Truck Trailer Manufacturers v. EPA
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 16-1430

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 20, 2019 at 7:36 AM EDT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RYAN Z. WATTS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Jonathan Stuart Martel,, Attorney +1 202 942 5999 jonathan.martel@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Melissa Cross, Arnold & Porter LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Elisabeth Susan Theodore +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 elisabeth.theodore@apks.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD Retained Lisa Schiavo Blatt, Attorney +1 202 434 5029 lblatt@wc.com
No Logo Andrew Wheeler, in his official capacity as Acting Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ Sue Chen +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2786 Sue.Chen@usdoj.gov
No Logo E. Scott Pruitt, in his official capacity as Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Respondent
United States Environmental Protection Agency United States Environmental Protection Agency, Respondent
Officially listed as "Environmental Protection Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ Sue Chen +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2786 Sue.Chen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Gina McCarthy, Respondent
No Logo Jack Danielson, in his official capacity as Acting Deputy Administrator, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ H. Thomas Byron +1 202 514 2000 H.Thomas.Byron@usdoj.gov
COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ Sue Chen +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2786 Sue.Chen@usdoj.gov
COR NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR NTC Gvt US DOJ Douglas N. Letter +1 202 514 2000 douglas.letter@usdoj.gov
No Logo Mark R Rosekind, Respondent
National Highway Traffic Safety Administration National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ H. Thomas Byron +1 202 514 2000 H.Thomas.Byron@usdoj.gov
COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ Sue Chen +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2786 Sue.Chen@usdoj.gov
COR NTC Gvt US DOJ, COR NTC Gvt US DOJ Douglas N. Letter +1 202 514 2000 douglas.letter@usdoj.gov
No Logo California Air Resources Board, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of State Hospitals

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Gvt Non-Federal Robert William Byrne +1 415 703 5860 +1 415 703 5480 Robert.Byrne@doj.ca.gov
COR LD NTC Gvt Non-Federal Kathleen A. Kenealy +1 213 897 2605 +1 213 897 2802 kathleen.kenealy@doj.ca.gov
COR NTC Gvt Non-Federal Margaret Elaine Meckenstock +1 415 703 5894 +1 415 703 5480 Elaine.Meckenstock@doj.ca.gov
COR NTC Gvt Non-Federal Melinda Pilling +1 415 703 5585 melinda.pilling@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York State Department Of Health

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Gvt Non-Federal Gavin Geraghty McCabe, Deputy Attorney General +1 212 416 6007 gavin.mccabe@ag.ny.gov
No Logo Center for Biological Diversity, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY - SEATTLE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Howard M. Crystal +1 202 253 5108 hcrystal@biologicaldiversity.org
COR LD NTC Retained Clare Lakewood +1 510 844 7150 clakewood@biologicaldiversity.org
No Logo Environmental Defense Fund, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by DONAHUE & GOLDBERG, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Sean H. Donahue +1 202 277 7085 sean@donahuegoldberg.com
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Susannah L Weaver +1 202 569 3818 +1 202 289 8009 Susannah@donahuegoldberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Environmental Defense Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Alice Henderson ahenderson@edf.org
COR LD NTC Retained Peter Michel Zalzal +1 303 447 7214 pzalzal@edf.org
No Logo Natural Resources Defense Council, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Natural Resources Defense Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained Benjamin Longstreth +1 202 513 6256 +1 202 289 1060 blongstreth@nrdc.org
No Logo Sierra Club, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 415-977-5695

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Alejandra Nunez, Senior Attorney alejandra.nunez@sierraclub.org
COR LD NTC Retained Joanne Marie Spalding +1 415 977 5725 joanne.spalding@sierraclub.org
COR NTC Retained Joshua R. Stebbins +1 202 675 6273 josh.stebbins@sierraclub.org
No Logo State of Connecticut, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Gvt Non-Federal SCOTT N. KOSCHWITZ +1 860 808 5250 scott.koschwitz@ct.gov
COR LD NTC Gvt Non-Federal Matthew I. Levine +1 860 808 5250 +1 860 808 5386 Matthew.Levine@ct.gov
No Logo State of Iowa, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 515-281-5341

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Gvt Non-Federal Jacob John Larson +1 515 281 5341 jacob.larson@ag.iowa.gov
No Logo State of Massachusetts, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Gvt Non-Federal Carol A. Iancu +1 617 963 2428 +1 617 727 9665 carol.iancu@state.ma.us
No Logo State of Oregon, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Gvt Non-Federal Paul Andrew Garrahan +1 503 947 4593 paul.garrahan@doj.state.or.us
No Logo State of Rhode Island, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Rhode Island

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Gvt Non-Federal Gregory Stage Schultz +2226 222 222 6607 +2223 222 222 3378 gschultz@riag.ri.gov
No Logo State of Vermont, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VERMONT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Gvt Non-Federal Nicholas F Persampieri +1 802 828 6902 nick.persampieri@vermont.gov
No Logo State of Washington, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (40111-OLY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Gvt Non-Federal Nels Johnson +1 360 586 3514 +1 360 586 6760 ECYOLYEF@ATG.WA.GOV
No Logo Union of Concerned Scientists, Intervenor for Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by DONAHUE & GOLDBERG, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Susannah L Weaver +1 202 569 3818 +1 202 289 8009 Susannah@donahuegoldberg.com
