Commonwealth v. MasMarques
State Civil Lawsuit Marlborough District Court, Case No. 1821CR001157

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo MasMarques, Diego, Defendant
Officially listed as "Diego MasMarques"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis M. Doran, Jr.
Space Steven C. Goldwyn +1 617 492 3000 +1 617 491 3299 stevencgol@aol.com
Space Brian E. Murphy +1 508 536 0834 murphy@mvsllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gannon & Hurley, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Gannon +1 617 269 1993 +1 617 269 7072 pgannon@gannonhurley.com
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None
Order Denying Motion To Dismiss The Complaint For Lack of Probable Cause: (McGill) Denied. Out of state R.O., although not registered in MA, amounts to P/C to issue complaint. P. McGill
    Blank 14 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019
    Motion hearing
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019
      Motion To Dismiss The Complaint For Lack of Probable Cause and Memorandum in Support
        Blank 12 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019
        Motion hearing (continued)
          Blank 11 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Court Filing
          Pretrial hearing. J. Fabbri, Judge.
            Blank 10 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019
            Pretrial hearing (continued)
              Blank 9 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019
              Pretrial hearing (continued)
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019
                Affidavit of Attorney Steve Goldwyn filed and to be heard on next court date of 2/19/19.
                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: 2/6/2019 Court Filing
                  Notice of Appearance filed by Atty. Paul Gannon. Motion to Advance & Continue Case to an April date denied however, case is allowed to be continued to 2/19/19. No further continuances. DA + Probation notified. Counsel will inform defendant. J. Fabbri, Judge.
                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019
                    Motion to withdraw filed by Atty. Goldwyn. To be heard at defendant's next court date 2/14/19. Atty. Goldwyn will not be present.
                      Blank 5 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018
                      Arriagnment. Pre trial conditions of release filed. Notice of Appearance filed by Atty. Goldwyn.
                        Blank 4 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018
                        Arraignment (continued)
                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Court Filing
                          Motion to withdraw appearance filed by Atty Murphy. Motion to be heard on 12/21/18 at defendant's arraignment. Defense counsel notified. J. Fabbri, Judge.
                            Blank 2 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018 Court Filing
                            Notice of appearance filed by Attorney Brian Murphy. Motion to Advance & Continue Arraignment filed and allowed w/out a hearing. New summons to issue, all parties notified. No further continuances by either party. J. Fabbri, Judge.
                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018
                              Complaint issued

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 1,414 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?