Giuffre v. Dershowitz
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-03377-LAP
District Judge Loretta A. Preska, presiding

Tags
Last Updated Today at 1:12 PM (3.8 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Virginia L. Giuffre, Plaintiff
v.
Dershowitz, Alan M. Dershowitz, Alan M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Alan Dershowitz"
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/16/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $75000000
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (377) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 12/1/2021, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 12/1/2021, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 11/23/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 11/22/2021, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 11/17/2021, Entered: None Exhibit to Pleading
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 11/16/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 11/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 11/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 11/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 11/12/2021, Entered: None Seal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 11/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 11/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 11/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 11/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 11/4/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 11/1/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 10/27/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 10/27/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 10/27/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 10/22/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 10/6/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 9/2/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Proposed Protective Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Reply (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Intent to Request Redaction
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Proposed Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Proposed Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Proposed Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 06/17/2020 re: Sealed Materials from Giuffre v. Maxwell, Case No. 15-cv-07433-LAP. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [135] Letter filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed briefing schedule is approved. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 7/2/2020, Replies due by 7/16/2020.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/16/2020) (va)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated June 15, 2020 re: Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Haley N. Proctor in Support re: [136] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims.. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 Complaint, # (2) Exhibit 2 Amended Complaint, # (3) Exhibit 3 Vol. I Am. Counterclaims and Exs., # (4) Exhibit 3 Vol. II Am. Counterclaims and Exs.).(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [136] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims. . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated June 15, 2020 re: Amended Counterclaims. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Plaintiff shall inform the Court by letter no later than June 17, 2020, of her views regarding Defendants letter dated June 12, 2020 [dkt. no. 133]. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/15/2020) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 133 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper, Esq. dated June 12, 2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D).(Cooper, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 132 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: 6/8/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: [130] Letter filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's letter regarding Defendant's amended counterclaims. (See dkt. no. 130.) Plaintiff's counsel shall inform the Court by letter no later than June 15, 2020, if Plaintiff wishes to 1) stand on her pending motion to dismiss, supplemented, if appropriate, by argument related to the newly-added material in the counterclaim, or 2) withdraw the present motion and file a new motion addressed to the amended counterclaim. Plaintiff's counsel shall inform Defendant's counsel and the Court of the course chosen, and, if appropriate, counsel shall confer and inform the Court of a proposed briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/8/2020) (va)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 131 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: 6/8/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' letters regarding the scope of various subpoenas issued by Defendant to Plaintiff's current and prior counsel. (See dkt. nos. 125, 128, 129.) Defense counsel shall conclude negotiations with counsel for the law firms before asking the Court to intervene. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/8/2020) (va)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 130 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: 6/8/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated June 8, 2020 re: Amended Counterclaims. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 129 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: 6/5/2020 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 06/05/2020 re: [125] FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper, Esq. dated May 29, 2020. . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: 6/5/2020 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Brille dated June 5, 2020 re: [125] FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper, Esq. dated May 29, 2020. . Document filed by Boies Schiller Flexner LLP..(Weill, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 127 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: 6/3/2020 Amended Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM amending [117] Amended Complaint against All Defendants.Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. Related document: [117] Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P).(Oren, Kristine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 126 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: 6/1/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: [125] FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper, Esq. dated May 29, 2020. filed by Alan Dershowitz. The Court is in receipt of Defendant Alan Dershowitz's request for a pre-motion conference on a motion to compel Boies Schiller Flexner LLP ("BSF") to produce documents requested in a Rule 45 subpoena that was served on BSF on December 5, 2019. (See dkt. no. 125.) BSF shall respond to Mr. Dershowitz's request no later than June 5, 2020. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 6/5/2020) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/1/2020) (va)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 125 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: 5/29/2020 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper, Esq. dated May 29, 2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 1, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 2, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 3, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 4, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 5, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 6, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 4, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 5).(Cooper, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 124 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [123] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [119] MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 6/16/2020. Replies due by 6/30/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/28/2020) (va)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 123 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020, Terminated: 5/28/2020 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [119] MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kristine C. Oren dated 05/27/2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Oren, Kristine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 122 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 05/19/2020 re: Motion To Dismiss Counterclaims. