Lesa Werme v. Mortgage Center, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 18-1886

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 20, 2019 at 7:33 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUBMISSION ON BRIEFS date set for Tuesday, March 19, 2019. (LTK) [Entered: 01/10/2019 03:42 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Steven A. Finegood for Appellant Lesa Werme Certificate of Service:11/14/2018. [18-1886] (SAF) [Entered: 11/14/2018 11:42 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Christian K. Mullett for FHLMC and Mortgage Center, LLC Certificate of Service:10/31/2018. Argument Request: requested. [18-1886] (CKM) [Entered: 10/31/2018 02:55 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Steven A. Finegood for Lesa Werme Certificate of Service:10/01/2018. Argument Request: requested. [18-1886] (SAF) [Entered: 10/01/2018 11:45 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 08/31/2018 01:55 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/01/2018; appellee brief due 10/31/2018. (KSF) [Entered: 08/21/2018 10:56 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Steven A. Finegood for Lesa Werme. Certificate of Service: 08/20/2018. [18-1886] (SAF) [Entered: 08/20/2018 06:53 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Steven A. Finegood for Appellant Lesa Werme. Certificate of Service:08/20/2018. [18-1886] (SAF) [Entered: 08/20/2018 06:33 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Steven A. Finegood for Appellant Lesa Werme Certificate of Service: 08/20/2018. [18-1886] (SAF) [Entered: 08/20/2018 06:30 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Lesa Werme by STEVEN A. FINEGOOD (P32157). Certificate of Service: 08/20/2018. [18-1886] (SAF) [Entered: 08/20/2018 06:26 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?