JERRY ENTERPRISES, et al v. F & A DISTRIBUTING, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-02347-SMO
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo 1501 LICENSING CORP., Plaintiff

Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT A. HOFFMAN +1 973 297 1484 +1 215 963 0838 rhoffman@barrack.com
No Logo Chef's International, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT A. HOFFMAN +1 973 297 1484 +1 215 963 0838 rhoffman@barrack.com
No Logo JACK N. BILL'S, INC., Plaintiff

Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT A. HOFFMAN +1 973 297 1484 +1 215 963 0838 rhoffman@barrack.com
No Logo JERRY ENTERPRISES OF GLOUCESTER COUNTY, INC., Plaintiff

Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT A. HOFFMAN +1 973 297 1484 +1 215 963 0838 rhoffman@barrack.com
No Logo TAGCO, INC., Plaintiff

Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT A. HOFFMAN +1 973 297 1484 +1 215 963 0838 rhoffman@barrack.com
v.
No Logo Allied Beverage Group, LLC, Defendant

Represented by D'ALESSANDRO, JACOVINO & GERSON, ESQS.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD G. D'ALESSANDRO, SR. +1 973 966 1910 egdjr@djglaw.com

Represented by Walder Hayden and Brogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS JAY SPIES +1 973 992 5300 tjspies@walderhayden.com
No Logo BANNER DISTRIBUTORS, Defendant

Represented by Walder Hayden and Brogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JUSTIN P. WALDER +1 973 992 5300 jpwalder@whbesqs.com
No Logo BAXTER GROUP, INC., Defendant

Represented by Walder Hayden and Brogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS JAY SPIES +1 973 992 5300 tjspies@walderhayden.com
Space JUSTIN P. WALDER +1 973 992 5300 jpwalder@whbesqs.com
No Logo DORCHESTER, INC., Defendant

Represented by Hellring, Lindeman, Goldstein & Siegal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD K. COPLON +1 973 621 9020 rkcoplon@hlgslaw.com
No Logo F & A DISTRIBUTING CO., INC., Defendant

Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DOUGLAS SCOTT EAKELEY +1 973 597 2500 deakeley@lowenstein.com
No Logo FEDERAL WINE & LIQUOR CO., Defendant

Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J. O'Shaughnessy +1 212 609 6800 +1 212 609 6921 woshaughnessy@mccarter.com
No Logo FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, INC., Defendant

Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J. O'Shaughnessy +1 212 609 6800 +1 212 609 6921 woshaughnessy@mccarter.com
No Logo FLAGSTAFF DISTRIBUTORS, Defendant

Represented by Walder Hayden and Brogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JUSTIN P. WALDER +1 973 992 5300 jpwalder@whbesqs.com
No Logo GATEWAY-PERRONE DISTRIBUTORS, Defendant

Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J. O'Shaughnessy +1 212 609 6800 +1 212 609 6921 woshaughnessy@mccarter.com
No Logo HOFFMAN IMPORT AND DISTRIBUTING CO., Defendant

Represented by Hellring, Lindeman, Goldstein & Siegal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD K. COPLON +1 973 621 9020 rkcoplon@hlgslaw.com
No Logo INTERNATIONAL VINTNERS, Defendant

Represented by Hellring, Lindeman, Goldstein & Siegal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD K. COPLON +1 973 621 9020 rkcoplon@hlgslaw.com
No Logo J&j Distributing Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "J&J DISTRIBUTING CO."

Represented by Hellring, Lindeman, Goldstein & Siegal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD K. COPLON +1 973 621 9020 rkcoplon@hlgslaw.com
No Logo JAYDOR CORPORATION, Defendant

Represented by Hellring, Lindeman, Goldstein & Siegal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD K. COPLON +1 973 621 9020 rkcoplon@hlgslaw.com
No Logo JERSEY NATIONAL/CAPITOL WINE & LIQUOR, Defendant

Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J. O'Shaughnessy +1 212 609 6800 +1 212 609 6921 woshaughnessy@mccarter.com
No Logo JOSEPH H. REINFELD DISTRIBUTORS, Defendant

Represented by Walder Hayden and Brogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JUSTIN P. WALDER +1 973 992 5300 jpwalder@whbesqs.com
No Logo MAJESTIC WINE SPIRITS, Defendant

Represented by Walder Hayden and Brogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JUSTIN P. WALDER +1 973 992 5300 jpwalder@whbesqs.com
No Logo MERCHANTS' WINE & LIQUOR CO., Defendant