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208101565 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPORT [1772481] filed by EPA, NHTSA, Andrew Wheeler and Jack Danielson in 16-1430, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1447 abeyance status is administrative proceedings ongoing [Service Date: 02/08/2019 ] [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 02/08/2019 09:17 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208100381 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    LETTER [1771813] withdrawal of counsel Lisa S. Blatt filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. [Service Date: 02/04/2019 ] [16-1430] (Blatt, Lisa) [Entered: 02/04/2019 02:28 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208095015 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CLERK'S ORDER [1768895] filed granting motion to extend time [1768458-2], directing parties to file abeyance status report 14 days after appropriations are restored [16-1430, 16-1447] [Entered: 01/17/2019 02:07 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208094303 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION [1768458] to extend time to file report to 12/31/2019 filed by EPA, NHTSA, Andrew Wheeler and Jack Danielson in 16-1430, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1447 (Service Date: 01/15/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 157 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 01/15/2019 05:55 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208082218 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE [1761974] to withdraw attorney Vera P. Pardee who represented Center for Biological Diversity in 16-1430 filed by Center for Biological Diversity [Service Date: 11/28/2018 ] [16-1430] (Crystal, Howard) [Entered: 11/28/2018 05:38 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208080546 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1761078] filed by Clare Lakewood on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Center for Biological Diversity. [16-1430] (Lakewood, Clare) [Entered: 11/21/2018 03:02 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208071708 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              REPORT [1756269] filed by EPA, NHTSA, Andrew Wheeler and Jack Danielson in 16-1430, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1447 abeyance status is administrative proceedings ongoing [Service Date: 10/22/2018 ] [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 10/22/2018 09:31 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208064108 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE [1752285] Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Agencies to Submit Detailed Status Report and Timeline for Completion of Administrative Review filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. [Service Date: 09/24/2018 ] [16-1430] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 09/24/2018 01:25 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208052807 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  REPLY [1746211] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. to response [1746034-2] [Service Date: 08/17/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 749 words. [16-1430] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 08/17/2018 02:21 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208052462 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1746034] to motion for other relief [1744152-2] filed by EPA, NHTSA, Andrew Wheeler and Jack Danielson in 16-1430, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 16-1447 [Service Date: 08/16/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1516 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 08/16/2018 04:36 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208049159 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION [1744152] to Compel Respondents to Submit Detailed Status Report and Timeline for Completion of Administrative Review filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. (Service Date: 08/06/2018 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1292. [16-1430] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 08/06/2018 01:53 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208045479 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPORT [1742136] filed by Jack Danielson, EPA, E. Scott Pruitt and NHTSA in 16-1430, EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1447 abeyance status is administrative proceedings ongoing [Service Date: 07/24/2018 ] [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 07/24/2018 12:16 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208019863 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          REPORT [1728128] filed by EPA, Jack Danielson, E. Scott Pruitt and NHTSA in 16-1430, EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1447 abeyance status is administrative proceedings ongoing [Service Date: 04/25/2018 ] [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 04/25/2018 02:42 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207993871 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            REPORT [1713982] filed by Jack Danielson, EPA, NHTSA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1430, EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1447 abeyance status is administrative proceedings ongoing [Service Date: 01/22/2018 ] [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 01/22/2018 11:33 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              PER ABOVE ORDER lodged supplement [1700251-2] is filed. [16-1430, 16-1447] [Entered: 10/27/2017 10:32 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207971649 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                PER CURIAM ORDER [1701733] granting motion to supplement [1699845-3]; granting motion for stay [1694522-2]; granting motion to continue abeyance [1693423-2]. This case shall be held in abeyance pending further order of the court. The parties are directed to file status reports at 90-day intervals beginning 90 days from the date of this order. Status Report due by 01/25/2018. Before Judges: Henderson, Kavanaugh and Millett. [16-1430, 16-1447] [Entered: 10/27/2017 10:30 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207971398 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1701575] to motion for leave to file [1699845-3], motion to supplement appendix [1699845-2] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. [Service Date: 10/26/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 455 words. [16-1430] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 10/26/2017 02:22 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207969670 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    REPLY [1700432] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. to response [1698825-3], [1698824-2], [1698457-2] [Service Date: 10/19/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2590 words. [16-1430] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 10/19/2017 06:40 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207969549 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SUPPLEMENT [1700251] to response [1698824-2] LODGED by Center for Biological Diversity, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 16-1430 [Service Date: 10/19/2017 ] [16-1430, 16-1447] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 10/19/2017 01:56 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207969217 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION [1699845] for leave to file supplement (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/30/2017) filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 16-1430 (Service Date: 10/18/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 302 words. [16-1430, 16-1447]--[RELIEF REPLACED--Edited 10/19/2017 by LMC] (Weaver, Susannah) [Entered: 10/18/2017 01:32 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207967987 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1698825] to motion for stay [1694522-2] filed by California Air Resources Board, State of Connecticut, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington [Service Date: 10/12/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3,885 words. [16-1430]--[MODIFIED EVENT--Edited 10/16/2017 by LMC] (Pilling, Melinda) [Entered: 10/12/2017 11:52 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207967983 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1698824] to motion for other relief [1694522-2] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 16-1430 [Service Date: 10/12/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5163. