WOODS, et al v. PENNSYLVANIA RETIRED, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-01498-SMO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLES WOODS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Cuker & Berezofsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Haverty +1 856 667 0500 +1 856 667 5133 khaverty@wcblegal.com
No Logo LILLIAN WOODS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Cuker & Berezofsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Haverty +1 856 667 0500 +1 856 667 5133 khaverty@wcblegal.com
v.
No Logo J.V. MESZAROS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Margolis Edelstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space COLLEEN M. READY +1 856 858 7200 cready@margolisedelstein.com
No Logo JANE ROES #1-5, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-5, Defendant
No Logo PENNSYLVANIA RETIRED PERSONS PHARMACY, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Margolis Edelstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space COLLEEN M. READY +1 856 858 7200 cready@margolisedelstein.com
No Logo WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, Arbitrator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 3/29/1996
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 5/9/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: 5/9/1997 Terminated Case
Case closed (ar1)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 5/8/1997, Entered: 5/9/1997 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice and without costs. (ar1)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Order Referring Case to ArbitrationCourt Filing
      ORDER Appointing Arbitrator WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, ESQ.; Arbitration hearing set for 11:00 4/8/97 (Signed by Chief Judge Anne Thompson) (NM) (MB)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: setting Amending of pleadings on 9/30/96 ; Discovery cutoff 10/31/96 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 1/31/97 and scheduling arbitration for date in March, 1997. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Scheduling Conference
          Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/24/96. (ar1)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 6/18/1996, Entered: 6/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER, set scheduling conference for 9:30 7/24/96 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/18/1996 Answer
              ANSWER to Complaint by defendants PENNSYLVANIA RETIRED, J.V. MESZAROS; jury demand (ar1)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/18/1996 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time to answer , set answer due for 7/8/96 for defendant J.V. MESZAROS, for defendant PENNSYLVANIA RETIRED ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 3/29/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate ROBERT B. KUGLER (et)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 3/29/1996 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 219331 (et)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 3/29/1996 Case Referred to Arbitration
                      CASE REFERRED to arbitration (et)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 3/29/1996 Summons Issued
                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for PENNSYLVANIA RETIRED, J.V. MESZAROS ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (et)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 64 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?