Chase Gharrity v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Delaware Court of Chancery, Case No. 2019-0217-JRS
Vice Chancellor Judge Joseph R. Slights III, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 18, 2019 at 1:38 PM EDT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gharrity, Chase, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 48 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Order
Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Amending the Court's March 27th and April 30th Orders)
    Blank 47 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None
    Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Amending the Court's March 27th and April 30th Orders
      Legal Document 46 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Public Version
      Letter to Vice Chancellor Slights from Blake A. Bennett regarding Motion to Lift Stay - PUBLIC VERSION
        Blank 45 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Letter
        Letter to the Court from Blake A. Bennett, on behalf of Stockholder Chase Gharrity regarding his motion to intervene
          Blank 44 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Letter
          Plaintiff's Letter to the Court Concerning the Related Derivative Action and the Timing of Defendant's Remaining Document Production - FILED UNDER SEAL
            Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None
            Granted (Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Amending The Court's March 27 Order)
              Legal Document 42 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None
              Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Amending The Court's March 27 Order
                Legal Document 41 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None
                Granted ([Proposed] Order)
                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None
                  Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights, III from Sabrina M. Hendershot enclosing form of implementing order
                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None
                  Transcript of 3.12.20 Telephonic Post-Trial Rulings of the Court
                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None
                    Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from William M. Lafferty pursuant to Your Honor’s March 12, 2020 oral ruling
                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None
                      Telephonic post-trial rulings of VC Slights 3.12.2020. Limited further production granted. See transcript.
                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None
                        January 31, 2020 - Hearing on Whether Additional Documents Sought in the Complaint are Necessary and Essential to Plaintiff's Stated Proper Purposes
                          Blank 35 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None
                          An Oral Argument on addressing the Scope of Documents was held before Vice Chancellor Slights on 1.31.2020. (See transcript)
                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None
                            Letter dated January 27, 2020, from VC Slights to counsel changing the venue for oral argument concerning the scope of the documents, scheduled for January 31, 2020, at 9:15 a.m., from Wilmington to Dover
                              Blank 33 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None
                              Letter dated December 11, 2019, from VC Slights to counsel scheduling oral argument for January 31, 2020, at 9:15 a.m., in Wilmington concerning the scope of the documents
                                Blank 32 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                Letter to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights, III from Blake A. Bennett, Esquire enclosing two courtesy copies of Plaintiff’s Reply Brief Regarding Whether the Additional Documents Sought in the Complaint Are Necessary and Essential to Plaintiff’s Stated Proper Purpose
                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None
                                  Plaintiff's Reply Brief Regarding Whether the Additional Documents Sought in the Complaint are Necessary and Essential to Plaintiff's Stated Proper Purposes
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None
                                    Letter to Vice Chancellor Slights form Sabrina M. Hendershot enclosing two courtesy copies of Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Answering Brief Regarding the Scope of Its Section 220 Production to Plaintiff, and the Affidavit of Sabrina M. Hendershot in support thereof
                                      Blank 29 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None
                                      Transmittal Affidavit of Sabrina M. Hendershot in Support of Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Answering Brief Regarding the Scope of Its Section 220 Production to Plaintiff (with Certificate of Service)
                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None
                                      Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Answering Brief Regarding the Scope of Its Section 220 Production to Plaintiff (with Certificate of Service)
                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None
                                        Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Confidential Treatment)
                                          Blank 26 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None
                                          Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Confidential Treatment (with Certificate of Service)
                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019
                                            Granted (Amended Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order)
                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019
                                              Plaintiff's Opening Brief Regarding whether the Additional Documents Sought in the Complaint are necessary and Essential to Plaintiff's Stated Proper Purposes
                                              Blank 23 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                              Amended Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019
                                                7-19-2019 TELECONFERENCE RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY AND THE COURT'S RULINGS
                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: 7/26/2019
                                                  Granted (Stipulation and (Proposed) Scheduling Order)
                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: 7/26/2019
                                                    Stipulation and (Proposed) Scheduling Order
                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019
                                                      Denied ([Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Stay)
                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019
                                                        Granted with Modifications (Proposed Order Granting Motion for Expedited Proceedings)
                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: 7/19/2019
                                                          Telephonic Oral Argument with VC Slights 7.19.2019 on Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite, Defendant's Motion to Stay, and the Court's guidance.
                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: 7/19/2019
                                                            Granted (Bretan, Jennifer C.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer C. Bretan on behalf of Defendant Tesla, Inc.)
                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: 7/18/2019
                                                              Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer C. Bretan on behalf of Defendant Tesla, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019
                                                                Granted (Kolesnikov, Yury A,: Proposed Order for Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Chase Gharrity)
                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019
                                                                  Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Yury A. Kolesnikov, Esquire to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Chase Gharrity with Certificate of Service
                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019
                                                                    Letter, dated June 7, 2019, from VC Slights to counsel scheduling a telephonic argument for July 19, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. concerning (1) Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Proceedings and (2) Defendant's Motion to Stay
                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019
                                                                      Letter to Vice Chancellor Slights from Sabrina M. Hendershot enclosing courtesy copies of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Proceedings and Motion to Stay
                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019
                                                                        Letter to Vice Chancellor Slights from Sabrina M. Hendershot enclosing two courtesy copies of Defendant's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Stay
                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019
                                                                          Defendant's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Stay (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019
                                                                            Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay and Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Proceedings
                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019
                                                                              Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Defendant's Response to the Complaint)
                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019
                                                                                Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Defendant's Response to the Complaint
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019
                                                                                  Entry of Appearance of William M. Lafferty, Susan W. Waesco, and Sabrina M. Hendershot of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP on behalf of Defendant Tesla, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019
                                                                                    Summons and return of service upon Tesla, Inc. pursuant to 10 Del. C. Section 3111 and accepted by Amy McLaren
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: 3/20/2019
                                                                                      Issued (1) summons 3.20.19 to special process server (1 copy)
                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: 3/20/2019
                                                                                        Verified Complaint Pursuant to 8 Del. C. Section 220 to Compel Inspection of Books and Records

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 590 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?