District Appellate Supreme
Federal
District Of Columbia District Court Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit United States Supreme Court

TRUMP et al v. CUMMINGS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-01136-APM
District Judge Amit P. Mehta, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 12, 2021 at 8:35 PM DT (1.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DJT Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo TRUMP CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Trump Old Post Office LLC Trump Old Post Office LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Trump Organization, LLC Trump Organization, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
v.
No Logo ELIJAH E. CUMMINGS, Defendant
No Logo MAZARS USA LLP, Defendant
No Logo PETER KENNY, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/22/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/23/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Modify
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                  Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re [37] Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to [35] Order, [36] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-6135794. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                                          USCA Case Number 19-5142 for [37] Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC., DJT HOLDINGS LLC. (zrdj)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER. For the reasons stated in the [35] Memorandum Opinion, the court enters judgment in favor of the House Oversight Committee and against Plaintiffs. Please see the attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/20/2019. (lcapm3)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Appeal Record Sent to Supreme Court
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION entering judgment in favor of the House Oversight Committee and against Plaintiffs. Please see the attached Memorandum Opinion for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/20/2019. (lcapm3) Modified document type on 5/21/2019 (zjd).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Affidavit
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT Second Supplemental Declaration of William S. Consovoy by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF ORAL ARGUMENT PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on May 14, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-93. Date of Issuance: May 14, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2019.(wz)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine T. Morse on behalf of COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Morse, Josephine)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Oral Argument held on 5/14/2019 re [11] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Oral Motion by Intervenor Defendant for summary judgment on the pleadings. The record will be open until 5/18/2019. Intervenor Defendant's In-Camera Submission due by 5/16/2019. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re [25] Order filed by COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 Affidavit
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT Supplemental Declaration of William S. Consovoy by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                      RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re [25] Order filed by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER. The hearing will proceed tomorrow as scheduled. During the hearing, the court will take up the objections to its [25] Consolidation Order made in Plaintiffs' [29] Response to Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/13/2019. (lcapm3)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File An Amicus Brief by DUANE MORLEY COX (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jf)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence H. Wechsler on behalf of MAZARS USA LLP (Wechsler, Lawrence)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019, Terminated: 5/10/2019 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jerry D. Bernstein, :Firm- Blank Rome LLP, :Address- 1271 Avenue of the Americas. Phone No. - (212) 885-5511. Fax No. - (917) 332-3766 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6116867. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MAZARS USA LLP (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Jerry D. Bernstein, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Bernstein Decl. Ex. A (Proposed Order))(Schuelke, Henry)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [26] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jerry D. Bernstein is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant Mazars USA LLP. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/10/2019. (lcapm3)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/9/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER notifying the parties that the court intends to advance [11] Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction to trial on the merits. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/09/2019. (lcapm3)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Objections and/or Supplemental Memoranda due by 5/13/2019 at 5:00 pm. (zjd)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Objections and/or Supplemental Memoranda due by 5/13/2019 at 5:00 pm. (zjd)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [11] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re [11] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MAZARS USA LLP. (Schuelke, Henry)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                            LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MAZARS USA LLP (Schuelke, Henry)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Frederick Schuelke, III on behalf of MAZARS USA LLP (Schuelke, Henry)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re [11] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Greta G. Gao, # (2) Exhibit A to Declaration of Greta G. Gao, # (3) Exhibit B to Declaration of Greta G. Gao)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks McKinly Hanner on behalf of COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Hanner, Brooks)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Barbero on behalf of COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Barbero, Megan)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Tatelman, Todd)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Waiver of Service
                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE by DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC., DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, DJT HOLDINGS LLC. MAZARS USA LLP waiver sent on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Order on motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [12] Consent Motion to have Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives Intervene as Defendant. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/29/2019. (lcapm3)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019, Terminated: 4/29/2019 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Oppositions due by 5/1/2019. Replies due by 5/8/2019. Oral Argument for 5/14/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. Consistent with the parties' joint scheduling submission, the court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter. Intervenor-Defendant Committee on Oversight and Reform agrees to postpone the return date on its subpoena to Mazars USA, LLP until seven days after the court rules on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Intervenor-Defendant Committee on Oversight and Reform's and Mazars USA LLP's Opposition(s), if any, shall be filed by Wednesday, May 1, 2019. Plaintiffs' Replies shall be filed by May 8, 2019. Oral Argument is scheduled for May 14, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10. In addition, in light of the parties' agreed-upon schedule, Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Shorten Time, ECF No. 10, is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' Application for a Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. 9, is likewise denied as moot. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/23/2019. (lcapm3)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019, Terminated: 5/20/2019 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Declaration of William S. Consovoy, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019, Terminated: 4/23/2019 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION for Order Shortening Defendants' Time to Respond to TRO Application by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019, Terminated: 4/23/2019 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Declaration of William S. Consovoy, # (3) Text of Proposed Order, # (4) Local Rule 65.1(a) Certificate of Counsel)(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                        LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                          LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DJT HOLDINGS LLC (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 Summons Issued Electronically
                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ELIJAH E. CUMMINGS, PETER KENNY, MAZARS USA LLP. (Attachments: # (1) Notice and Consent)(zef, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                              LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRUMP CORPORATION (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                                LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                                  LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 Request for Summons to Issue
                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Mazars USA LLP filed by DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, TRUMP ORGANIZATION, INC., DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP CORPORATION, DJT HOLDINGS LLC.(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6072689) filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons for Elijah E. Cummings, # (3) Summons for Peter Kenny)(Consovoy, William) Modified to add "All Plaintiffs" on 4/22/2019 (zef, ).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 475 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?