USA v. Flashberg et al
Criminal Case California Central District Court, Case No. 2:19-cr-00209-JAK-2

Tags
Last Updated April 12, 2021 at 3:46 PM DT (5.3 months ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Judgment and Commitment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Sentencing
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Position with Respect to Presentence Report/Sentencing Factors
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference and/or Waiver of Presence (CR-29)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Manual Filing (G-92)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Position with Respect to Presentence Report/Sentencing Factors
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Manual Filing (G-92)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Manual Filing (G-92)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Continue
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Forfeiture of Property
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None Change of Plea Hearing (plea accepted)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference and/or Waiver of Presence (CR-29)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference and/or Waiver of Presence (CR-29)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Plea Agreement
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Substitution Attorney (G-01)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 Status report
                                                            STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Darin Flashberg, Najib Jabbour Joint Report Regarding Discovery Conference (Pullio, Robyn)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019 Bond and Conditions (CR-1)Court Filing
                                                              BOND AND CONDITIONS OF RELEASE filed as to Defendant Najib Jabbour conditions of release: $100,000 Appearance Bond approved by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ja)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Passport Receipt
                                                                PASSPORT RECEIPT from U. S. Pretrial Services as to Defendant Najib Jabbour. USA passport was received on 4/9/19. (ja)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt as to Defendant Darin Flashberg, Najib Jabbour, re Stipulation for Order[31]. See order for details. (shb)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 Stipulation for Order
                                                                    First STIPULATION for Order - Stipulation for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Darin Flashberg, Najib Jabbour (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Pullio, Robyn)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/13/2019, Entered: 4/13/2019 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
                                                                      First STIPULATION to Amend/Correct Stipulation to Modify Conditions of Release[10] filed by Plaintiff Darin Flashberg as to Defendant Darin Flashberg, Najib Jabbour(Bell, James)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 Arraignment - Post IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                        MINUTES OF POST-INDICTMENT ARRAIGNMENT: held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as to Defendant Najib Jabbour (2) Count 1,4-5,8-9. Defendant arraigned, states true name: As charged. Defendant entered not guilty plea to all counts as charged. Attorney: Peter Carl Swarth, Appointed present. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt. Jury Trial set for 6/4/2019 09:00 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2019 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. Court Smart: CS 04/09/2019. (tba)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 Unredacted Document
                                                                          SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (CR-4) filed by Defendant Najib Jabbour re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)[16] (ja)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)
                                                                            REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $100,000 by surety: Rosie Jabbour for Bond and Conditions Filed by Defendant Najib Jabbour (ja)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 Declaration re Passport (CR-37)
                                                                              DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Najib Jabbour, declaring that I have been issued a passport or other travel document(s), but they are not currently in my possession. I will surrender any passport or other travel document(s) issued to me, to the U.S. Pretrial Services Agency by the deadline imposed. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (ja)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 Advisement of Defendant's Statutory & Constitutional Rights (CR-10)
                                                                                ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Najib Jabbour. (ja)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                  FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Najib Jabbour. (Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (ja)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 Arrest on Indictment - Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                    MINUTES OF ARREST ON INDICTMENT HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as to Defendant Najib Jabbour. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Peter C Swarth for Najib Jabbour, Appointed, present.Court orders bail set as: Najib Jabbour (2) $100,000.00 Appearance Bond, SEE ATTACHED BOND FOR TERMS AND CONDITIONS. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USM. Court Smart: ECRO 4/9/19. (ja)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 Report Commencing Criminal Action (CR-64)
                                                                                      REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Najib Jabbour; defendants Year of Birth: 1971; date of arrest: 4/9/2019 (ja)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019 Memorandum by US Attorney
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA (See attachment) (ja)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019 Memorandum by US Attorney
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA (See attachment) (ja)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019 Case Summary (CR-72)
                                                                                            CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Robyn Pullio as to Defendant Najib Jabbour; defendants Year of Birth: 1971 (ja)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019 Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams granting [4] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case as to Darin Flashberg (1), Najib Jabbour (2) (ja)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Indictment and Related Documents Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Darin Flashberg, Najib Jabbour. (ja)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                  INDICTMENT filed as to Darin Flashberg (1) count(s) 1, 2-9, Najib Jabbour (2) count(s) 1, 4-5, 8-9. Offense occurred in LA. (ja)
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 790 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?