USA v. Assange
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00111-CMH

Tags
Last Updated December 13, 2021 at 11:13 PM EST (1.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kellen Dwyer +1 703 299 3700 kellen.dwyer@usdoj.gov
Space Gordon D. Kromberg +1 703 299 3700 gordon.kromberg@usdoj.gov
Space Thomas W. Traxler +1 703 299 3700 thomas.traxler@usdoj.gov
v.
Assange, Julian Assange, Julian, Defendant
Officially listed as "Julian Paul Assange"

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Julian Paul Assange (1)
Office Alexandria
Filed 3/6/2018
County Loudoun
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1030B.F
Offense Level 4
18371, 1030(a)(1), 1030(a)(2), 1030(c)(2)(B)(ii) Conspiracy to Commit Computer Intrusion
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 warrant issued
Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Julian Paul Assange. (jlan)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet
    Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (jlan)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 indictment
      SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Julian Paul Assange (1) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss-4ss, 5ss-8ss, 9ss-11ss, 12ss-14ss, 15ss-17ss. (jlan)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
        Filed in error and removed
          LREF
          Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
          Filed in error and removed.
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020 Letter
            Letter to the Court, filed by David Andrew Christenson. (Attachments: # (1) Envelope)(choy, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020 Letter
              Letter to the Court, filed by David Andrew Christenson. (Attachments: # (1) Envelope)(choy, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Letter
                Letter to the Court filed by David Andrew Christenson (Attachments: # (1) Envelope)(choy, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Letter
                  Letter to the Court (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1, # (2) Attachment 2, # (3) Attachment 3, # (4) Attachment 4, # (5) Envelope)(choy, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Letter
                    Letter to the Court from Defendant, Julian Paul Assange (Attachments: # (1) Attachment, # (2) Envelope)(choy, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019 warrant issued
                      Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Julian Paul Assange. (jlan)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet
                        Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (jlan)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019 indictment
                          SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Julian Paul Assange (1) count(s) 1s, 2s-4s, 5s-8s, 9s-11s, 12s-14s, 15s-17s, 18s. (jlan)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                            Filed in error and removed.
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 Redacted Document
                              Redacted version of [15] Private Letter to the court. (kbar, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 Notice - other
                                NOTICE as to Filing of Docket #15 Redacted by USA as to Julian Paul Assange re [18] Sealed Order (Kromberg, Gordon)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 Notice - other
                                  NOTICE of Government's Response to the Reporters Committee's Renewed Application by USA as to Julian Paul Assange re Case Unsealed (Kromberg, Gordon)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 Remark
                                    Document received from Robert Allen Rytlewski. (kbar, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Redacted Document
                                      Redacted version of [11] Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet filed by USA. (kbar, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Redacted Document
                                        Redacted version of [4] Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet filed by USA. (kbar, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Redacted Document
                                          Redacted version of [5] SEALED MOTION to Seal Case filed by USA. (kbar, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Order on Motion to unseal documentCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [22] Motion to Unseal the Docket and Specific Filings. The Clerk's Office shall also unseal the specific documents in the following docket entries: Dkt. Nos. [6], [12], [13], [16], [17], [18], [20]. The Motion to Seal Dkt. No [5], Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet Dkt. No. [4], and Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet Dkt. No. [11], shall remain under seal, for the reasons stated in the government's motion. The documents filed in all other docket entries shall remain under seal until further order of the Court as to Julian Paul Assange (1). Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 4/17/19. (kbar)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 Motion to Unseal Document
                                              MOTION to Unseal Document and Docket by USA as to Julian Paul Assange. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Traxler, Thomas)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Case Unsealed
                                                Docket sheet unsealed. (kbar,)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Case Unsealed
                                                  Documents unsealed per Order entered on 4/17/19 as to Julian Paul Assange. (kbar, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [20] Sealed Motion and that the Clerk's Office shall unseal the following two documents: (1) the criminal complaint and (2) the affidavit supporting the criminal complaint, filed on December 21,2017. The Clerk's Office shall also unseal this motion and Order as to Julian Paul Assange (1). Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 4/15/19. (kbar)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019, Terminated: 4/15/2019 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                      Sealed Motion by USA as to Julian Paul Assange. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(kbar, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Case Unsealed
                                                      DOCUMENTS unsealed per court order entered on 4/15/19 as to Julian Paul Assange. (kbar, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Gordon D. Kromberg appearing for USA. (Kromberg, Gordon)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 SEALED OrderCourt Filing
                                                          Sealed Order granting [17] Sealed Motion as to Julian Paul Assange. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 4/11/19. (kbar)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                            MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Julian Paul Assange. (kbar, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 Sealed document
                                                              Under Seal Notice filed by the USA. (kbar, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Case Unsealed
                                                                Case unsealed AS TO THE INDICTMENT ONLY. ALL OTHER DOCUMENTS SEALED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT as to Julian Paul Assange. (kbar, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 warrant issuedCourt Filing
                                                                  Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan in case as to Julian Paul Assange. (krob, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [12] Motion to Seal Case until the defendant is arrested as to Julian Paul Assange (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 3/6/18. (krob, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                      MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Julian Paul Assange. (krob, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet
                                                                        Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (krob, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                          SEALED INDICTMENT as to Julian Paul Assange (1) count(s) 1. (krob, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 warrant issuedCourt Filing
                                                                            Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan in case as to Julian Paul Assange. (krob, )[1:17-mj-00611-TCB *SEALED*]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [5] Motion to Seal Case until the defendant is arrested andextradited, except that the United States may provide a copy of these documents, and information relating thereto, to such foreign and domestic law enforcement, judicial, and diplomatic personnel as necessary to secure the defendant's arrest and extradition as to Julian Paul Assange (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/21/17. (krob)[1:17-mj-00611-TCB *SEALED*]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017, Terminated: 12/21/2017 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Julian Paul Assange. (krob, )[1:17-mj-00611-TCB *SEALED*]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                  Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (krob, )[1:17-mj-00611-TCB *SEALED*]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Defendant Information Sheet +
                                                                                    Defendant Information Sheet (krob, )[1:17-mj-00611-TCB *SEALED*]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Affidavit
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Julian Paul Assange [1] Complaint (Sealed) (krob, )[1:17-mj-00611-TCB *SEALED*]
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Complaint (Sealed)
                                                                                        SEALED COMPLAINT as to Julian Paul Assange (1). (krob, )[1:17-mj-00611-TCB *SEALED*]
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?