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Weaver, Susannah) [Entered: 10/12/2017 10:11 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207967592 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RESPONSE [1698457] to motion for other relief [1694522-2] filed by Jack Danielson, EPA, NHTSA and E. Scott Pruitt [Service Date: 10/12/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 384 words. [16-1430] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 10/12/2017 09:10 AM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207965407 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                PER CURIAM ORDER [1696744] granting motions for extension of time [1695530-2] [1695517-2] [1695434-2]. The responses to the motion for stay are now due by October 12, 2017. Before Judges: Henderson, Kavanaugh and Millett. [16-1430, 16-1447] [Entered: 10/04/2017 10:44 AM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207964927 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  REPLY [1696258] filed by California Air Resources Board, State of Connecticut, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington to response [1696009-2] [Service Date: 10/02/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 290. [16-1430] (Pilling, Melinda) [Entered: 10/02/2017 08:20 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207964866 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    REPLY [1696234] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 16-1430 to response [1696009-2] [Service Date: 10/02/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 287. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Weaver, Susannah) [Entered: 10/02/2017 04:49 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207964693 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1696009] to motion to extend time [1695530-2], motion to extend time [1695517-2], motion to extend time [1695434-2] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. in 16-1430 [Service Date: 10/02/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 315 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 10/02/2017 11:24 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207964642 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1695958] for motion to extend time [1695434-2] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 16-1430. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Weaver, Susannah) [Entered: 10/02/2017 10:10 AM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207964432 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1695786] for motion to extend time [1695530-2] filed by California Air Resources Board, State of Connecticut, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington. [16-1430] (Pilling, Melinda) [Entered: 09/29/2017 02:17 PM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207964099 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION [1695530] to extend time to file response to 10/12/2017 (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/10/2017) filed by California Air Resources Board, State of Connecticut, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington (Service Date: 09/28/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 292 words. [16-1430] (Pilling, Melinda) [Entered: 09/28/2017 08:07 PM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207964062 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION [1695517] to extend time to file response to 10/12/2017 (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/10/2017) filed by Jack Danielson, EPA, NHTSA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1430, EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1447 (Service Date: 09/28/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 254 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 09/28/2017 04:52 PM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207963967 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION [1695434] to extend time to file response to 10/12/2017 (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/10/2017) filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 16-1430 (Service Date: 09/28/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 624. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Weaver, Susannah) [Entered: 09/28/2017 01:52 PM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207963014 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION [1694522] for stay (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/05/2017) filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. in 16-1430 (Service Date: 09/25/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5144 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 09/25/2017 08:34 PM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207961466 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1693590] filed by Joanne Spalding and co-counsel Alejandra Nunez, Joshua Randolph Stebbins on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Sierra Club. [16-1430] (Spalding, Joanne) [Entered: 09/19/2017 02:15 PM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207961296 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1693481] to motion to hold case in abeyance [1693423-2] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. in 16-1430 [Service Date: 09/18/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 632 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 09/18/2017 06:02 PM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207961181 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION [1693423] to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/28/2017) filed by Jack Danielson, EPA, NHTSA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1430, EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1447 (Service Date: 09/18/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 448 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 09/18/2017 02:51 PM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207954331 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          CLERK'S ORDER [1689604] filed that these cases continue to remain in abeyance pending further order of the court [1689310-2]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 09/18/2017 [16-1430, 16-1447] [Entered: 