Korb, Jason et al v. Tesla, Inc. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Middlesex County Superior Court, Case No. 1981CV00797

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Korb, Jason, Plaintiff
No Logo Korb, Rebecca, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla Motors MA, Inc. Tesla Motors MA, Inc., Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019
Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal Pursuant to Massachusetts R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii), the parties to the above-captioned matter hereby stipulate that this action, including the Complaint and any counterclaims, shall be voluntarily dismissed with prejudice, with no rights of appeal and without an award of costs to any party. All parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Applies To: Korb, Jason (Plaintiff); Korb, Rebecca (Plaintiff); Tesla, Inc. (Defendant); Tesla Motors MA, Inc. (Defendant)
    Blank 17 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019
    Attorney appearance On this date Michelle M Byers, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Tesla Motors MA, Inc.
      Blank 16 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019
      Attorney appearance On this date Michelle M Byers, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Tesla, Inc.
        Blank 15 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019
        Party(s) file Stipulation regarding discovery responses. Applies To: Korb, Jason (Plaintiff); Korb, Rebecca (Plaintiff); Tesla, Inc. (Defendant); Tesla Motors MA, Inc. (Defendant)
          Blank 14 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019
          Attorney appearance On this date Holly M Polglase, Esq. added for Defendant Tesla Motors MA, Inc.
            Blank 13 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019
            Attorney appearance On this date Michelle M Byers, Esq. added for Defendant Tesla Motors MA, Inc.
              Blank 12 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019
              Attorney appearance On this date Holly M Polglase, Esq. added for Defendant Tesla, Inc.
                Blank 11 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019
                Attorney appearance On this date Michelle M Byers, Esq. added for Defendant Tesla, Inc.
                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019
                  Received from Defendant Tesla, Inc.: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
                    Blank 9
                    4
                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019
                      Service Returned for Defendant Tesla, Inc.: Service through person in charge / agent;
                        Blank 7
                        3
                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019
                          Service Returned for Defendant Tesla Motors MA, Inc.: Service through person in charge / agent;
                            Blank  Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019
                            Attorney appearance On this date Matthew J Walko, Esq. added for Plaintiff Jason Korb
                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019
                              Civil action cover sheet filed.
                                Blank  Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019
                                Attorney appearance On this date Matthew J Walko, Esq. added for Plaintiff Rebecca Korb
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019
                                  Original civil complaint filed.
                                    Blank  Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019
                                    Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 03/21/2019
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019
                                      Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 03/21/2019
                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019
                                        Attorney appearance On this date Matthew J Walko, Esq. added for Plaintiff Rebecca Korb
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019
                                          Attorney appearance On this date Matthew J Walko, Esq. added for Plaintiff Jason Korb

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?