District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

Donald J. Trump et al v. Deutsche Bank, AG et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-03826-ER
District Judge Edgardo Ramos, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 21, 2021 at 12:58 PM DT (4.1 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DJT Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 951 2830 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 951 2830 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 951 2830 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump, Jr."

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 951 2830 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo Trump, Eric, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Eric Trump"

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 951 2830 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Ivanka Trump"

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 951 2830 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo The Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 951 2830 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "The Trump Organization, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 951 2830 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo Trump Acquisition LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 951 2830 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo Trump Acquisition, Corp., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 951 2830 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
Trump Organization, LLC Trump Organization, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 951 2830 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
v.
Capital One Financial Corporation Capital One Financial Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Capital One Financial Corp."
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant
Officer/Director, Tower Automotive, Inc.
Officer/Director, Nrp, Inc.
Officer/Director, PAC West Telecomm, Inc.
Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. Officer/Director, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Officer/Director, Briazz, Inc.
Officer/Director, Dsl.net, Inc.
Officer/Director, Blockbuster, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hutchinson Technology Inc.
Officer/Director, Korea Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Brazilian Equity Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Future Germany Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Brazil Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Kemper High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Solv Ex Corp
Officer/Director, Desert Native Designs Inc
Officer/Director, Newmark Homes Corp
Officer/Director, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Officer/Director, Doblique Inc
Officer/Director, Mesa Airlines Inc
Officer/Director, Emerson Radio Corp
Officer/Director, Terrapin 3 Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Red Rock Resorts, Inc.
Officer/Director, Emachines Inc /de/
Officer/Director, First Philippine Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Rreef America L.l.c.
Officer/Director, Id Arizona Corp.
Officer/Director, DB Municipal Holdings LLC
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/29/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 12 U.S.C. § 3410 Right to Financial Privacy
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (107) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/20/2021, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/23/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 63 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 USCA Order - Other
                                      OPINION of USCA (Certified Copy) as to [60] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,, filed by Trump Acquisition LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Ivanka Trump, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Acquisition, Corp., Eric Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., DJT Holdings LLC, Trump Organization LLC, Donald J. Trump. USCA Case Number 19-1540-cv. This opinion considers motions by several news organizations to intervene in a pending appeal and to unseal an unredacted letter filed in this Court on August 27, 2019, under seal in that appeal. See Trump v. Deutsche Bank, AG, No. 19. 1540 (2d Cir. argued Aug. 23, 2019). The letter was filed by Deutsche Bank AG in an appeal from an Order denying a preliminary injunction sought by President Donald J. Trump, members of his family, and several affiliated entities ("Appellants") to prevent compliance with subpoenas issued to Deutsche Bank and Capital One Financial Corporation by two committees of the United States House of Representatives. The subpoenas seek production of numerous documents, including tax returns. The appeal is still pending. Unsealing the letter is sought to learn the redacted names of taxpayers whose income tax returns are in Deutsche Bank's possession. Appellants in the pending appeal and Deutsche Bank oppose the motion. The motions to intervene are GRANTED; the motions for unsealing are DENIED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 10/10/2019. (nd)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 62 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [61] Motion to Stay. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/28/2019) (kv) Modified on 8/30/2019 (kv).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  USCA Case Number
                                              USCA Case Number 19-1540 from the U.S.C.A. - 2nd Circ. assigned to [60] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,, filed by Trump Acquisition LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Ivanka Trump, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Acquisition, Corp., Eric Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., DJT Holdings LLC, Trump Organization LLC, Donald J. Trump. (nd)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                USCA Case Number 19-1540 from the U.S.C.A. - 2nd Circ. assigned to [60] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,, filed by Trump Acquisition LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Ivanka Trump, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Acquisition, Corp., Eric Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., DJT Holdings LLC, Trump Organization LLC, Donald J. Trump. (nd)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 5/25/2019, Entered: 5/25/2019, Terminated: 5/28/2019 Motion To Stay
                                                    JOINT MOTION to Stay . Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 60 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                                        NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from [59] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16950902. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
                                                            Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for [60] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Trump Acquisition LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Ivanka Trump, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Acquisition, Corp., Eric Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., DJT Holdings LLC, Trump Organization LLC, Donald J. Trump were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: [60] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER: denying [26] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons set forth on the record in today's hearing, Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED, Plaintiffs' motion for a stay pending appeal is DENIED, and the Committees' application for consolidation is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 26. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/22/2019) (ama)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [37] Motion for Thomas C. Moyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Appeal Remark
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [36] Motion for Raphael A. Prober to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [35] Motion for Steven R. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                    NOTICE of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House of Representatives, Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Opinion, # (2) Exhibit Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 54 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: 5/15/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [26] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc.. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [52] Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a 15-page reply brief. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 52 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019, Terminated: 5/14/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                            CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Patrick Strawbridge dated 5/13/2019. Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 51 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: [26] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House of Representatives, Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Todd B. Tatelman, # (2) Exhibit Ex. A to Declaration of Todd B. Tatelman, # (3) Exhibit Ex. B to Declaration of Todd B. Tatelman)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Josephine Morse on behalf of Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House of Representatives, Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives. (Morse, Josephine)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brooks M Hanner on behalf of Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House of Representatives, Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives. (Hanner, Brooks)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan Barbero on behalf of Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House of Representatives, Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives. (Barbero, Megan)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House of Representatives, Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives. (Tatelman, Todd)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 46 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re: [26] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Capital One Financial Corp.. (Murphy, James)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re: [26] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Defendant Deutsche Bank AG's Statement of Position as to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Deutsche Bank, AG. (Ross, Steven)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [43] Letter, filed by Trump Acquisition LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Ivanka Trump, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Acquisition, Corp., Eric Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., DJT Holdings LLC, Trump Organization LLC, Donald J. Trump. ENDORSEMENT: The conference previously scheduled for May 9, 2019, is hereby terminated. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/8/2019) (kv)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Patrick Strawbridge dated 05/08/2019 re: Withdrawing Letter Motion for Conference. Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING INTERVENOR-DEFENDANTS' CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME granting [41] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is SO ORDERED that the consent motion of intervenor-defendants Committee on Financial Services and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives for a 24-hour extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' May 3, 2019 letter is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/7/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rro)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019, Terminated: 5/7/2019 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Douglas N. Letter, General Counsel, U.S. House of Representatives dated 05/07/2019. Document filed by Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House of Representatives, Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from James A. Murphy dated May 7, 2019 re: Statement of Position. Document filed by Capital One Financial Corp..(Murphy, James)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Neal Letter on behalf of Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House of Representatives, Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Steven R. Ross dated May 7, 2019 re: Statement of Position. Document filed by Deutsche Bank, AG.(Ross, Steven)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