08/21/2017 04:10 PM]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207953782 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION [1689310] to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/28/2017) filed by Jack Danielson, EPA, NHTSA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1430, EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1447 (Service Date: 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 444 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 08/17/2017 07:22 PM]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207949376 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              CLERK'S ORDER [1686816] filed considering motion to govern future proceedings [1685215-3]; considering motion to hold case in abeyance [1685013-2]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 08/17/2017 [16-1430, 16-1447] [Entered: 08/01/2017 04:01 PM]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207946490 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION [1685215] } to govern future proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/31/2017) filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. in 16-1430 (Service Date: 07/20/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 221 words. [16-1430, 16-1447]--[MODIFIED EVENT--Edited 07/21/2017 by LMC] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 07/20/2017 06:08 PM]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207946173 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION [1685013] to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/31/2017) filed by Jack Danielson, EPA, NHTSA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1430, EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1447 (Service Date: 07/20/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 475 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 07/20/2017 09:10 AM]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207926519 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    PER CURIAM ORDER [1674238] granting motion to hold these consolidated cases in abeyance for 90 days [1672024-2]; holding cases 16-1430 and 16-1447 in abeyance pending further order of the court; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by July 20, 2017. Before Judges: Griffith, Srinivasan and Pillard. [16-1430, 16-1447] [Entered: 05/08/2017 01:20 PM]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207924258 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      REPLY [1673036] filed by Jack Danielson, EPA, NHTSA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1430, EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1447 to response [1672207-2] [Service Date: 04/28/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 638 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 04/28/2017 09:54 AM]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207922783 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1672207] to motion to hold case in abeyance [1672024-2] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. in 16-1430 [Service Date: 04/21/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 875 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 04/21/2017 05:44 PM]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207922399 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION [1672024] to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/01/2017) filed by Jack Danielson, EPA, NHTSA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1430, EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1447 (Service Date: 04/20/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 562 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 04/20/2017 04:06 PM]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207919689 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1670567] filed by Howard M. Crystal on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Center for Biological Diversity. [16-1430] (Crystal, Howard) [Entered: 04/11/2017 02:20 PM]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207915841 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1668544] filed by M. Elaine Meckenstock and co-counsel Melinda F. Pilling on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent California Air Resources Board. [16-1430] (Pilling, Melinda) [Entered: 03/30/2017 12:27 PM]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207913570 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CLERK'S ORDER [1667342] directing parties to submit proposed briefing formats by 04/21/2017. [16-1430, 16-1447] [Entered: 03/22/2017 03:53 PM]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207909988 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  CLERK'S ORDER [1665427] filed granting motions for leave to intervene [1656997-2] [1656970-2] [1656596-2]. [16-1430, 16-1447] [Entered: 03/10/2017 12:03 PM]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207909223 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1665048] filed by Jack Danielson and NHTSA [Service Date: 03/08/2017 ] [16-1430] (Byron, H. Thomas) [Entered: 03/08/2017 04:20 PM]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207908961 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1664907] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1430, 16-1447 [Service Date: 03/08/2017 ] [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 03/08/2017 10:31 AM]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207904509 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1662496] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. in 16-1430 [Service Date: 02/22/2017 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [16-1430, 16-1447] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 02/22/2017 03:36 PM]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207904503 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1662493] submitted by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. in 16-1430 [Service Date: 02/22/2017 ] [16-1430, 16-1447] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 02/22/2017 03:34 PM]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207904500 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1662491] filed by Racing Enthusiasts and Suppliers Coalition [Service Date: 02/22/2017 ] [16-1447] (Broome, Shannon) [Entered: 02/22/2017 03:34 PM]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207904497 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              DOCKETING STATEMENT [1662490] filed by Racing Enthusiasts and Suppliers Coalition [Service Date: 02/22/2017 ] [16-1447] (Broome, Shannon) [Entered: 02/22/2017 03:33 PM]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207904494 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                DOCKETING STATEMENT [1662489] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. in 16-1430 [Service Date: 02/22/2017 ] [16-1430, 16-1447] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 02/22/2017 03:31 PM]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207904491 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1662488] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. in 