WEINER v. GERBER PRODUCTS CO.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-01759-SMO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BARRI NICOLE WEINER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lomurro, Davison, Eastman and Muñoz, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER L. MASNIK +1 856 428 5222 +1 856 354 8086 pmasnik@aol.com
v.
No Logo Gerber Products Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "GERBER PRODUCTS CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
Office Camden
Filed 4/2/1996
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to State Court
County Burlington
Terminated 9/23/1996
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case L-00547-96[SUP.CT.BURL.CNTY.]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, RULE16
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 9/30/1996 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 9/20/96; The following actions were taken, granting [6-1] motion to remand case to Burlington County Superior Court By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/23/1996, Entered: 9/23/1996 Terminated Case
    Case closed (ar1)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: 9/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
      Letter Opinion and Order granting plaintiff's 6-1] motion to remand case to Burlington County Superior Court ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Affidavit
        AFFIDAVIT by J. PATRICK DOYLE on behalf of GERBER PRODUCTS CO. Re [6-1] motion to remand case to Burlington County Superior Court (jm1)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996, Terminated: 9/20/1996 Motion to RemandCourt Filing
          Notice of MOTION to remand case to Burlington County Superior Court by BARRI NICOLE WEINER [6-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 9/20/96 on [6-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (jm1)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/5/1996 Letter
            LETTER By Peter L. Masnik, Esquire for plaintiff BARRI NICOLE WEINER; re: Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in support of motion to remand. (ar1)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 4/8/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 Answer
              ANSWER to Complaint by GERBER PRODUCTS CO.; jury demand (ar1)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER, set scheduling conference for 2:00 5/15/96 ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (et)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/3/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (et)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/3/1996 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT filed in Superior Court Burlington County on or about February 28, 1996, docket #L-00547-96; jury demand (et)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/3/1996 Notice of Removal
                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GERBER PRODUCTS CO. Filed with the following state court proceedings, A]Complaint, etc. FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 219349 (et)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 75 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?