Porsche Financial Services, Inc. , et al. v. Jonathan Roudier
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 19STCV04599

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 5, 2019 at 7:29 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Porsche Financial Services, Inc. Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Porsche Financial Services Inc. Dba Bentley Financial Services"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miller, Stacey A.
No Logo Porsche Leasing Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miller, Stacey A.
v.
No Logo Roudier Jonathan, Defendant
Type Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Proof of Service by Substituted Service
    Blank 6 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
      Blank 5 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019 Notice of Case Management Conference
        Blank 4 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019 Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
          Blank 3 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet
            Blank 2 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019 Summons
            on Complaint
              Blank 1 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019 Complaint

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?