Hollingsworth, III v. Roseland Wake Park, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-06013-MAT-JWF
District Judge Michael A. Telesca, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 13, 2019 at 11:30 PM DT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Valentine Hollingsworth, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faraci & Lange LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Lesley Ellen Niebel +1 585 325 5150 +1 585 325 3285 lniebel@faraci.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G. Schwarz +1 585 325 5150 +1 585 325 3285 sschwarz@faraci.com
v.
No Logo Rixen Cableways GMBH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Arnd N. von Waldow +1 412 288 3131 +1 412 288 3063 avonwaldow@reedsmith.com
No Logo Rixen US, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Arnd N. von Waldow +1 412 288 3131 +1 412 288 3063 avonwaldow@reedsmith.com
No Logo Roseland Wake Park, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven M. Zweig +1 716 970 4695 +1 970 986 6466 steve@czlawteam.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER denying 17 Motion to Compel; denying 19 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 1/11/19. (SR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    TEXT ORDER re 19 MOTION for Joinder filed by Rixen Cableways GMBH, Rixen US, LLC: Plaintiff's response, if any, due by 12/5/2018. The motion will be addressed at the oral argument already scheduled for 1/10/19 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 11/29/18. (SR) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION for Joinder by Rixen Cableways GMBH, Rixen US, LLC.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley Ellen Niebel on behalf of Valentine Hollingsworth, III (Niebel, Lesley) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          DECLARATION re 17 MOTION to Compel filed by Valentine Hollingsworth, III Declaration of Lesley E. Niebel, Esq. in Opposition filed by Valentine Hollingsworth, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Niebel, Lesley) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Compel filed by Valentine Hollingsworth, III. (Niebel, Lesley) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER re 17 MOTION to Compel filed by Roseland Wake Park, LLC: Responses due by 11/28/2018. Replies due by 12/5/2018. Oral Argument set for 1/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 11/14/18. (SR) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Compel by Roseland Wake Park, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF STEVEN M. ZWEIG, # 2 Memorandum in Support DEFENDANT ROSELAND WAKE PARK, LLCS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL A FULL AND COMPLETE RESPONE TO ITS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S)(Zweig, Steven) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 8/13/2018. (MAH) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Addendum ORDER re 15 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 8/13/2018. (MAH) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman: Scheduling Conference held on 4/30/2018. Appearances: Stephen G. Schwarz, Esq. on behalf of the plaintiff; Steven M. Zweig, Esq. on behalf of Roseland Wake Park, LLC; Arnd von Waldow, Esq. and Oliver K. Beiersdorf, Esq. on behalf of Rixen US, LLC and Rixen Cableways GMBH. The Court will issue a scheduling order. (MAH) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order. Mandatory Disclosures due by 5/18/2018. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 6/29/2018. Discovery completed by 6/3/2019. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 6/3/2019. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 7/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/13/2019. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 4/30/2018. (MAH) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ORDER granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 4/24/2018. (MAH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3087656.) by Rixen Cableways GMBH, Rixen US, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Admission Petition Form, # 2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, # 3 Attorney's Oath, # 4 Attorney Data Base Info Form, # 5 CM/ECF Registration Form)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DISCOVERY PLAN by Valentine Hollingsworth, III.(Schwarz, Stephen) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER Scheduling Conference rescheduled for 4/30/2018 03:00 PM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 3/27/2018. (MAH) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2018 11:30 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 3/21/2018. (MAH) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roseland Wake Park, LLC. (Zweig, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      E-Filing Notification: revised docket text of 4 to "CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT" to reflect the correct filing event. For future reference, the filing event "Corporate Disclosure Statement" is found under Civil>Other Documents>Corporate Disclosure Statement. Revised docket text of 5 to clarify the filing event. (JHF)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 3/20/18. (JMC) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Rixen Cableways GMBH, Rixen US, LLC.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rixen Cableways GMBH, Rixen US, LLC. identifying defendant Rixen Cableway GmbH has no parent corporation and that defendant Rixen US, LLC is a wholly owned subsidiary of Rixen Cableways GmbH. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) Modified on 3/20/2018 (JHF). (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Roseland Wake Park, LLC. (Zweig, Steven) Modified on 3/20/2018 (JHF). (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Case assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Summons Issued as to Rixen Cableways GMBH, Rixen US, LLC, Roseland Wake Park, LLC. (JHF) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Notice sent to the MDL. (JHF)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-2988414, filed by Valentine Hollingsworth, III. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons in a Civil Action)(Schwarz, Stephen) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Space Space

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?