Robert G. Meece - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 00-03499
District Judge Steven A. Felsenthal, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 18, 2019 at 7:53 PM EDT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Rolex Watch U.s.a., Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David F. Staber +1 214 969 4664 dstaber@akingump.com
v.
No Logo Robert G. Meece, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Forshey & Prostok, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeff P. Prostok +1 817 877 8855 +1 817 877 4151 jpp@forsheyprostok.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert G. Meece

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert G. Meece
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Checked for Completeness. (Mathews,M.)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Adversary Case (00-3499) dismissed. (Mathews,M.)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Disposition of Adversary (00-3499) Dismissing [1-1] Complaint Dismissing [1-1] Complaint NOS 424 Objection To Discharge (727) (Mathews,M.)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Order Dismissing Adversary Case. (Mathews,M.)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Hearing Held Re: [1-1] Complaint NOS 424 Objection To Discharge (727), [1-1] Complaint . (Settled Subject to R. 9019 Motion) (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Order Granting [29-1] Motion To Continue Hearing Re: [1-1] Complaint NOS 424 Objection To Discharge (727), [1-1] Complaint by Robert G. Meece, Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. Trial Docket Call at 1:30 6/11/01 Trial Hearing Reset To 6/18/01 at Courtroom #3, Dallas Dallas . (Mathews,M.)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Certificate Of Service By David F. Staber for Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. Of [29-1] Motion To Continue Hearing Re: [1-1] Complaint NOS 424 Objection To Discharge (727), [1-1] Complaint by Robert G. Meece, Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. . (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 04/13/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Order to Set Hearing RE: [1-1] Complaint NOS 424 Objection To Discharge (727) ; Trial Hearing Set For 9:30 4/16/01 at Courtroom #3, Dallas
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Hearing Held Re: [1-1] Complaint NOS 424 Objection To Discharge (727), [1-1] Complaint . Trial - Sec 727 - 4/16/01 9:30 (Entered: 03/15/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Hearing Re: [1-1] Complaint NOS 424 Objection To Discharge (727) ; Trial Hearing Set For 9:30 4/16/01 at Courtroom #3, Dallas (Entered: 03/15/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Order to Set Hearing RE: [1-1] Complaint NOS 424 Objection To Discharge (727) ; Trial Hearing Set For 1:30 3/12/01 at Courtroom #3, Dallas, [1-1] Complaint (Mathews,M.)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Hearing Held Re: [1-1] Complaint NOS 424 Objection To Discharge (727), [1-1] Complaint . (Rescheduled 3/12/01 at 1:30, Order Signed 2/14/01 Appearances: D. Staber J Prostok ). (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 02/14/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Certificate Of Service By David F. Staber for Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. Of [25-1] Objection by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc., to Witness and Exhibit [10-1] List by Robert G. Meece . (Way,R.) (Entered: 02/13/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Certificate Of Service By David F. Staber for Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. Of [24-1] Trial Brief by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 02/12/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Certificate Of Service By Jeffrey Philipp Prostok for Defendant Robert G. Meece Of [23-1] Trial Brief by Robert G. Meece. (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 02/12/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Hearing Held Re: [7-1] Motion For Summary Judgment by Robert G. Meece . (Appearances: D. Staber, J. Prostok; Motion Taken Under Advisement). (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Certificate Of Service By David F. Staber for Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. Of [21-1] Motion To Strike [11-1 Memorandum of Law of Support and Supplemental Affidavits by Robert G. Meece by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc., [21-1] Support Brief by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 01/30/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Certificate Of Service By Jeffrey Philipp Prostok for Defendant Robert G. Meece Of [20-1] Affidavit . (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 01/26/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Certificate Of Service By Jeffrey Philipp Prostok for Defendant Robert G. Meece Of [19-1] Affidavit . (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 01/26/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Certificate Of Service By Jeffrey Philipp Prostok for Defendant Robert G. Meece Of [18-1] Response by Robert G. Meece . (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 01/26/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Certificate Of Service By David F. Staber for Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. Of [17-1] List by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. . (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 01/17/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Certificate Of Service By David F. Staber for Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. Of [16-1] Appendix Volume II by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 01/17/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Certificate Of Service By David F. Staber for Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. Of [15-1] Appendix Volume I by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. . (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 01/17/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Certificate Of Service By David F. Staber for Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. Of [14-1] Support Brief by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. . (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 01/17/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Certificate Of Service By David F. Staber for Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. Of [13-1] Motion For Summary Judgment by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc., [13-1] Objection by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. . (Entered: 01/16/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Certificate Of Service By Robert G. Meece for Defendant Robert G. Meece Of [12-1] Objection by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. . (Entered: 01/16/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Certificate Of Service By Jeffrey Philipp Prostok for Defendant Robert G. Meece Of [11-1] Support by Robert G. Meece . (Entered: 01/16/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        List of Witness and Exhibit Filed by Defendant Robert G. Meece Re: [1-1] Complaint NOS 424 Objection To Discharge (727), [1-1] Complaint (Jackson,D.) (Entered: 01/11/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Order to Set Hearing RE: [7-1] Motion For Summary Judgment by Robert G. Meece Continued to 10:30 1/8/01 at Courtroom #3, Dallas (Mathews,M.)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Certificate Of Service By David F. Staber for Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. Of [8-1] Motion To Extend Time To Respond to Deadline by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc., [8-2] Motion To Continue Hearing Re: [7-1] Motion For Summary Judgment by Robert G. Meece by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. . (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 12/18/2000)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Certificate Of Service By Jeffrey Philipp Prostok for Defendant Robert G. Meece Of [7-1] Hearing Notice of . (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 12/13/2000)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Answer To Complaint by Defendant Robert G. Meece . (Holden,M.) (Entered: 11/29/2000)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Answer To Complaint by Defendant Robert G. Meece . (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 10/17/2000)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Summons Served 9/29/00 on Robert G. Meece. (Mathews,M.) (Entered: 10/02/2000)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Standing Scheduling Order Setting Deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 30 days prior, Pre-Trial Order: 7 calendar days prior, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law: 3 days prior to first scheduled docket call. ;Trial Hearing Scheduled For the week of 2/20/01 at Courtroom #3, Dallas ; Trial Docket Call Set For 1:30 2/12/01 at Courtroom #3, Dallas (Davis,T.)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Summons Issued on Robert G. Meece Answer due 10/27/00 for Robert G. Meece (Davis,T.)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Complaint (00-3499) Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. vs. Robert G. Meece . inadvertently omitted complaint for determining dischargability of debt. [NOS 426 dischargability of debt] Fee Received: $ Receipt # (McDonald,J.) (Entered: 09/28/2000)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?