LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP v. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-01409-CJN
District Judge Carl J. Nichols, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 15, 2020 at 3:44 PM EDT (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Levi & Korsinsky, LLP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Ian Porritt +1 202 524 4290 +1 202 333 2121 nporritt@akingump.com
v.
United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Dean Solonsky +1 202 551 5014 +1 202 772 9263 solonskykd@sec.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/15/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE I-FOIA
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 stipulation
STIPULATION by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP and by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Solonsky, Kevin)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/23/2019. (zcdw)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Order
          MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' [10] Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before December 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 23, 2019. (lccjn3)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Status report
              Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Solonsky, Kevin)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                  MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Parties' [9] Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before September 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 26, 2019. (lccjn3)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019, Terminated: 9/26/2019 Motion for Extension of Time to
                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Solonsky, Kevin)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2019. (mac)
                          LREF
                          Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2019. (mac)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Order
                            MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) appear to be inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 13, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 13, 2019. (lccjn1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/5/2019, Entered: 7/5/2019 Answer
                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(Solonsky, Kevin); Modified text and added docket entry relationship on 7/8/2019 (tth).
                                LREF
                                Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Reggie B. Walton is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019 Notice of appearance
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Dean Solonsky on behalf of UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Solonsky, Kevin)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/12/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/5/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 6/5/2019 (ztd); (See docket entry no.[5] to view.)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/5/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/5/2019. (Porritt, Nicholas)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                        SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 Request for Summons to Issue
                                          REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re [1] Complaint filed by LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP. (Attachments: # (1) Summons)(Porritt, Nicholas)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Summons Issued Electronically
                                            SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Notice and Consent)(zef, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: 5/15/2019 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6126176) filed by LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons)(Porritt, Nicholas)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 144 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?