Sz Huang et al v. Tesla Inc. dba Tesla Motors, inc. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 19CV346663

Tags
Last Updated March 10, 2021 at 8:43 PM ST (1.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Huang, Ching Fen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Minami Tamaki LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Mark Fong +1 415 788 9000 +1 415 398 3887 mfong@minamitamaki.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sara M Peters

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Doris Cheng +1 415 981 7210 dcheng@walkuplawoffice.com
No Logo Huang, Hsi Keng, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Minami Tamaki LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Mark Fong +1 415 788 9000 +1 415 398 3887 mfong@minamitamaki.com
No Logo Huang, Sz Hua, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Minami Tamaki LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Mark Fong +1 415 788 9000 +1 415 398 3887 mfong@minamitamaki.com
No Logo Huang, Trinity, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Minami Tamaki LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Mark Fong +1 415 788 9000 +1 415 398 3887 mfong@minamitamaki.com
No Logo Huang, Tristan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Minami Tamaki LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Mark Fong +1 415 788 9000 +1 415 398 3887 mfong@minamitamaki.com
No Logo Huang, Wei-lun, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Minami Tamaki LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Mark Fong +1 415 788 9000 +1 415 398 3887 mfong@minamitamaki.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Inc. dba Tesla Motors, inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowman and Brooke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent Galvin +1 408 279 5393
No Logo State of California, Defendant
Officially listed as "The State of California"
No Logo The State of California, Department of Transportation, Defendant
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (109) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 109 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
Memorandum of Points & Authorities iso Motion to Compel
    Legal Document 108 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Separate Statement
    Separate Statement iso Motion to Compel
      Legal Document 107 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Motion-Compel
      Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses from State of California; and Request for Sanctions
        Legal Document 106 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Declaration
        Declaration of Bhatt iso Motion to Compel
          Legal Document 105 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
          Notice of ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING THOMAS BRANIGAN AS COUNSEL PRO HAV VICE
            Legal Document 104 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
            ADMITTING THOMAS BRANIGAN TO APPEAR RO HAC VICE by Judge Rudy
              Legal Document 103 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Application
              NOTICE OF EX PARTE MOTION AND MOTION OR AN ORDER ADMITTING THOMAS BRANIGAN J. TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE
                Legal Document 102 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Application-Pro Hac Vice
                NOTICE OF EX PARTE MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER
                  Legal Document 101 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Order: Proposed
                  Proposed Order
                    Legal Document 100 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Motion-Protective Order
                    HRG 4-01-21 D7 RE TAVARES DEPOSITION
                      Legal Document 99 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                      DECLARATION OF LANDA LOW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
                        Legal Document 98 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                          Legal Document 97 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                          CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
                            Legal Document 96 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                            Case Management Statement
                              Legal Document 95 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                              Case Management Statement
                                Legal Document 94 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                Notice of Withdrawal of Caltrans' Motion to Compel Responses from Plaintiffs re Discovery and Request For Sanctions
                                  Legal Document 93 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                  Mtn to Compel 11-12-20 is continued to 12-17-20, by Judge Kulkarni.
                                    Legal Document 92 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                      Legal Document 91 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Request Dismissal
                                      partial with prejudice by atty Fong as to Plts Ching Huang and Hsi Huang only
                                        Legal Document 90 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                        Hrg: 11-3-20. TESLA'S SUPPLEMENTAL Brief RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL SERVED ON MARCH 27 2020
                                          Legal Document 89 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                          DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. MCDEVITT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS??? SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE MOTION TO COMPEL F
                                            Legal Document 88 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                            Hrg: 11-3-20. PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT TESLA
                                              Legal Document 87 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                Legal Document 86 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                Mtn to Compel 10-13-20 is continued to 11-12-20, by Judge Kulkarni.
                                                  Legal Document 85 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
                                                  For additional Time to Comply with court's order (atty Lauren Miller)
                                                    Legal Document 84 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                    for ex parte appl
                                                      Legal Document 83 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Order: Ex Parte
                                                      Ex Parte Granted. Continued Mtn to Compel to 11-3-20.