Represented by D'ALESSANDRO, JACOVINO & GERSON, ESQS.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD G. D'ALESSANDRO, SR. +1 973 966 1910 egdjr@djglaw.com
No Logo R&r Marketing, L.l.c., Defendant

Represented by D'ALESSANDRO, JACOVINO & GERSON, ESQS.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD G. D'ALESSANDRO, SR. +1 973 966 1910 egdjr@djglaw.com

Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DOUGLAS SCOTT EAKELEY +1 973 597 2500 deakeley@lowenstein.com
No Logo REITMAN INDUSTRIES, Defendant

Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DOUGLAS SCOTT EAKELEY +1 973 597 2500 deakeley@lowenstein.com
No Logo ROYAL DISTRIBUTORS AND IMPORTERS, INC., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER J. TUCCI +1 215 656 3332
Other Parties
No Logo JOSEPH H. REINFELD DISTRIBUTORS, Consol Defendant

Represented by Walder Hayden and Brogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JUSTIN P. WALDER +1 973 992 5300 jpwalder@whbesqs.com
No Logo ROBERT D. DUBIN, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM JOHN BRYERS +1 215 628 3877
No Logo Temps, Inc., Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT A. HOFFMAN +1 973 297 1484 +1 215 963 0838 rhoffman@barrack.com
Attributes
Office Camden
Filed 5/21/1996
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 5/22/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, LEAD, SCHEDO
Timeline
  Entries (161) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 134 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER for distribution of class settlement proceeds. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (NM) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 133 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 5/3/02; The following actions were taken, granting [131-1] motion for an order authorizing distribution of class settlement proceeds. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Deadline updated; terminating [131-2] hearing Motion set for 5/3/02 on [131-1] motion. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 132 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Mark R. Rosen, Esquire on behalf of JERRY ENTERPRISES, ET AL supporting [131-1] motion for an order authorizing distribution of class settlement proceeds. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 131 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
Notice of MOTION for an order authorizing distribution of class settlement proceeds by pltfs'. JERRY ENTERPRISES, ET AL., [131-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 5/3/02 on [131-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (Cert.Svc.Annexed) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 130 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 Substitution of Attorney
Substitute attorney for ROYAL DISTRIBUTORS; Terminated attorney EDWARD G. D'ALESSANDRO SR. Added PETER J. TUCCI (sb)
LREF
Blank 129 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Judgment*Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice filed. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (NM) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 128 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
CONSENT ORDER to trial by Magistrate Judge. (NM) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 127 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #930; Minutes of: 5/22/01; The following actions were taken, Hearing approving class settlement and counsel fees. Hearing held on the record. Settlement approved by the Court. Consent to proceed before the Magistrate filed and entered. Final judgment and Order of dismissal with prejudice to be filed and entered. Case dismissed. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Terminated Case
Case closed (ar1)
LREF
Blank 126 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 Application/Petition
JOINT PETITION by JERRY ENTERPRISES, CHEFS INTERNATIONAL, JACK N. BILL'S, INC., TAGCO, INC.,for Final approval of proposed class action settlement. (er)
LREF
Blank 125 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER with Amended Notice of Proposed Settlement, etc. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (NM) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 124 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001, Terminated: 5/22/2001 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE of change of address by John Philip McCarthy for plaintiffs' JERRY ENTERPRISES, CHEFS INTERNATIONAL, JACK N. BILL'S, INC., TAGCO, INC. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 123 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER modifying schedule for notice to the class of proposed settlement and setting fairness hearing for May 22, 2001 at 9:30a.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 122 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER preliminary approving settlement, notice to the class and setting fairness hearing for April 17, 2001 at 2:00p.m. in Courtroom 3-C; Discovery and all other proceedings are stayed, except for proceedings relating to approval of the settlements. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 120 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 10/26/00; The following actions were taken, Class action settlement preliminary approval hearing held on the record. Proposed settlement placed on the record. setting scheduling order deadlines: Settlement conference 2:00 4/17/01. n.m. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Settlement Conference
Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 10/26/00. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 121 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 Application/Petition
