Tesla, Inc. v. Hothi
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG19015770

Tags

Reality Check: Tesla, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 7, 2020 article Reality Check: Tesla, Inc..

Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cross, Matt, Petitioner
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Petitioner
No Logo Hothi, Randeep, Respondent
No Logo Alinder, Zachary J, Attorney
No Logo Illovsky, Eugene, Attorney
No Logo Sperlein, D Gill, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type WV-100 Petition for Orders to Stop Workplace Violence
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 68 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None ?
Motion for Attorney Fees Denied (4 Pages)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None ?
    Motion for Attorney Fees Taken Under Submission (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None ?
      Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 65 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None ?
        Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 511 date: 10/01/2019 time: 09:00 AM
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None ?
          Motion for Attorney Fees - Motion Rescheduled (3 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None ?
            Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 62 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None ?
              Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 09/05/2019 09:00 AM D- 507
                Legal Document 61 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                Proof of Service by Mail Filed (2 Pages)
                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                  Reply to Opposition to Respondent Mtn for Reasonable Expenses Filed (8 Pages)
                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                    Proof of Service by Mail Filed (1 Page)
                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                      Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees Filed (3 Pages)
                        Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                        Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees Filed (14 Pages)
                          Blank 56 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                          Motion for Attorney Fees Hearing Confirmed for 09/05/2019 09:00 AM D- 511
                            Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                            Motion for Attorney Fees Filed for Respondent (136 Pages)
                              Blank 54 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                              Hearing Reset to Motion for Attorney Fees 09/05/2019 09:00 AM D- 511
                                Blank 53 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                Motion for Attorney Fees Reservation Set for dept: 511 date: 09/03/2019 time: 09:00 AM
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                  Motion - Dropped (3 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                    Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 49 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Dropped
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered (2 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 47 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 08/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 512
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed (2 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                Proof of Service by Mail Filed (1 Page)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  Letter re Filed (2 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    Proof of Service by Mail Filed (1 Page)
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      Filed (2 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        Order on Motion to Clarify Order of 7/1/19 on Requests for Discovery Filed (5 Pages)
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          Proof of Service by Mail Filed (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                            Letter from Boersch & Illovsky LLP dated July 17, 2019 Filed (2 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                              Proof of Service by Mail Filed (1 Page)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                Letter dated July 12, 2019 to Judge Brand Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: (3 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Protective Order Filed (35 Pages)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Motion Hearing Confirmed for 08/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 511
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Motion Filed by Tesla, Inc. (10 Pages)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Proof of Service POS on respondent's Opposition Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                            re: Opposition to mtn ... Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Stay Reservation Set for dept: 511 date: 07/15/2019 time: 09:15 AM
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Substitution of Attorney Filed for Tesla, Inc. (2 Pages)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Substitution of Attorney Filed for Tesla, Inc. (2 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Order on Requests for Discovery Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Letter Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Letter from Law Office of D. Gill Sperlein Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                          Letter to the Judge Filed (7 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Letter dated Filed (11 Pages)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Proof of Service by Mail Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Letter dated May 23rd, 2019 Filed (32 Pages)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Civil Harassment 07/26/2019 01:30 PM D- 511
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Reissuance of Temporary Restraining Order Granted (3 Pages)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      Reissuance of Temporary Restraining Order Granted (3 Pages)
                                                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                                                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Proof of Service Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Petitioner (2 Pages)
                                                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              Supplemental Declaration in Support of Christine Leslie re Reply Memorandum Filed (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                Declaration in Support of Zachary J. Alinder re Reply Memorandum Filed (14 Pages)
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum in Support of Restraining Order Filed (10 Pages)
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Proof of Service by Mail Response Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      Response to Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders Filed for Randeep Hothi (34 Pages)
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        Proof of Service - Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          Hearing Reset to Civil Harassment 05/21/2019 01:30 PM D- 511
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            Continue Hearing and Reissue Temporary Restraining Order (Workplace Violence) Granted (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              Proof of Service by Mail Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                Continue Hearing and Reissue Temporary Restraining Order (Workplace Violence) Filed by Respondent (145 Pages)
                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  Civil Harassment 05/07/2019 01:30 PM D- 511
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                    Temporary Restraining Order Granted (8 Pages)
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      Temporary Restraining Order (Workplace Violence Prevention) Received for Tesla, Inc. (10 Pages)
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                        Petition for Orders to Stop Workplace Violence Filed (21 Pages)

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 9,186 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?