16-1430 [Service Date: 02/22/2017 ] [16-1430, 16-1447] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 02/22/2017 03:30 PM]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207904488 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1662486] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. in 16-1430 [Service Date: 02/22/2017 ] [16-1430, 16-1447] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 02/22/2017 03:29 PM]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207900697 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      REPLY [1660269] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 16-1430 to response [1659206-2] [Service Date: 02/08/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 134 Words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Weaver, Susannah) [Entered: 02/08/2017 04:13 PM]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207898788 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE [1659206] filed to motion for leave to intervene [1656997-2], motion for leave to intervene [1656970-2] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. [Service Date: 02/02/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 279. [16-1430] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 02/02/2017 06:38 PM]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207894776 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MODIFIED PARTY FILER--AMENDED MOTION [1656997] filed for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Center for Conservation Biology, Union of Concerned Scientists [Service Date: 01/23/2017 ] [16-1430, 16-1447]--[Edited 01/25/2017 by LMC] (Weaver, Susannah) [Entered: 01/23/2017 10:40 PM]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207894707 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1656970] filed for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by State of Washington, State of Vermont, State of Rhode Island, State of Oregon, State of Massachusetts, State of Iowa, State of Connecticut and California Air Resources Board [Service Date: 01/23/2017 ] [16-1430, 16-1447]--[Edited 01/25/2017 by LMC] (Meckenstock, Margaret) [Entered: 01/23/2017 07:05 PM]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207894686 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              CLERK'S ORDER [1656961] filed granting motion to extend time [1656560-2]; considering response [1656575-2] in 16-1430; initial submissions for PETITIONER due 02/22/2017. PETITIONER, RESPONDENT procedural motions due 02/22/2017. PETITIONER, RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 03/08/2017; RESPONDENT certified index to record due 03/08/2017.[16-1430, 16-1447] [Entered: 01/23/2017 06:35 PM]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207894366 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1656849] for motion to extend time [1656560-2] filed by EPA, Gina McCarthy, NHTSA and Mark R Rosekind in 16-1430, EPA and Gina McCarthy in 16-1447. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 01/23/2017 02:33 PM]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207894225 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1656779] for response [1656575-2] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc.. [16-1430] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 01/23/2017 12:05 PM]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207893894 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1656596] filed for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Environmental Defense Fund [Service Date: 01/19/2017 ] [16-1430, 16-1447]--[Edited 01/23/2017 by LMC] (Weaver, Susannah) [Entered: 01/19/2017 09:58 PM]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207893833 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE [1656575] filed to motion to extend time [1656560-2] filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. in 16-1430 [Service Date: 01/19/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 136 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Theodore, Elisabeth) [Entered: 01/19/2017 10:12 AM]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207893783 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION [1656560] filed to extend time to file motion to 02/22/2017. filed by EPA, Gina McCarthy, NHTSA and Mark R Rosekind in 16-1430, EPA and Gina McCarthy in 16-1447 [Service Date: 01/18/2017 ] Length Certification: 334 words. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 01/18/2017 06:27 PM]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207891557 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1655294] filed by Sue Chen on behalf of Respondents EPA, Gina McCarthy, NHTSA and Mark R Rosekind in 16-1430, Respondents EPA and Gina McCarthy in 16-1447. [16-1430, 16-1447] (Chen, Sue) [Entered: 01/11/2017 02:26 PM]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207891067 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1655003] filed by H. Thomas Byron III and co-counsel Douglas N. Letter on behalf of Respondents NHTSA and Mark R Rosekind. [16-1430] (Byron, H. Thomas) [Entered: 01/10/2017 01:20 PM]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207887531 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S ORDER [1653075] filed consolidating cases 16-1447 (Consolidation started 12/28/2016) with 16-1430; directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 01/27/2017. PETITIONER statement of issues due 01/27/2017 [16-1430, 16-1447] [Entered: 12/28/2016 09:10 AM]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207886920 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S ORDER [1652790] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 01/23/2017. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 01/23/2017. PETITIONER statement of issues due 01/23/2017. PETITIONER underlying decision due 01/23/2017. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 01/23/2017. PETITIONER procedural motions due 01/23/2017. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 02/06/2017; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 01/23/2017. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 01/23/2017. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 02/06/2017. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 02/06/2017 [16-1430] [Entered: 12/23/2016 11:17 AM]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207886915 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFIED COPY [1652788] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [1652784-2] [16-1430] [Entered: 12/23/2016 11:15 AM]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207886907 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    PETITION FOR REVIEW [1652784] filed of a decision by federal agency filed by Truck Trailer Manufacturers Association, Inc. [Service Date: 12/22/2016 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [16-1430] [Entered: 12/23/2016 11:12 AM]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [16-1430] [Entered: 12/23/2016 11:10 AM]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?