APPLICATION/MOTION for preliminary approval of settlement and for authorization to disseminate notice to class members by plaintiffs' JERRY ENTERPRISES, CHEFS INTERNATIONAL, JACK N. BILL'S, INC., TAGCO, INC., TEMPS, INC., ROBERT D. DUBIN. (Proposed settlement agreement and additional exhibits annexed) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 119 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #852; Minutes of: 06/22/00; The following actions were taken, preliminary approval hearing placed on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (db)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: 7/14/2000 Status Conference
Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 6/22/00. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 118 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 5/5/00; The following actions were taken, Settlement conference held on the record. Terms placed on the record. Hearing on preliminary approval scheduled for 6/16/00 at 10:00a.m. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
LREF
Blank 117 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying without prejudice [111-1] motion to exclude the expert report and testimony of Samuel J. Kursh, D.B.A. and denying without prejudice [104-1] motion for summary judgment. n.m. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/8/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Deadline updated; terminating [111-2] hearing Motion set for 10:00 12/3/99 on [111-1] motion and terminating [104-2] hearing Motion set for 10:00 12/3/99 on [104-1] motion. (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/8/2000 Settlement Conference
Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 5/5/00. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 116 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, setting scheduling order deadlines: Settlement conference 1:30 5/5/00. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: 2/10/2000 Settlement Conference
Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 2/1/00. (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 Settlement Conference
Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 11/30/99. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 115 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Miscellaneous Document
DECLARATION of Stephen D. Silberman, Esquire on behalf of ALLIED BEVERAGE, BAXTER GROUP, INC. Re: [111-1] motion to exclude the expert report and testimony of Samuel J. Kursh, D.B.A. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 114 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Eric Perlmutter on behalf of ALLIED BEVERAGE, BAXTER GROUP, INC. Re: [111-1] motion to exclude the expert report and testimony of Samuel J. Kursh, D.B.A. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 113 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Miscellaneous Document
DECLARATION of Sheldon L. ALbert, Esquire on behalf of JERRY ENTERPRISES, CHEFS INTERNATIONAL, JACK N. BILL'S, INC., TAGCO, INC. Re: [111-1] motion to exclude the expert report and testimony of Samuel J. Kursh, D.B.A. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 112 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Miscellaneous Document
DECLARATION of Thomas J. Spies, Esquire on behalf of ALLIED BEVERAGE, BAXTER GROUP, INC. Re: [111-1] motion to exclude the expert report and testimony of Samuel J. Kursh, D.B.A. (UNDER SEAL) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 111 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999, Terminated: 5/8/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Notice of MOTION to exclude the expert report and testimony of Samuel J. Kursh, D.B.A. by ALLIED BEVERAGE, BAXTER GROUP, INC., Motion set for 10:00 12/3/99 on [111-1] motion . (All Briefs/PO Submitted with exhibits annexed) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 110 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Miscellaneous Document
DECLARATION of Stephen D. Silberman on behalf of ALLIED BEVERAGE AND THE BAXTER GROUP; Re: [104-1] motion for summary judgment and plaintiffs memo in opposition to defts motion for summary judgment. UNDER SEAL (ar1) Modified on 11/12/1999
LREF
Blank 109 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey A. Barrack, Esquire on behalf of JERRY ENTERPRISES, CHEFS INTERNATIONAL, JACK N. BILL'S, INC., TAGCO, INC. Re: [104-1] motion for summary judgment (ar1)
LREF
Blank 108 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Miscellaneous Document
COUNTER-STATEMENT by JERRY ENTERPRISES, CHEFS INTERNATIONAL, JACK N. BILL'S, INC., TAGCO, INC. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 107 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Certification
REPLY CERTIFICATION of Jonathan A. Wasserman, Esquire on behalf of REITMAN INDUSTRIES, R&R MARKETING, L.L.C Re: [104-1] for summary judgment (ar1)
LREF
Blank 106 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Certification
CERTIFICATION of Jonathan A. Wasserman, Esquire on behalf of REITMAN INDUSTRIES, R&R MARKETING, L.L.C Re: [104-1] motion for summary judgment (ar1)
LREF
Blank 105 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Miscellaneous Document
STATEMENT by REITMAN INDUSTRIES, R&R MARKETING, L.L.C (ar1)
LREF
Blank 104 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by REITMAN INDUSTRIES, R&R MARKETING, L.L.C, Motion set for 10:00 12/3/99 on [104-1] motion . (All Briefs/PO Submitted with exhibits annexed) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 103 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER permitting defts. to serve their reply papers upon plaintiffs by November 10, 1999. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 102 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, setting scheduling order deadlines: Dispositive Motion due on or before 11/8/99. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 101 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: 9/10/1999, Terminated: 5/22/2001 ~Notice (other)
Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by defendants' REITMAN INDUSTRIES, ETC. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 100 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: 9/10/1999, Terminated: 5/22/2001 ~Notice (other)
Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by ALLIED BEVERAGE (ar1)
LREF
Blank 99 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, amending [92-1] order setting scheduling order deadlines: Settlement conference 10:00 6/1/99 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 1/20/00. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (jm1)
LREF
Blank 98 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Robert A. Skitol, Esquire on behalf of ALLIED BEVERAGE Re: [96-1] order (ar1)
LREF
Blank 97 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999 Certification
CERTIFICATION of Thomas J. Spies, Esquire on behalf of ALLIED BEVERAGE, BAXTER GROUP, INC. Re: [96-1] order (ar1)
LREF
Blank 96 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
CONSENT ORDER permitting Robert A. Skitol, Esquire to appear and participate pro hac vice. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 Status Conference
Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 6/1/99. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 95 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER setting Dispositive Motion due on or before 11/1/99. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 94 Filed: 5/25/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Notice of Appearance
AMENDED NOTICE of attorney appearance for ALLIED BEVERAGE by Robert A. Skitol, Esquire. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 93 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of attorney appearance for ALLIED BEVERAGE by Robert A. Skitol, Esquire. (ar1) Modified on 05/26/1999
LREF
Blank 92 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
AMENDED JOINT PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, setting scheduling order deadlines: Settlement conference 10:00 6/1/99 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 1/20/00. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 91 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 OrderCourt Filing
AMENDED JOINT PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, setting scheduling order deadlines: Settlement conference 2:00 5/24/99 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 12/20/99, etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 90 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
JOINT PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, setting scheduling order deadlines: Discovery deadline on 3/1/99 Settlement/Status conference 2:00 5/24/99 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 10/10/99. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999 Status Conference
Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 1/21/99. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 89 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/22/1999 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #696; Minutes of: 1/21/99; The following actions were taken, Status conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
LREF
Blank 88 Filed: 11/12/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings taken on September 8, 1998 (ar1)
LREF
Blank 87 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/26/1998, Terminated: 5/22/2001 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Joseph Goldberg, Esquire for plaintiffs. (ar1) Modified on 10/26/1998
LREF
Blank 86 Filed: 9/10/1998, Entered: 9/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 85 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #652; Minutes of: 9/8/98; The following actions were taken, Discovery conference held on the record. Status conference set for 12/18/98 at 11:00a.m. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
LREF
Blank 84 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Substitution of Attorney
Substitute attorney for F & A DISTRIBUTING ; Terminated attorney EDWARD G. D'ALESSANDRO for F & A DISTRIBUTING ; Added, DOUGLAS SCOTT EAKELEY (jm1)
LREF
Blank 83 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
JOINT PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, setting scheduling order deadlines: Discovery deadline on 2/1/99 Status conference 2:00 9/17/98 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 9/10/99 ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/23/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Deadline updated; terminating [80-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 4/3/98 on [80-1] motion (ar1)
LREF
Blank 82 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting plaintiffs [80-1] motion for Jay S. Cohen, Esquire, John P. McCarthy, Esquire and Philip A. Steinberg, Esquire to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 81 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/23/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 3/19/98; The following actions were taken, granting [80-1] motion for Jay S. Cohen, Esquire, John P. McCarthy, Esquire and Philip A. Steinberg, Esquire to appear pro hac vice By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/20/1998 Status Conference
Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 3/18/98. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 80 Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998, Terminated: 3/20/1998 Motion for Limited AdmissionCourt Filing
