Munnuru v. Guerbet LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01159
District Judge David G Campbell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 30, 2020 at 3:54 PM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Srihari Munnuru, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cutter Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd Alan Walburg +1 510 281 5881 +1 510 488 1175 twalburg@cutterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by cwazlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Curt William Clausen +1 602 285 4450 +1 602 285 4483 curt@cwazlaw.com
v.
No Logo Guerbet LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KENDALL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jamie Kendall +1 610 756 0200 +1 610 756 0202 jkendall@tkfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brad Michael Welsh +1 610 756 0200 +1 610 756 0202 bwelsh@tkfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian W. Shaffer +1 215 963 5000 +1 215 963 5001 bshaffer@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina M. Vitale +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 christina.vitale@morganlewis.com
No Logo Liebel-flarsheim Company LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KENDALL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jamie Kendall +1 610 756 0200 +1 610 756 0202 jkendall@tkfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brad Michael Welsh +1 610 756 0200 +1 610 756 0202 bwelsh@tkfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian W. Shaffer +1 215 963 5000 +1 215 963 5001 bshaffer@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina M. Vitale +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 christina.vitale@morganlewis.com
Mallinckrodt, Inc. Mallinckrodt, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Mallinckrodt Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Thomas Adams +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 rtadams@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Devin Kyle Ross +1 816 559 2688 +1 816 421 5547 dkross@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Xavier Fowler +1 602 382 6213 +1 602 382 6070 pfowler@swlaw.com
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Thomas Adams +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 rtadams@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Devin Kyle Ross +1 816 559 2688 +1 816 421 5547 dkross@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Xavier Fowler +1 602 382 6213 +1 602 382 6070 pfowler@swlaw.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Habib Nasrullah +1 303 244 1800 +1 303 244 1879 nasrullah@wtotrial.com
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Habib Nasrullah +1 303 244 1800 +1 303 244 1879 nasrullah@wtotrial.com
No Logo Merry X-Ray Chemical Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None Transcript - Appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Transcript - Appeal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Transcript Request
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Clerks Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ORDER OF THE MULTI DISTRICT LITIGATION PANEL DENYING TRANSFER - ORDERED that the Motion for Centralization of these Actions (listed on Schedule A) is Denied. (MAP) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge David G Campbell: Discovery Hearing held on 10/5/2018. Status of MDL application discussed. Court will enter a revised case management order. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Brooks Cutter and Curt Clausen for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Andrew Goldman and Jennifer Greenblatt for Defendant Bayer. Telephonic appearance by Paul Penticuff and Donn Alexander for Defendant Bracco Diagnostics. Telephonic appearance by Devin Ross for Defendant Mallinckrodt. Telephonic appearance by Brian Shaffer and Jamie Kendall for Defendant Guerbet and Liebel-Flarsheim. Telephonic appearance by Habib Nasrullah for Defendant McKesson (Court Reporter Christine Coaly.) Hearing held 2:18 PM to 2:33 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 10/5/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge David G Campbell. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate a telephone conference to include counsel for all parties in this case and in CV18-1157, and the Court. If a dial-in number is to be used, counsel for Plaintiff shall provide the dial-in information to counsel for all parties and the Court no later than 12:00 noon on 10/4/2018. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/24/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. (Nasrullah, Habib) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Remark: as to Emma Elizabeth Garrison and Kevin Michael Benedicto - removed as counsel for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for C Brooks Cutter on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 11/2/2018. Motions due by 2/1/2019. Daubert Hearing set for 3/15/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/17/2018. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 43 Stipulation: PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/9/2018. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
                                                                        MEMORANDUM Joint Memorandum Outlining The Parties' Proposals for Discovery by Defendants Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                          STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Requesting the Entry of a Protective ORDER by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Parties Proposed Language and Rationale re Disputed Provisions in [Proposed] Order)(Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 39 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Incorporated, 41 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. Documents not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
                                                                              NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to General Order 17-08(b) filed by Defendants McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. (Nasrullah, Habib) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
                                                                                NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Srihari Munnuru. (Williamson, Linda) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
                                                                                  NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC. (Fowler, Patrick) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
                                                                                    NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
                                                                                      NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Guerbet LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Conference held on 6/20/2018. Joint memorandum due 7/6/2018(see entry for details) (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:16 PM to 4:27 PM.(TCA) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Remark: Out of state attorneys C Brooks Cutter and Margot P Cutter removed as counsel of record for noncompliance; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 34 Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP filed by Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, Guerbet LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ATD) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP
                                                                                              Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Defendants Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Case Management Order)(Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Habib Nasrullah on behalf of McKesson Corporation and McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                  *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC identifying Other Affiliate Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC. (Fowler, Patrick) *Modified on 5/24/2018 to correct name of Other Affiliate (ATD). (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC.(Fowler, Patrick) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                      Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint ;Affirmative Defenses by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC.(Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Robert Thomas Adams on behalf of Mallinckrodt Inc and Mallinckrodt LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Brian W Shaffer on behalf of defendants Guerbet LLC and Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Devin Kyle Ross on behalf of Mallinckrodt Incorporated and Mallinckrodt LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 5/23/2018 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. The parties should be aware that the filing of a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) will not postpone the time for compliance with the MIDP. General Order 17-08 provides that compliance may be deferred only for motions to dismiss based on lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, lack of personal jurisdiction, sovereign immunity, or absolute or qualified immunity of a public official. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/15/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Jamie Kendall and Brad Welsh on behalf of defendants Guerbet LLC and Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: 1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fowler, Patrick) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guerbet LLC identifying Corporate Parent Guerbet S.A. for Guerbet LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Scheduling (Case Management) Conference set for 6/20/2018 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/1/18. (LAD) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Todd A Walburg on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 5/23/2018 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. The parties should be aware that the filing of a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) will not postpone the time for compliance with the MIDP. General Order 17-08 provides that compliance may be deferred only for motions to dismiss based on lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, lack of personal jurisdiction, sovereign immunity, or absolute or qualified immunity of a public official. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/27/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT Joint by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 22 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Forms of Papers. Please note for future filings; Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ATD) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Marie Vitale on behalf of Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MAP) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Letter Re Transfer of 3:18-cv-571-JD from the Northern District of California to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-18-1159-PHX-DGC. (MAP) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00571 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge James Donato re 17 Stipulation. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO TRANSFER filed by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, Mallinckrodt Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Benedicto, Kevin) (Filed on 3/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Srihari Munnuru (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 3/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/1/2018. Total Time in Court: 13 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wellington Management Group LLP for McKesson Corporation. (Garrison, Emma) (Filed on 2/28/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses byMcKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Garrison, Emma) (Filed on 2/28/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, Mallinckrodt Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Merry X-Ray Chemical Corporation. (Benedicto, Kevin) (Filed on 2/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/8/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/5/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/30/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/30/18. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, Mallinckrodt Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Merry X-Ray Chemical Corporation. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/26/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 1 Complaint filed by Srihari Munnuru Defendant Party Entered Incorrectly. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Srihari Munnuru.. (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 1/26/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/9/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Summons. (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 1/26/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; 1) STRICT PRODUCTS LIABILITY: FAILURE TO WARN; 2) NEGLIGENCE; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12059488.). Filed by Srihari Munnuru. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 1/26/2018) Modified on 1/29/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?