Todd v. Reichwein
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:19-cv-01751-DMR
Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 28, 2020 at 11:27 PM DT (7.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peter, Todd, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Liana W. Chen +1 415 955 1158 liana@krinternetlaw.com
Space Karl Stephen Kronenberger +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 karl@KRInternetlaw.com
Space Ruben Pena +1 415 955 1155 ruben@krinternetlaw.com
Space Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 Jeff@KRInternetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Sarah Michelle Reichwein, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ben T Rosenfeld +1 415 285 8091 +1 415 285 8092 ben.rosenfeld@comcast.net
Office Oakland
Filed 4/3/2019
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Outside US
Terminated 6/16/2020
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,CLOSED,CONSENT,REFSET-RMI
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 77 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020 stipulation
STIPULATION for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Peter Todd and Sarah Michelle Reichwein. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/16/2020) Modified on 6/16/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
    LREF
    Blank 76 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: 6/5/2020 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER: The court has received notice that this case has settled. All case deadlines are vacated. The parties shall file a joint status report or dismissal by June 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/5/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
      LREF
      Blank 75 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: 6/4/2020 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference held on 6/3/2020. Settled. Material terms of settlement placed on the record. FTR Time: Zoom Recording. Plaintiff Attorneys: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld and Ruben Pena. Peter Todd also attended. Defendant Attorney: Ben T Rosenfeld. Isis Agora Lovecruft also attended. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/3/2020)
        LREF
        Blank 74 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: 6/2/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
        CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will hold a hearing on Joint Discovery Letter [73] on June 25, 2020 at 1:00 pm. Access information for the remote hearing will be provided prior to the hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
          LREF
          Legal Document 73 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: 5/20/2020, Terminated: 6/16/2020 Discovery Letter Brief
          Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Peter Todd and Sarah Michelle Reichwein. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/20/2020) Modified on 5/21/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
            LREF
            Legal Document 72 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: 5/20/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
            Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting [71] Stipulation to Extend Page Limit. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
              LREF
              Legal Document 71 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020, Terminated: 5/20/2020 stipulation
              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Exceed Page Limit in Joint Letter to Court filed by Sarah Michelle Reichwein and Peter Todd. (Rosenfeld, Ben) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Modified on 5/20/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                LREF
                Blank 70 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: 5/4/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                CLERK'S NOTICE A Settlement Conference is set for 6/3/2020 10:00 AM. Parties are reminded to review Judge Illman's Settlement Conference Standing Order on the court's website. The Status Conference previously set for 5/5/2020 is vacated. The court will be conducting the Settlement Conference on 6/3/2020 at 10:00am via Zoom video conference. Counsel are responsible for making sure that their participants are able to take part in a Zoom video conference. Counsel should ensure that their participants have downloaded the Zoom application onto a laptop or desktop with a working camera and microphone, and counsel shall do a test run with all of their participants prior to the settlement conference to eliminate all equipment-based problems. Audio-only participation is prohibited. All participants must also have access to email and a telephone throughout the settlement conference. If parties are unable or unwilling to participate via Zoom video conference, they shall notify the courtroom deputy clerk at rmi@cand.uscourts.gov, forthwith (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 69 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER Granting Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/17/2020. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 68 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Declaration in Support
                    Declaration of Ruben Pena in Support of [67] Stipulation filed byPeter Todd. (Related document(s)[67]) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 67 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 stipulation
                      STIPULATED Protective Order For Standard Litigation filed by Peter Todd and Sarah Michelle Reichwein. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/17/2020) Modified on 4/20/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                        LREF
                        Blank 66 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: 3/31/2020 scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Scheduling Conference held on 3/31/2020. Status/Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Parties will confer and advise the court (at gloria_knudson@cand.uscourts.gov) as to which settlement conference participation method they prefer. FTR Time: NA. Plaintiff Attorneys: Jeff Rosenfeld and Ruben Pena both by phone. Defendant Attorney: Did not appear. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/31/2020)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 65 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020 Answer
                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand bySarah Michelle Reichwein. (Rosenfeld, Ben) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: 3/13/2020 Digital Audio File Uploaded
                            PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/4/2020 1:57:54 PM ]. File Size [ 13720 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:28:35 ]. (courtspeak).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 63 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 3/12/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                              CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2020 10:00 AM in McKinleyville before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Parties may appear by phone by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 62 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER: See Order for all dates set by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/5/20. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 61 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 terminate deadlines and hearingsCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/4/2020. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for Settlement Conference which shall be completed within 60-90 days, or as soon thereafter. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2020 01:30 PM. Last day to hear dispositive motions on 4/8/2021 01:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2021 03:00 PM; Jury Selection and Jury Trial (5 days) set for 7/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. FTR Time: 1:57-2:26. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2020)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                    CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                      NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael S Kwun (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 59 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020 Clerks Notice