Notice of MOTION for Jay S. Cohen, Esquire, John P. McCarthy, Esquire and Philip A. Steinberg, Esquire to appear pro hac vice by plaintiffs JERRY ENTERPRISES, [80-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 4/3/98 on [80-1] motion . (PO Submitted with declarations annexed to motion as exhibits) (ar1) Modified on 03/10/1998
LREF
Blank 79 Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting plaintiffs' [69-1] motion to certify class action. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 78 Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
OPINION ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 77 Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 2/24/98; The following actions were taken, granting [69-1] motion to certify class action By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Deadline updated; terminating [69-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 10:00 9/19/97 on [69-1] motion (ar1)
LREF
Blank 76 Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 10/30/1997, Terminated: 5/22/2001 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE of change of address by the law firm of Barrack, Rodos & Bacine for plaintiffs. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 75 Filed: 9/12/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JERSEY NATIONAL, GATEWAY-PERRONE, FEDERAL WINE, FEDWAY ASSOCIATES; re: Defendants Sur-Reply Brief in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for Class Certification. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 74 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Certification
CERTIFICATION of Harvey C. Kaish, Esquire on behalf of FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, etc. Re: in opposition to [69-1] motion to certify class action; (Attaching deposition transcript excerpts annexed) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 73 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Certification
CERTIFICATION of Harvey C. Kaish, Esquire on behalf of FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, etc. Re: in opposition to [69-1] motion to certify class action (ar1)
LREF
Blank 72 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Certification
CERTIFICATION of Andrew E. Anselmi on behalf of REITMAN INDUSTRIES, R&R MARKETING, L.L.C Re: in opposition to [69-1] motion to certify class action (ar1)
LREF
Blank 71 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Certification
CERTIFICATION of Frederick E. Gerson, Esquire on behalf of F & A DISTRIBUTING, etc. Re: in opposition to [69-1] motion to certify class action (ar1)
LREF
Blank 70 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Certification
CERTIFICATION of Robert A. Hoffman, Esquire on behalf of JERRY ENTERPRISES, CHEFS INTERNATIONAL, JACK N. BILL'S, INC., TAGCO, INC., 1501 LICENSING CORP. Re: [69-1] motion to certify class action; (Attaching deposition transcripts and documents with exhibits submitted) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 69 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997, Terminated: 2/24/1998 Motion to Certify Class
Notice of MOTION to certify class action by plaintiffs JERRY ENTERPRISES, CHEFS INTERNATIONAL, JACK N. BILL'S, INC., TAGCO, INC. AND 1501 LICENSING CORP., Motion hearing set for 10:00 9/19/97 on [69-1] motion . (All Briefs/PO Subm) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 68 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997 Remark
Response of plaintiff Chef's International, Inc. to defendants' notice to take oral deposition of Chef's International, Inc. by its managing agent Robert Brennan. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 67 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, set scheduling order deadlines: Dispositive Motion due on or before 7/31/97, etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 66 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that defendants' no longer contact Mr. Celli, regarding discovery inquires and defendants' motion to compel the deposition of Mr. Celli is hereby denied with prejudice. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 5/30/1997 Settlement Conference
Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 5/29/97. (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/21/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997 Settlement Conference
Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 5/20/97. (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997 Status Conference
Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 5/2/97. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 65 Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #574; Minutes of: 5/2/97; The following actions were taken, granting [59-1] motion for leave to withdraw plaintiffs Temps, Inc. and 1501 Licensing Corporation By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
LREF
Blank 64 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting plaintiffs' [59-1] motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs Temps, Inc. and 1501 Licensing Corporation. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 63 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that the defendants' opposition to the class certification motion and the entire packet shall be submitted to Judge Orlofsky no later than June 30, 1997; Further Ordered that all discovery, except those noted on the record at the May 2, 1997 conference, shall be stayed pending resolution of the motion for class certification. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 62 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying Mr. Palazzo's and Mr. Celli's motion to quash the subpoena; Further Ordered that Mr. Dubin's motion for a protective order is denied and Further Ordered that defendants may depose Mr. Dubin, Mr. Palazzo and Mr. Celli no later than May 23, 1997. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Deadline updated; terminating [59-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 10:00 5/2/97 on [59-1] motion (ar1)