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 121 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Haley N. Proctor in Support re: [119] MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims.. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 Complaint, # (2) Exhibit 2 Amended Complaint, # (3) Exhibit 3 Answer with Counterclaims).(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 120 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [119] MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 119 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. Responses due by 6/2/2020.(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 118 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: 4/28/2020 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to [117] Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Virginia L. Giuffre. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P).(Kiely, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 117 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [116] Amended Complaint, [1] Complaint,, against Alan Dershowitz with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. Related document: [116] Amended Complaint, [1] Complaint,,..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Charles J Cooper to RE-FILE re: Document No. [116] Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; Add Virginia Giuffre to CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 116 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint,, against Alan Dershowitz with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. Related document: [1] Complaint,,..(Cooper, Charles) Modified on 4/15/2020 (pc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 115 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting [99] Motion to Amend/Correct. For the reasons detailed above, Giuffre's motion to amend [dkt. no. 99] is GRANTED. To the extent not addressed in this opinion, the Court considered Dershowitz's remaining arguments and found them unavailing. Giuffre is directed to file her First Amended Complaint by no later than April 15, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/8/2020) (va) (Main Document 115 replaced on 4/9/2020) (va). Modified on 4/9/2020 (va).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2020. (va)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 114 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [99] MOTION to Amend/Correct [1] Complaint,, . . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 113 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated February 7, 2020 re: Motion for Leave To File an Amended Complaint. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 112 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [99] MOTION to Amend/Correct [1] Complaint,, . . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Oren, Kristine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 111 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: 1/23/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [110] Letter, filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant may file an opposition of up to 25 pages. Plaintiff may have an additional five pages for her reply if necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/23/2020) (va)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 110 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: 1/23/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kristine C. Oren dated January 23, 2020 re: Request Pursuant to Individual Practice Rule 2.C Requesting Leave to File a Memorandum of Law of up to 25 Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Oren, Kristine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [108] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 1/24/2020 Replies due by 2/7/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/16/2020) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 108 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020, Terminated: 1/16/2020 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [99] MOTION to Amend/Correct [1] Complaint,, . addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kristine C. Oren dated 1/16/2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Oren, Kristine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 107 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020, Terminated: 5/5/2020 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [99] MOTION to Amend/Correct [1] Complaint,, . addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kristine C. Oren dated 1/15/2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Oren, Kristine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [105] Motion for Kristine Chappen Oren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/3/2020) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [105] MOTION for Kristine Chappen Oren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18409777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [105] MOTION for Kristine Chappen Oren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18409777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020, Terminated: 1/3/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Kristine Chappen Oren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18409777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Oren, Kristine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 104 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AGREED ORDER: Based on the parties agreement, it is hereby ORDERED that the microcassette tape produced by Defendant to Stroz Friedberg and currently in Stroz Friedberg's possession shall be promptly turned over to the forensic firm of CDS Legal for whatever analysis either party requests and pays for. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/23/2019) (va)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 103 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated December 23, 2019 re: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Kiely, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 102 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Counsel dated 12/23/2019 re: Audio Recording. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 101 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Haley N. Proctor in Support re: [99] MOTION to Amend/Correct [1] Complaint,, .. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A Proposed Amended Complaint, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B Redlined Proposed Amended Complaint, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C Transcript)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 100 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [99] MOTION to Amend/Correct [1] Complaint,, . . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 99 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019, Terminated: 4/8/2020 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct [1] Complaint,, . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 98 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated December 20, 2019 re: Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/2/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 96 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/2/2019 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 12/2/2019. (Court Reporter Present) (mph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 95 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that the time within which Plaintiff Virginia L. Giuffre may move, answer, or otherwise respond to Defendant Alan Dershowitz's counterclaims is hereby extended up to and including: (1) December 20, 2019, if Plaintiff elects not to move to amend the Complaint on or before that date, (2) if Plaintiff moves to amend the Complaint and the Court denies such motion, 21 days after the Court enters the denial, or (3) if the Court grants a motion to amend the Complaint, 21 days after Defendant serves his amended answer and counterclaims. The parties further stipulate that Defendant's time to respond to a motion to amend the Complaint or to dismiss the counterclaims, filed on or before December 20, 2019, is hereby extended up to and including January 17, 2020. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Plaintiff expressly reserves, any and all defenses. The original deadline for Plaintiff to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the counterclaims was November 29, 2019. There has been no previous request for extension of time in connection with Plaintiff's response to the counterclaims or Defendant's response to a motion to amend the Complaint or to dismiss the counterclaims. Virginia L. Giuffre answer due 12/20/2019. (Motions due by 12/30/2019., Responses due by 1/17/2020.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/25/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 94 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Proctor, Haley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 93 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Moss, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 92 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Counsel dated 11/20/2019 re: Electronic Device Request. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Proctor, Haley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 91 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: In advance of the conference scheduled for December 2, 2019, counsel shall submit their discovery plan by no later than 12:00 pm on Wednesday, November 27, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/15/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 90 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Virginia L. Giuffre. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P)(Kiely, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 89 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The Court has conferred with counsel for both parties. The currently scheduled conference will remain on December 2, 2019 at 9:00 AM. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/6/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [87] Motion for Nicole Jo Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/6/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 87 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019, Terminated: 11/6/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Nicole Jo Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17897934. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Nicole J. Moss, # (2) Exhibit Maryland Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit North Carolina Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, # (5) Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Moss, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 86 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Because Plaintiff has engaged new counsel, counsel shall confer with each other and with the Court's deputy regarding a date earlier than December 2 for a conference and shall submit their discovery plan in advance of the conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/5/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 85 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [71] Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. Defendant's request for pre-Answer discovery is denied on the following grounds: 1. Defendant has not made any showing that pre-Answer discovery is necessary - and not just helpful - to his preparation of an Answer and/or Counterclaims. 2. Defendant has not provided the Court with any justification for departing from the Court-ordered unsealing process in Giuffre v. Maxwell. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/5/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [87] MOTION for Nicole Jo Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17897934. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 84 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 11/04/2019 re: Pre-Answer Discovery and Audio Recording. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [78] Motion for Haley Marie Nix Proctor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/4/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [77] Motion for Michael William Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/4/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [76] Motion for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/4/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 80 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran H. Ansari, Esq. dated 11/4/19 re: Reply/Response to Letter Filed by Plaintiff re: Audio Recording. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 79 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated November 1, 2019 re: Audio Recording. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 78 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019, Terminated: 11/4/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Haley Marie Nix Proctor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17869086. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Haley N. Proctor, # (2) Exhibit Oklahoma Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit Virginia Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, # (5) Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Proctor, Haley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019, Terminated: 11/4/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Michael William Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17868876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Michael W. Kirk, # (2) Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Kirk, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019, Terminated: 11/4/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17868673. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Charles J. Cooper, # (2) Exhibit Alabama Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Exhibit Georgia Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, # (5) Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [78] MOTION for Haley Marie Nix Proctor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17869086. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [77] MOTION for Michael William Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17868876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [76] MOTION for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17868673. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 75 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/30/19 re: Response to Letter Filed by John Doe. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 74 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [73] Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's time to serve a responsive pleading is extended to November 7. To avoid further delay, counsel shall confer with plaintiff's current counsel on this rather ministerial matter. SO ORDERED. Alan Dershowitz answer due 11/7/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/30/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 73 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/30/2019 re: Request for Extension of Time to File Answer and Counterclaims. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 72 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019 Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER with respect to [71] Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. Counsel shall confer with Plaintiff's counsel. If Plaintiff's counsel disagrees, he or she may inform the Court by letter no later than November 4. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/25/2019) (ks) Modified on 11/26/2019 (ks).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 71 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019, Terminated: 11/5/2019 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re: Pre-Answer Discovery addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated October 24, 2019. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. Return Date set for 10/29/2019 at 05:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Kiely, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 70 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [69] Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/23/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 69 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/18/19 re: Request for Adjournment of November 20, 2019 Rule 16 Conference. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 68 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPINION AND ORDER: re: [7] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. filed by Alan Dershowitz, [22] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. filed by Alan Dershowitz. Defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint [dkt. no. 22] is denied. Defendant's motion to disqualify the law firm of Boies Schiller Flexner LLP [dkt. no. 7] is granted. New counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant shall confer and submit a proposed discovery plan no later than November 13. Counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference on November 20 at 11:00 A.M. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/16/2019) (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 66 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [65] Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: Prof. Dershowitz shall forthwith turn over the microcassette to the Stroz Friedberg firm for whatever analysis the parties order and pay for. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/10/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 65 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran H. Ansari dated October 10, 2019 re: Audio Recording. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 64 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Sigrid McCawley dated October 3, 2019 re: Response to Defendant Letter (DE 61). Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(McCawley, Sigrid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 63 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/03/19 re: Correction to Post-Argument Letter. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 62 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/03/19 re: * TITLE CORRECTION* Post Argument Letter re: Motion to Disqualify AND MOTION TO DISMISS. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 61 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/03/2019 re: Post Argument Letter re: Motion to Disqualify. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 60 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [54] Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel may submit a three-page, double spaced letter in 12-point type no later that October 3 at 9:00am. Plaintiff may submit a similar letter no later than 5:00pm on October 4. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/2/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/01/2019 re: Reply in Support of Request for Leave to File a Post-Argument Submission. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 58 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Sigrid McCawley dated October 1, 2019 re: Plaintiff's Objection to DE 54. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(McCawley, Sigrid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 57 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [55] Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 56 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Defendant's counsel shall forthwith turn over the tape recording of Mr. Boies discussed at last week's oral argument to Stroz Friedberg or a similar digital forensic firm for whatever analysis either party requests and pays for. The digital forensic firm shall forthwith produce a copy of the tape recording to counsel for each party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 55 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/01/2019 re: Objection to Release of Audio Tape. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/01/2019 re: Request for Leave to File a Post-Argument letter to Clarify and Provide Factual Information. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: 9/26/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Sigrid McCawley dated September 26, 2019 re: Sealed Document DE 50. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(McCawley, Sigrid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: 9/26/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [50] Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/25/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated September 25, 2019 re: Request for Order to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Sept 24, 2019 hearing. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Oral Argument held on 9/24/2019 re: [7] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. filed by Alan Dershowitz, [22] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski) (mph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: It is the Court's intention to hold a separate argument with respect to the Confidential Memorandum referred to in this Court's July 17, 2019 order [dkt. no. 41]. The Court will ask Professor Dershowitz how disclosure of the Memorandum to the Boise Schiller Firm ("BSF") could result in any detriment to him and will ask BSF to specify how the contents of the Memorandum have been made public. The Court is willing to meet separately with the parties, if necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/18/2019) (mml) Modified on 9/18/2019 (mml).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 48 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the oral argument scheduled for September 24, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. is adjourned to September 24, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Oral Argument set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/18/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 Order on Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [46] Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: The argument is adjourned to September 24 at 9:0am in Courtroom 12A. (Oral Argument set for 9/24/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/5/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019, Terminated: 9/5/2019 Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Disqualify addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 9/5/19. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. Return Date set for 9/11/2019 at 11:00 AM.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [44] Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 9/11/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/15/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 8/14/19 re: Oral argument adjournment. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: 8/5/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Counsel shall appear for oral argument on the motion to disqualify and the motion to dismiss on September 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 12A. SO ORDERED. Oral Argument set for 9/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/5/2019) (mml)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: [39] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Alan Dershowitz. Pursuant to footnote 5 of his reply brief on the motion to disqualify [dkt. no. 39], Defendant is directed to file the Confidential Memorandum under seal for the Court's in camera review. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/17/2019) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [22] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cooper, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: 7/10/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [7] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALAN DERSHOWITZ, # (2) Exhibit EMAIL FROM SIRES TO DERSHOWITZ, # (3) Exhibit EMAIL FROM SIRES TO DERSHOWITZ, # (4) Exhibit DAILY MAIL ARTICLE)(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [22] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Schiller, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [30] Motion for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/3/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Joshua I. Schiller in Opposition re: [7] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff.. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16)(Schiller, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of David Boies in Opposition re: [7] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff.. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Schiller, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Prof. Roy D. Simon, Jr. in Opposition re: [7] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff.. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Schiller, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [7] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Schiller, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [31] Letter filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/3/2019) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Joshua I. Schiller dated July 2, 2019 re: Length of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Disqualify. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Schiller, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [30] MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17176235. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019, Terminated: 7/8/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17176235. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration, # (2) Exhibit COGS, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McCawley, Sigrid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [27] Motion for Christian G. Kiely to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/27/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [26] Motion for Howard M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/26/2019) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019, Terminated: 6/27/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Christian G. Kiely to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Christian G. Kiely, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order for Admission)(Kiely, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019, Terminated: 6/26/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Howard M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Howard M. Cooper, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission)(Cooper, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [27] MOTION for Christian G. Kiely to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [26] MOTION for Howard M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [25] MOTION for Christian G. Kiely to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17138926. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [21] MOTION for Howard M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17138693. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Massachusetts; missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019, Terminated: 6/26/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Christian G. Kiely to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17138926. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Christian G. Kiely)(Kiely, Christian) Modified on 6/26/2019 (wb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Michelle Proctus in Support re: [22] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H)(Cooper, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [22] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Cooper, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019, Terminated: 10/16/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. Responses due by 7/9/2019(Cooper, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019, Terminated: 6/26/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Howard M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17138693. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Howard M. Cooper)(Cooper, Howard) Modified on 6/26/2019 (wb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [19] FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Law in Support of a Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated June 25, 2019. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/25/2019) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019, Terminated: 6/25/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Law in Support of a Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated June 25, 2019. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: 6/20/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [17] Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to [7] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff: Responses due by 7/3/2019, Replies due by 7/10/2019.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/19/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: 6/19/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated June 19, 2019 re: Motion Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: [15] Letter filed by Virginia L. Giuffre: Following review of Mr. Schiller's letter dated June 17, 2019 [dkt no. 15], it is hereby ordered that: 1) Mr. Dershowitz is excused from the requirement for a premotion conference on the Court's finding that such a conference would be futile; 2) Mr. Dershowitz's motion to disqualify the Boise Schiller firm [dkt. nos. 7-11] is reinstated to the calendar; 3) Mr. Dershowitz may file a memorandum of law of 28 pages; and 4) Counsel shall confer and inform the Court by letter of the proposed briefing schedule. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/17/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Joshua I. Schiller dated June 17, 2019 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference re: Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Schiller, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: 6/12/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Arthur L. Aidala dated June 12, 2019 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference re: Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Aidala, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019 Order on Motion to Disqualify CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on: [12] LETTER terminating [7] Motion to Disqualify Counsel. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Dershowitz's motion to disqualify [dkt. no. 8-10] is marked off the calendar for failure to comply with the Court's Individual Practice Rule. 2.1. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/11/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Joshua I. Schiller dated 6/11/2019 re: Defendant Dershowitz's Motion to Disqualify. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Schiller, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. Related Document Number: [7]. (Aidala, Arthur) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 Declaration in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Alan Dershowitz in Support re: [7] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff.. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SDNY Complaint, # (2) Exhibit Letter to BSF, # (3) Exhibit Email from Schiller, # (4) Exhibit Daily Mail Article, # (5) Exhibit Freeh's Report, # (6) Exhibit Cassell and Edwards Statement, # (7) Exhibit Decision of Judge Marra, # (8) Exhibit Emails btwn Dershowitz and Sires, # (9) Exhibit Gravante Letter, # (10) Exhibit McMahon Decision)(Aidala, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Bruce A. Green in Support re: [7] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff.. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) CV of Bruce Green)(Aidala, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [7] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Aidala, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019, Terminated: 10/16/2019 Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Aidala, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur Louis Aidala on behalf of Alan Dershowitz. (Aidala, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Imran H. Ansari on behalf of Alan Dershowitz. (Ansari, Imran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. [11] Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alan Dershowitz. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Designated ECF. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Schiller. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $75,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Schiller. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: VIRGINIA L. GIUFFRE, Alan M. Dershowitz. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schiller, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALAN DERSHOWITZ, re: [1] Complaint,,. Document filed by VIRGINIA L. GIUFFRE. (Schiller, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Alan M. Dershowitz. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16706500)Document filed by VIRGINIA L. GIUFFRE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1_Article, # (2) Exhibit 2_Article, # (3) Exhibit 3_Article, # (4) Exhibit 4_Article, # (5) Exhibit 5_Article, # (6) Exhibit 6_Social Media Post, # (7) Exhibit 7_Letter, # (8) Exhibit 8_Article, # (9) Exhibit 9_Article, # (10) Exhibit 10_Article, # (11) Exhibit 11_Article, # (12) Exhibit 12_Affidavit, # (13) Exhibit 13_Affidavit, # (14) Exhibit 14_Affidavit, # (15) Exhibit 15_E-Mail, # (16) Exhibit 16_Article)(Schiller, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 243 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?