PIEL v. VOYLES, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-01266-SMO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SUSAN D. PIEL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space URI H TAENZER +1 856 235 1234 taenzeru@juno.com
v.
No Logo E. ELAINE VOYLES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by attorney.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin J. Siegel +1 609 678 6700 martysiegel@siegelattorney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM W. VOORHEES, JR. +1 973 267 6677 legalmalpractice@att.net
No Logo JEANNE M. HANSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by attorney.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin J. Siegel +1 609 678 6700 martysiegel@siegelattorney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM W. VOORHEES, JR. +1 973 267 6677 legalmalpractice@att.net
No Logo THE LAW FIRM OF DOROSHOW & PASQUALE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by attorney.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin J. Siegel +1 609 678 6700 martysiegel@siegelattorney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM W. VOORHEES, JR. +1 973 267 6677 legalmalpractice@att.net
No Logo WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, Arbitrator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 3/19/1996
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 8/25/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER transfering unclaimed monies to the Treasury of the United States. (signed by Chief Judge John W. Bissell ) (NM) (ij)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: 8/25/1997 Terminated Case
    Case closed (jm1)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: 8/25/1997 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER, dismissing case as settled without cost and without prejudice ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (jm1)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Certificate of Cash Deposit
        CLERKS CERT. OF DEPOSIT to cover costs of filing demand for trial denovo by the Plaintiff, Susan D. Piel, IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 150.00 FILED (AC)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Request for Trial De Novo
          REQUEST for trial de novo by the Plaintiff, SUSAN D. PIEL. (AC)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Order Referring Case to ArbitrationCourt Filing
            ORDER Appointing Arbitrator WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, ESQ.: Arbitration hearing set for 9:30 4/8/97 (Signed by Chief Judge Anne E. Thompson) (NM) (MB)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 1/14/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: scheduling arbitration for a date in March, 1997. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 7/29/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                TRACK ONE ORDER OF DESIGNATION signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler FILED (ar1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 7/29/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Amending of pleadings on 9/1/96 ; Discovery cutoff 11/29/96 ; Status conference 2:00 12/4/96 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 4/18/97 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/8/1996 Scheduling Conference
                    Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/2/96. (ar1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/20/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER, set scheduling conference for 11:30 7/2/96 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/20/1996, Terminated: 8/25/1997 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint by defendants E. ELAINE VOYLES, JEANNE M. HANSON, DOROSHOW & PASQUALE; jury demand (ar1)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/19/1996 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                          STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time answer , set answer due for 5/20/96 for DOROSHOW & PASQUALE, for JEANNE M. HANSON, for E. ELAINE VOYLES ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 Summons Returned Executed
                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to JEANNE M. HANSON 3/29/96 Answer due on 4/18/96 for JEANNE M. HANSON (ar1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 Summons Returned Executed
                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to E. ELAINE VOYLES 3/27/96 Answer due on 4/16/96 for E. ELAINE VOYLES (ar1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 Summons Returned Executed
                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to DOROSHOW & PASQUALE 3/27/96 Answer due on 4/16/96 for DOROSHOW & PASQUALE (Personally Served) (ar1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/19/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                  NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate ROBERT B. KUGLER (femp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/19/1996 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 219263 (femp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/19/1996 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                      CASE REFERRED to arbitration (femp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/19/1996 Summons Issued
                                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for E. ELAINE VOYLES, JEANNE M. HANSON, DOROSHOW & PASQUALE ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (femp)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 136 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?