                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Referral: Mediation
                                                          Legal Document 81 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Order: Submitted Matter
                                                          Hrg: 8-27-20 for Mtn to Compel, *please see order for details*
                                                            Legal Document 80 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                              Legal Document 79 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                Legal Document 78 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                  Legal Document 77 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                                  Hrg: 10-13-20 (continued from 9-8-20 per stip), AMENDED NOTICE OF CALTRANS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFFS RE DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
                                                                    Legal Document 76 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                    NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
                                                                      Legal Document 75 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                      Continued Mtn to Compel for 9-8-20 to 10-13-20.
                                                                        Legal Document 74 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro TemporeCourt Filing
                                                                        Granted by Judge Kulkarni (hrg. 08/20/20) @9am D-8
                                                                          Legal Document 73 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro TemporeCourt Filing
                                                                          Granted by Judge Kulkarni (hrg. 08/20/20)
                                                                            Legal Document 72 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                              Legal Document 71 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
                                                                              Hrg: 8-27-20, d-8, Reporter: Karen Crangle
                                                                                Legal Document 70 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
                                                                                  Legal Document 69 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                  Case Management Statement
                                                                                    Legal Document 68 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                    Case Management Statement
                                                                                      Legal Document 67 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                        Legal Document 66 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                        Reply
                                                                                          Legal Document 65 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                          Declaration
                                                                                            Legal Document 64 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                            for Appointment for Official Reporter Pro Tempore signed by Judge Kulkarni
                                                                                              Legal Document 63 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                              hrg 7/28/20 re: Plt's Motion to Strike Answer by Def State of CA and to enter Default Denied Signed by Judge Kulkarni
                                                                                                Legal Document 62 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                  Legal Document 61 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                  **PENDING WFP J2 7/29/20 TT**Request for Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
                                                                                                    Legal Document 60 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                    IN SUPPORT OF PLT MOTION TO STRIKE THE ANSWER 07/28/20-9am-D8
                                                                                                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                        Legal Document 58 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                        DEFENDANT CALTRANS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE CALTRANS ANSWER AND ENTER DEFAULT OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA
                                                                                                          Legal Document 57 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                          DECLARATION OF LANDA LOW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CALTRANS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE CALTRANS ANSWER AND TAKE DEFAULT OF STATE
                                                                                                            Legal Document 56 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND DECLARATION OF SKITCH W. CROSBY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CALTRANS OPPOSITION
                                                                                                              Legal Document 55 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              re: to Continue the Hearing date on Plts' Motion to Compel Further Responses from Tesla, Inc. Hrg Set for 8/20/2020 Signed by Judge Rudy
                                                                                                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                TESLA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                  TESLA'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                    Proof of Service
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                      Declaration OF LAUREN O. MILLER
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                                                                                        hrg from 9/8/2020 to 10-13-20, re: responses, atty Low
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                              re: CONCISE OUTLINE OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND RESPONSES
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Re: Protective Order - GRANTED by Judge Kulkarni
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                                                  AMENDED Motion to Strike, 07/28/2020, 9:00am, dept. 8, atty Cheng
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                                                    first amended notice of plaintiffs' motion to compel : Atty Fong, 7-14-2020, 9AM, D8
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION OF DORIS CHENG
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Motion-Strike
                                                                                                                                            hrg 07/28/2020 atty Cheng NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE ANSWER
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                    To complaint; Atty: Low
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                                                                                                                      re: to compel further responses, atty Fong, HRG 07/14/20, 9AM, D08
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Separate Statement
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                re: State of California's Demurrer Signed by Judge Kulkarni
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant State Of California's Reply To Opposition To State's Demurrer To Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                    PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION OF DORIS CHENG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                  DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION OF LANDA LOW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Request Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                      partial with prejudice by atty Cheng as to cause of action #5 only
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                        of Sz Hua Huang to Commence Action as Successor in Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                          env #03275020- demurrer- please contact the L&M Dept to reserve hearing date for this motion.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                                                                                                              $150 PAID
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      $150 PAID
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        to complaint: atty Galvin
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          $150 paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint on Tesla, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint on State of California
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Sz Huang to Commence Action as the Successor in Interest of Wei Lun Huang
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application and Appointment Guardian Ad Litem re Trinity Huang
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application and Appointment Guardian Ad Litem re Tristan Huang
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 481 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?