behalf of Bayrock Group, Inc, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. (Levi, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019, Terminated: 5/20/2019 motion for extension of time to file answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint, and to amend or oppose addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Craig Wenner dated May 8, 2019. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig A. Wenner on behalf of BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Wenner, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: This action is scheduled for an Initial Case Management Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Tuesday, June 04, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/8/19) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/7/2019) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Felix Sater served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. Service was accepted by "John Doe" (Concierge) at Defendant's residence. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC; City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [29] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/3/2019) Ferrari Holdings LLC answer due 5/20/2019 (ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019, Terminated: 5/3/2019 motion for extension of time to file answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael S. Horn, Esq. dated May 1, 2019. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC.(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Daniel Ridloff served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. Service was accepted by Daniel Ridloff Defendant. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC; City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. RRMI-DR LLC served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. Service was accepted by Daniel Ridloff Authorized Agent. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC; City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Global Habitat Solutions, Inc. served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. Service was accepted by New York Secretary of State Authorized Agent. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC; City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ferrari Holdings LLC served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. Service was accepted by Tara Ferrari, Authorized Agent. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC; City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. MeM Energy Partners LLC served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Authorized Agent. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC; City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Bayrock Group, Inc served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Authorized Agent. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC; City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ferrari Holdings LLC.(Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Stuart Horn on behalf of Ferrari Holdings LLC. (Horn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Redesignation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so redesignated. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Valerie E. Caproni is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:15-cv-05345-AJN-KHP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Matthew L. Schwartz dated March 28, 2019 re: Response to March 27, 2019 Order [ECF No. 19] and Related Case Statement. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: 3/27/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than April 2, 2019, Plaintiffs shall submit a letter explaining why they neither filed a Related Case Statement pursuant to Southern District Local Business Rule 13(b)(1) nor clearly and conspicuously brought the possibility of this case's relatedness to 15-CV-5354 to the Court's attention pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.6. In the same letter, Plaintiffs must explain whether, in their view, this case is related to 15-CV-5354 under Southern District Local Business Rule 13. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/27/2019) (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MeM Energy Partners LLC. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Global Habitat Solutions, Inc.. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ferrari Holdings LLC. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Felix Sater. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel Ridloff. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayrock Group, Inc. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to RRMI-DR LLC. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Matthew Lane Schwartz to RE-FILE Document No. [2] Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple citizenship selections made for plaintiff and defendant on civil cover sheet; please select only one for each. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located athttp://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew Lane Schwartz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Designated ECF. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Matthew Lane Schwartz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ferrari Holdings LLC (NJ). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MEMEnergy Partners, LLC, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ferrari Holdings LLC, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RRMI-DR, LLC, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayrock Group Inc., re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniel Ridloff, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Felix Sater, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan. (Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schwartz, Matthew) Modified on 3/26/2019 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Bayrock Group, Inc, Ferrari Holdings LLC (NJ), Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., MeM Energy Partners LLC, RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16555918)Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan.(Schwartz, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?