                                                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. [29] Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                        >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [35] MOTION for Steven R. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16820370. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [36] MOTION for Raphael A. Prober to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16820786. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [37] MOTION for Thomas C. Moyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16820815. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019, Terminated: 5/21/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Thomas C. Moyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16820815. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank, AG. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Thomas C. Moyer, # (2) District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Virginia Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Moyer, Thomas)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019, Terminated: 5/21/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Raphael A. Prober to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16820786. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank, AG. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Raphael A. Prober, # (2) District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) New York Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Prober, Raphael)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019, Terminated: 5/21/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Steven R. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16820370. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank, AG. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Steven R. Ross, # (2) District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Steven)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Deutsche Bank, AG.(Moyne, Parvin)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Parvin Daphne Moyne on behalf of Deutsche Bank, AG. (Moyne, Parvin)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [30] Letter Motion for Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on Thursday, May 9, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. Defendants are directed to submit a response to Plaintiffs' letter by close of business Tuesday, May 7, 2019. It is SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 5/9/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/3/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE OF COMMITTEE ON FINANCIAL SERVICES OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES AND PERMANENT SELECT COMMITTEE ON INTELLIGENCE OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES [25] Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. It is SO ORDERED that the motion of the proposed intervenor-defendants Committee on Financial Services and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives (Committees) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the intervenor-defendant Committees shall comply with the deadlines set forth in this Courts May 1, 2019 order setting a briefing schedule (ECF No. 22). (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/3/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019, Terminated: 5/3/2019 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding Limited Expedited Discovery addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Patrick Strawbridge dated 5/3/2019. Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc.. Related Document Number: [26]. (Strawbridge, Patrick) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Patrick Strawbridge in Support re: [26] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc.. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [26] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc.. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019, Terminated: 5/22/2019 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019, Terminated: 5/3/2019 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File intervention addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Douglas N. Letter, General Counsel, U.S. House of Representatives dated 5/3/2019. Document filed by Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House of Representatives, Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/7/2019 (jca)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Deutsche Bank, AG waiver sent on 4/30/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Document filed by Trump Organization, Inc.; Trump Acquisition, Corp.; Eric Trump; Trump Organization LLC; DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC; Donald J. Trump, Jr; DJT Holdings LLC; Donald J. Trump; Ivanka Trump; Trump Acquisition LLC; Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Lee Mukasey on behalf of DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc.. (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [21] motion SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/1/2019) (js) Modified on 5/2/2019 (js).
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019, Terminated: 5/1/2019 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule for Preliminary-Injunction Motion . Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Capital One Financial Corp. waiver sent on 4/30/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Document filed by Trump Organization, Inc.; Trump Acquisition, Corp.; Eric Trump; Trump Organization LLC; DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC; Donald J. Trump, Jr; DJT Holdings LLC; Donald J. Trump; Ivanka Trump; Trump Acquisition LLC; Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Capital One Financial Corp..(Feldman, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven David Feldman on behalf of Capital One Financial Corp.. (Feldman, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Alwin Murphy on behalf of Capital One Financial Corp.. (Murphy, James)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Motions due by 5/3/2019., Responses due by 5/10/2019, Replies due by 5/15/2019.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Oral Argument set for 5/22/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (js)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [12] Motion for William S. Consovoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [11] Motion for Patrick Strawbridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Capital One Financial Corp.. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deutsche Bank, AG. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                                                                                                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Patrick Strawbridge. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust; The Trump Organization, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Patrick Strawbridge. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 12:3410. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:2201. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [12] MOTION for William S. Consovoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16789731. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [11] MOTION for Patrick Strawbridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16789656. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019, Terminated: 4/30/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for William S. Consovoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16789731. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, The Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, The Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing (Virginia), # (3) Certificate of Good Standing (D.C.), # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019, Terminated: 4/30/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Patrick Strawbridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16789656. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, The Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, The Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing (Maine), # (3) Certificate of Good Standing (Massachusetts), # (4) Certificate of Good Standing (Connecticut), # (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trump Organization LLC.(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Trump Organization, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trump Acquisition LLC.(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trump Acquisition, Corp..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC.(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC.(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Capital One Financial Corp., re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, The Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, The Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deutsche Bank AG, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, The Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, The Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Jr, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank, AG, Capital One Financial Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16789203)Document filed by The Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Acquisition, Corp., Eric Trump, Trump Organization LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump, Jr, DJT Holdings LLC, Donald J. Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, The Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust.(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 310 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?