LREF
Blank 61 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, consolidating cases 97cv782(SMO) with 96cv2347(SMO) for pretrial and trial proceedings, and 96cv2347(SMO) shall constitute as a master docket for the consolidation proceedings, etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1) Modified on 05/01/1997
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 Set/Clear Flags
Consolidated Lead Case (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/4/1997 Status Conference
Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 3/20/97. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 60 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: TAPED; Minutes of: 3/20/97; The following actions were taken, Status conference held on the record By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (mb)
LREF
Blank 59 Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997, Terminated: 5/6/1997 Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
Notice of MOTION for leave to withdraw plaintiffs Temps, Inc. and 1501 Licensing Corporation by TEMPS, INC. AND 1501 LICENSING CORP. [59-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 10:00 5/2/97 on [59-1] motion . (Memorandum/PO Subm) (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 Status Conference
Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 2/18/97. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 58 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #566; Minutes of: 2/18/97; The following actions were taken, Status hearing held. Hearing on discovery disputes. set scheduling order deadlines: Status conference 2:00 3/20/97 with all counsel present. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
LREF
Blank 57 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/18/1997, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER by defendant ALLIED BEVERAGE to second amended complaint. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 56 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying defendant Allied Beverage's [43-1] motion to dismiss the amended complaint and file their answer to the second amended complaint within 10 days. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 55 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
OPINION ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 54 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 2/7/97; The following actions were taken, denying defendant Allied Beverage's [43-1] motion to dismiss the amended complaint By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Deadline updated; terminating [43-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 12/20/96 on [43-1] motion (ar1)
LREF
Blank 53 Filed: 12/16/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 12/6/96; The following actions were taken, granting in part and denying in part [47-1] motion to compel By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
LREF
Blank 52 Filed: 12/11/1996, Entered: 12/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants [47-1] motion to compel ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/11/1996, Entered: 12/11/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Deadline updated; terminating [47-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:00 12/20/96 on [47-1] motion (ar1)
LREF
Blank 51 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/5/1996 Amended Complaint
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by 1501 LICENSING CORP., TEMPS, INC. , (Answer due 12/15/96 for ALLIED BEVERAGE, for JOSEPH H. REINFELD, for JOSEPH H. REINFELD, for ROYAL DISTRIBUTORS, for REITMAN INDUSTRIES, for R&R MARKETING, L.L.C, for HOFFMAN IMPORT, for INT'L VINTNERS, for DORCHESTER, INC., for J&J DISTRIBUTING CO., for JAYDOR CORPORATION, for JERSEY NATIONAL, for GATEWAY-PERRONE, for FEDERAL WINE, for FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, for MERCHANTS' WINE, for BANNER DISTRIBUTORS, for FLAGSTAFF DISTRIB., for MAJESTIC WINE, for BAXTER GROUP, INC., for F & A DISTRIBUTING ) amending [31-1] amended complaint adding as plaintiffs' TAGCO, INC., JACK N. BILL'S, INC., CHEFS INTERNATIONAL, JERRY ENTERPRISES; jury demand (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/2/1996, Entered: 12/2/1996 Status Conference
Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 11/22/96. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 50 Filed: 11/22/1996, Entered: 11/22/1996 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 1501 LICENSING CORP; re: Notice of Supplemental Authority in opposition to motion to dismiss (ar1)
LREF
Blank 49 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Certification
CERTIFICATION of Frederick E. Gerson, Esquire Re: in support of defendants [47-1] motion to compel (ar1)
LREF
Blank 48 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by Frederick E. Gerson on behalf of defendants Re in support of [47-1] motion to compel (ar1)
LREF
Blank 47 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996, Terminated: 12/11/1996 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
Notice of MOTION to compel by defendants F & A DISTRIBUTING, MERCHANTS' WINE, ROYAL DISTRIBUTORS, ALLIED BEVERAGE [47-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 9:00 12/20/96 on [47-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 46 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by Jeffrey Altschuler on behalf of ALLIED BEVERAGE Re [43-1] motion to dismiss (ar1)
LREF
Blank 45 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by Robert A. Hoffman, Esquire on behalf of 1501 LICENSING CORP. Re [43-1] motion to dismiss (ar1)