                                        CLERK'S NOTICE re Docket No. [58]: Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 5-1(c)(2)(C), no court order is required to withdraw as counsel so long as the party is still represented by other counsel. Defendant's attorneys must file a Notice of Change in Counsel instead. Docket No. [58] is terminated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 58 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020, Terminated: 3/2/2020 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Sarah Michelle Reichwein. Responses due by 3/13/2020. Replies due by 3/20/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 57 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 Case Management Statement
                                            Subsequent CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Peter Todd and Sarah Michelle Reichwein. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/26/2020) Modified on 2/27/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 56 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                              NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 55 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Ruben Pena for Plaintiff Peter Todd (Pena, Ruben) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 54 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A Further Case Management Conference is set for 3/4/2020 01:30 PM. Parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement by no later than 2/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/7/20. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 53 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                    Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part [20] Motion to Strike. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Supplemental Brief
                                                      Supplemental Brief re [20] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint, [49] Supplemental Brief (Defendant's Supplemental Response Brief) filed bySarah Michelle Reichwein. (Related document(s)[20], [49]) (Rosenfeld, Ben) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [20] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint ) - Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Supplemental Brief filed byPeter Todd. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 50 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 Supplemental Brief
                                                          Supplemental Brief re [20] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint, [46] Terminate Hearings,, Motion Hearing,, Case Management Conference - Initial, filed bySarah Michelle Reichwein. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Defendant's Counsel Ben Rosenfeld, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Related document(s)[20], [46]) (Rosenfeld, Ben) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 Supplemental Brief
                                                            Supplemental Brief re [20] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed byPeter Todd. (Related document(s)[20]) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019 transcript
                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/22/2019, before Magistrate Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [47] Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2019. (Related documents(s) [47]) (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/22/2019 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu by Sarah Michelle Reichwein, for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2019 re [20] Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint, see minute Order for all particulars. Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/22/2019. FTR Time: 2:52-3:10 (Assigned Transcriber: Peggy Schuerger). Attachment: Civil Law & Motion and Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/22/2019) Modified on 8/26/2019 (napS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019 Digital Audio File Uploaded
                                                                    PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/22/2019 2:52:53 PM ]. File Size [ 8536 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:17:47 ]. (courtspeak).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                      Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting [41] Stipulation to Change Case Name. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER (AS MODIFIED) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting [40] Defendant's Co-counsel's Motion to Appear by Telephone at the 8/22/2019 01:00 PM Motion Hearing and Initial Case Management Conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Notice - other
                                                                          NOTICE by Sarah Michelle Reichwein re [40] MOTION to Appear by Telephone (Corrected) of Non-Opposition by Plaintiff (Rosenfeld, Ben) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019, Terminated: 8/21/2019 stipulation
                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Change Case Caption filed by Peter Todd. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019, Terminated: 8/20/2019 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                              MOTION to Appear by Telephone (Corrected) filed by Sarah Michelle Reichwein. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Counsel Ben Rosenfeld, # (2) Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, Ben) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019, Terminated: 9/30/2019 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                ***DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET #40.*** MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Sarah Michelle Reichwein. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, Ben) (Filed on 8/19/2019) Modified on 8/19/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019 Case Management Statement
                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Peter Todd and Sarah Michelle Reichwein (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rosenfeld, Ben) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: Plaintiff submitted numerous exhibits as part of his opposition to Defendant's motion to strike. The electronic copies of these documents have regular-size type, but the chambers copies of many exhibits are in illegibly small type. By August 13, 2019, Plaintiff shall resubmit (not re-file) chambers copies of Exhibits L and P to the Todd declaration (Docket No. 24) and Exhibits A-O to the Applebaum declaration (Docket No. 25). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/9/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019) Modified on 8/9/2019 (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: 8/8/2019 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER (AS MODIFIED) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting [33] Motion to Reschedule the Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled to 8/22/2019 01:00 PM to coincide with the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint (anti-SLAPP motion). (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 Proposed Order
