In re: Restraint of Twenty Real Prop
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 19-5034

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 20, 2019 at 7:36 AM DT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2890 - Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208105735 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S ORDER [1774794] filed consolidating cases 19-5035, 19-5036 (Consolidation started 02/25/2019) with 19-5034; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 03/27/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 03/27/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 03/27/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 03/27/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 03/27/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 03/27/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 03/27/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 03/27/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 04/11/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 03/27/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 03/27/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 03/27/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 04/11/2019 [19-5034, 19-5035, 19-5036] [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:53 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208105048 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    LETTER [1774420] sent regarding attorney membership to Kelley C. Barnaby for Real Estate 26 Investments LLC and Mr. James Adam Kraehenbuehl for Mondrian 1026 LLC, Ocean 26 Holdings LLC and Ocean Five Office 400 LLC. Application for Admission due 03/25/2019. [19-5034] [Entered: 02/22/2019 11:13 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208105043 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF APPEAL [1774415] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-mc-01612-CKK filed by Real Estate 26 Investments LLC. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5034. [19-5034] [Entered: 02/22/2019 11:07 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5034] [Entered: 02/22/2019 11:05 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 1 time.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?