LREF
Blank 44 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALLIED BEVERAGE; re: Reply Brief to plaintiffs' opposition. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 43 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996, Terminated: 2/7/1997 Motion to Dismiss
Notice of MOTION to dismiss the amended complaint by ALLIED BEVERAGE, Motion hearing set for 12/20/96 on [43-1] motion . (All Briefs/PO Subm) (ar1) Modified on 11/19/1996
LREF
Blank 42 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 41 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 ~Notice (other)
Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by plaintiff 1501 LICENSING CORPORATION. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 40 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/3/1996, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER by JAYDOR CORPORATION to amended complaint (jm1)
LREF
Blank 39 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER by defendant ROYAL DISTRIBUTORS AND IMPORTORS, INC. to amended complaint. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER by defendants F & A DISTRIBUTING AND MERCHANTS' WINE to amended complaint. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 37 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 ~Notice (other)
Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion to dismiss by defendant ALLIED BEVERAGE GROUP, L.L.C. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 36 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER by BAXTER GROUP, INC., MAJESTIC WINE, FLAGSTAFF DISTRIB., BANNER DISTRIBUTORS, JOSEPH H. REINFELD to amended complaint (ar1)
LREF
Blank 35 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 9/30/1996, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, FEDERAL WINE, GATEWAY-PERRONE, JERSEY NATIONAL (ar1)
LREF
Blank 34 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 9/30/1996, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by REITMAN INDUSTRIES (ar1)
LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 9/30/1996, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by R&R MARKETING, L.L.C (ar1)
LREF
Blank 32 Filed: 9/27/1996, Entered: 9/27/1996 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING/PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: setting Status conference 11:00 11/22/96 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 12/1/97 ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 8/22/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT by 1501 LICENSING CORP., TEMPS, INC. , (Answer due 9/1/96 for JOSEPH H. REINFELD, for JOSEPH H. REINFELD, for ROYAL DISTRIBUTORS, for REITMAN INDUSTRIES, for R&R MARKETING, L.L.C, for HOFFMAN IMPORT, for INT'L VINTNERS, for DORCHESTER, INC., for J&J DISTRIBUTING CO., for JAYDOR CORPORATION, for JERSEY NATIONAL, for GATEWAY-PERRONE, for FEDERAL WINE, for FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, for MERCHANTS' WINE, for BANNER DISTRIBUTORS, for FLAGSTAFF DISTRIB., for MAJESTIC WINE, for BAXTER GROUP, INC., for F & A DISTRIBUTING ) amending [1-1] complaint against ALLIED BEVERAGE (jm1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Status Conference
Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on August 15, 1996. (jm1)
LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 8/14/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Letter
LETTER By SHELDON L. ALBERT counsel for TEMPS, INC. Re: preliminary injunction (jm1)
LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: July 26, 1996; The following actions were taken, Hearing on order to show cause for a preliminary injunction - Ordered adjourned without date. By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by Edward Feldman on behalf of F & A DISTRIBUTING Re [14-1] order (ar1)
LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Certification
CERTIFICATION of John Plunkett on behalf of BAXTER GROUP defendants' Re: [14-1] order (ar1) Modified on 07/26/1996
LREF
Blank 26 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Certification
CERTIFICATION of Dennis Campise on behalf of BAXTER GROUP defendants' Re: [14-1] order (ar1) Modified on 07/26/1996
LREF
Blank 25 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Certification
CERTIFICATION of Eric Perlmutter on behalf of BAXTER GROUP defendants' Re: [14-1] order (ar1)
LREF
Blank 24 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THE BAXTER GROUP defendants' re: Brief in opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction, etc. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, FEDERAL WINE, GATEWAY-PERRONE, JERSEY NATIONAL; re: Brief of defendants' to the Order to Show Cause (ar1)
LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 Certification
CERTIFICATION of Richard Leventhal on behalf of defendants' FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, FEDERAL WINE, GATEWAY-PERRONE AND CAPITAL WINE & SPIRITS CO; Re: [14-1] order to show cause (ar1)
LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by F & A DISTRIBUTING (jm1)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by EDWARD FELDMAN on behalf of F & A DISTRIBUTING Re: Opposition to [14-1] order to show cause (jm1)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by MYRON FELDMAN on behalf of F & A DISTRIBUTING Re: Opposition to [14-1] order to show cause (jm1)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R&R MARKETING, L.L.C (jm1)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 Certification
CERTIFICATION of MICHAEL LAKAVITCH on behalf of REITMAN INDUSTRIES, R&R MARKETING, L.L.C Re: Opposition to [14-1] order to show cause (jm1)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 Certification