                                                                                          Proposed Order re [33] Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Sarah Michelle Reichwein. (Roethlisberger, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019, Terminated: 8/8/2019 Motion to Continue
                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Sarah Michelle Reichwein and Peter Todd. (Roethlisberger, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Tomasz Roman Barczyk for Plaintiff Peter Todd (Barczyk, Tomasz) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: 8/5/2019 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                REPLY (re [20] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed bySarah Michelle Reichwein. (Attachments: # (1) Redacted Declaration of Jane Doe)(Roethlisberger, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: 8/5/2019, Terminated: 1/6/2020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sarah Michelle Reichwein. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Jane Doe Declaration, # (4) Unredacted Version of Jane Doe Declaration, # (5) Stipulation)(Roethlisberger, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                    Declaration of Ben Rosenfeld (Redacted) in Support of [20] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed bySarah Michelle Reichwein. (Related document(s)[20]) (Rosenfeld, Ben) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting [22] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. By August 1, 2019, Defendant shall file a redacted version of Docket No. 20-4 that complies with this order. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                        Electronic filing error. Incorrect filing procedure regarding [24] Declaration in Support, [27] Declaration in Support [26] Declaration in Support and [25] Declaration in Support filed by Peter Todd.Declarations should be filed as attachments to the main brief, not as separate docket entries. No further action is necessary, please comply on all future filings. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                          Declaration of Nadim Kobeissi in Support of [23] Opposition/Response to Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed byPeter Todd. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[23]) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                            Declaration of Daniel J. Bernstein in Support of [23] Opposition/Response to Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed byPeter Todd. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J)(Related document(s)[23]) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                              Declaration of Jacob Appelbaum in Support of [23] Opposition/Response to Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed byPeter Todd. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P)(Related document(s)[23]) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                Declaration of Peter Todd in Support of [23] Opposition/Response to Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed byPeter Todd. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S)(Related document(s)[23]) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [20] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byPeter Todd. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019, Terminated: 7/30/2019 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sarah Michelle Reichwein. (Attachments: # (1) Stipulation, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, Ben) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Ben T Rosenfeld on Behalf of Defendant (Rosenfeld, Ben) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019, Terminated: 1/6/2020 Motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Sarah Michelle Reichwein. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/29/2019. Replies due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration of Wilcox, # (3) Declaration of Lovecruft, # (4) Declaration of Rosenfeld)(Roethlisberger, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sarah Michelle Reichwein.. (Roethlisberger, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Sarah Michelle Reichwein (Roethlisberger, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Alan Roethlisberger (Roethlisberger, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Kwun (Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Todd re [14] Clerk's Notice,, re: Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE: The court is in receipt of Plaintiff's case management statement and request to continue the Initial Case Management Conference [13]. The request is granted. The Initial Case Management Conference currently set for 7/3/2019 01:30 PM has been continued to 9/4/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu in Courtroom No. 4, Third Floor, U.S. District Court, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. The joint case management conference statement is due on 8/28/2019. Plaintiff shall serve the Defendant with a copy of this Clerk's Notice and file a proof of service with the court. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                      PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Peter Todd. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/14/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019 Notice of withdrawal of motion
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to Serve Summons and Complaint on Defendant by Alternative Means or in the Alternative to Extend Time to Complete Service (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Peter Todd. Service waived by Sarah Michelle Reichwein waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld in Support of [8] MOTION for Service by Publication or In The Alternative to Extend Time to Complete Service filed byPeter Todd. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Q)(Related document(s)[8]) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019, Terminated: 5/29/2019 Motion for Service by Publication
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Service by Publication or In The Alternative to Extend Time to Complete Service filed by Peter Todd. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Peter Todd, # (2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Todd.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/4/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Sarah Michelle Reichwein. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/4/2019 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                      Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Peter Todd (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Summons. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Injunctive Relief and Damages against Sarah Michelle Reichwein ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13227462.). Filed byPeter Todd. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/3/2019) Modified on 4/4/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?