CERTIFICATION of DAVID LOWENSTEIN on behalf of REITMAN INDUSTRIES, R&R MARKETING, L.L.C Re: Opposition to [14-1] order to show cause (jm1)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996 Certificate Of Service.
AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff's 1501 LICENSING CORP; re: plaintiff's application for an Order to Show Cause, etc. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 7/16/1996, Entered: 7/16/1996 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Why a Preliminary Injunction should not issue. Show Cause Hearing set for 11:00 7/26/96 ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 7/16/1996, Entered: 7/16/1996 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by Marilyn Craparotta on behalf of 1501 LICENSING CORP. Re [11-1] application (ar1)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 7/16/1996, Entered: 7/16/1996 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by Mark Scrivanic on behalf of 1501 LICENSING CORP. Re [11-1] application (ar1)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 7/16/1996, Entered: 7/16/1996 Application/Petition
APPLICATION for an Order to Show Cause and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (ar1)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, consolidating cases 96cv2789(SMO) with Lead Case 96cv2347(SMO) for all purposes. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/5/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Deadline updated; reset answer due for 9/9/96 for JOSEPH H. REINFELD, for ROYAL DISTRIBUTORS, for REITMAN INDUSTRIES, for R&R MARKETING, L.L.C, for HOFFMAN IMPORT, for INT'L VINTNERS, for DORCHESTER, INC., for J&J DISTRIBUTING CO., for JAYDOR CORPORATION, for JERSEY NATIONAL, for GATEWAY-PERRONE, for FEDERAL WINE, for FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, for MERCHANTS' WINE, for BANNER DISTRIBUTORS, for FLAGSTAFF DISTRIB., for MAJESTIC WINE, for BAXTER GROUP, INC., for F & A DISTRIBUTING (ar1)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/5/1996 Set/Clear Flags
Consolidated Lead Case (ar1)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Summons Returned Executed
NOTICE OF RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendants F & A DISTRIBUTING, BAXTER GROUP, INC., MAJESTIC WINE, FLAGSTAFF DISTRIB., BANNER DISTRIBUTORS, MERCHANTS' WINE, FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, FEDERAL WINE, GATEWAY-PERRONE, JERSEY NATIONAL, JAYDOR CORPORATION, J&J DISTRIBUTING CO., DORCHESTER, INC., INT'L VINTNERS, HOFFMAN IMPORT, R&R MARKETING, L.L.C, REITMAN INDUSTRIES, ROYAL DISTRIBUTORS, JOSEPH H. REINFELD 5/28/96 Answer due on 6/17/96 for JOSEPH H. REINFELD, for ROYAL DISTRIBUTORS, for REITMAN INDUSTRIES, for R&R MARKETING, L.L.C, for HOFFMAN IMPORT, for INT'L VINTNERS, for DORCHESTER, INC., for J&J DISTRIBUTING CO., for JAYDOR CORPORATION, for JERSEY NATIONAL, for GATEWAY-PERRONE, for FEDERAL WINE, for FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, for MERCHANTS' WINE, for BANNER DISTRIBUTORS, for FLAGSTAFF DISTRIB., for MAJESTIC WINE, for BAXTER GROUP, INC., for F & A DISTRIBUTING (ar1)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/17/1996 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
APPLICATION by defendants, F & A DISTRIBUTING, R&R MARKETING, L.L.C and ROYAL DISTRIBUTORS and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 7/2/96 for F & A DISTRIBUTING, R&R MARKETING, L.L.C, and ROYAL DISTRIBUTORS (jm1)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/17/1996 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
APPLICATION by defendant REITMAN INDUSTRIES and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 7/2/96 for REITMAN INDUSTRIES (ar1)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: 6/14/1996 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
APPLICATION by JAYDOR CORPORATION, J&J DISTRIBUTING CO., DORCHESTER, INC., INT'L VINTNERS, HOFFMAN IMPORT and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 7/2/96 for HOFFMAN IMPORT, for INT'L VINTNERS, for DORCHESTER, INC., for J&J DISTRIBUTING CO., for JAYDOR CORPORATION (jm1)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 6/11/1996, Entered: 6/11/1996 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
APPLICATION by FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, FEDERAL WINE, GATEWAY-PERRONE, JERSEY NATIONAL and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 7/2/96 for FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, for FEDERAL WINE, for GATEWAY-PERRONE, for JERSEY NATIONAL (jm1)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
APPLICATION by BANNER DISTRIBUTORS, FLAGSTAFF DISTRIB., JOSEPH H. REINFELD, BAXTER GROUP, INC. and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 7/2/96 for BANNER DISTRIBUTORS, for FLAGSTAFF DISTRIB., for JOSEPH H. REINFELD, for BAXTER GROUP, INC. (jm1)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Case Assigned/Reassigned
AMENDED NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (ar1) Modified on 05/30/1996
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Case Assigned/Reassigned
NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (et)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for F & A DISTRIBUTING, BAXTER GROUP, INC., MAJESTIC WINE, FLAGSTAFF DISTRIB., BANNER DISTRIBUTORS, JOSEPH H. REINFELD, MERCHANTS' WINE, FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, FEDERAL WINE, GATEWAY-PERRONE, JERSEY NATIONAL, JAYDOR CORPORATION, J&J DISTRIBUTING CO., DORCHESTER, INC., INT'L VINTNERS, HOFFMAN IMPORT, R&R MARKETING, L.L.C, REITMAN INDUSTRIES, ROYAL DISTRIBUTORS ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (et)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 219605 (et)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 139 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?