Center for Bio. Diversity v. USDHS
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 18-55474

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 20, 2019 at 7:34 AM EDT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DEFINDERS OF WILDLIFE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Jason Craig Rylander,, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 415-977-5532

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Gloria D. Smith

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 707-795-2533

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Anthony T. Eliseuson
No Logo CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 619-645-2014

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Dep State Aty Gen, COR LD NTC Dep State Aty Gen Michael P. Cayaban,, Attorney
No Logo DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, a nonprofit conservation organization, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DEFINDERS OF WILDLIFE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Jason Craig Rylander,, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 415-977-5532

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Gloria D. Smith

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 707-795-2533

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Anthony T. Eliseuson
No Logo PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through Xavier Becerra, Attorney General, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 619-645-2014

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Dep State Aty Gen, COR LD NTC Dep State Aty Gen Michael P. Cayaban,, Attorney
No Logo SIERRA CLUB, a nonprofit public benefit corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DEFINDERS OF WILDLIFE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Jason Craig Rylander,, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 415-977-5532

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Gloria D. Smith

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 707-795-2533

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Anthony T. Eliseuson
No Logo CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 415-632-5339

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained Anchun Jean Su

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 510-844-7141

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained Brendan Ridgely Cummings

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 805-750-8852

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained Brian Segee, Senior Attorney
No Logo In re: BORDER INFRASTRUCTURE ENVIRONMENTAL LITIGATION,
No Logo KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, Commissioner, in his official capacity, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-514-3518

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government Benjamin M. Shultz, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government H. Thomas Byron, III, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney, COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney, COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney, COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney Samuel William Bettwy, Assistant U.S. Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government Courtney Dixon courtney.l.dixon@usdoj.gov
No Logo KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, Secretary, in her official capacity, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-514-3518

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government Benjamin M. Shultz, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government H. Thomas Byron, III, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney, COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney, COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney, COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney Samuel William Bettwy, Assistant U.S. Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government Courtney Dixon courtney.l.dixon@usdoj.gov
No Logo U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTIONS, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-514-3518

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government Benjamin M. Shultz, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government H. Thomas Byron, III, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney, COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney, COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney, COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney Samuel William Bettwy, Assistant U.S. Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government Courtney Dixon courtney.l.dixon@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 202-514-3518

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government Benjamin M. Shultz, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government H. Thomas Byron, III, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney, COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney, COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney, COR LD NTC Assist US Attorney Samuel William Bettwy, Assistant U.S. Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government, COR NTC Government Courtney Dixon courtney.l.dixon@usdoj.gov
Nature of Suit 2895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FILED OPINION (M. MARGARET MCKEOWN, CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN) AFFIRMED. Judge: MMM Authoring, Judge: CMC Dissenting FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [11184856] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (RMM) [Entered: 02/11/2019 07:46 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/[10970492] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (DJW) [Entered: 08/08/2018 01:30 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO M. MARGARET MCKEOWN, CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN. [10968854] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476]--[Edited 08/08/2018 by DJW] (DJW) [Entered: 08/07/2018 12:35 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Received paper copies of the joint Reply Brief [30] filed by Appellants. [10950931] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (Sent to Panel) (RG) [Entered: 07/23/2018 08:55 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed clerk order: The joint reply brief [30] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10944600] [18-55476, 18-55474, 18-55475] (KWG) [Entered: 07/17/2018 08:47 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants People of the State of California and CCC in 18-55476, Appellant Center for Biological Diversity in 18-55474, Appellants DOW, Sierra Club and ALDF in 18-55475. Date of service: 07/16/2018. [10944445] [18-55476, 18-55474, 18-55475] (Smith, Janelle) [Entered: 07/16/2018 08:22 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Filed 4 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [26] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellees. (Sent to Panel) [10928494] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (KWG) [Entered: 07/02/2018 09:52 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Received 7 paper copies of Answering Brief [25] filed by Appellees in 18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476. [10928453] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (Sent to Panel) (RG) [Entered: 07/02/2018 09:37 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Filed clerk order: The answering brief [25] submitted by appellees is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [26] submitted by appellees. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10921839] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (KWG) [Entered: 06/26/2018 08:41 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Customs and Border Protections and USDHS in 18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476. Date of service: 06/25/2018. [10921652] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (Shultz, Benjamin) [Entered: 06/25/2018 05:18 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Customs and Border Protections and USDHS in 18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476. Date of service: 06/25/2018. [10921639] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (Shultz, Benjamin) [Entered: 06/25/2018 05:09 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. H. Thomas Byron, III for Appellees Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Customs and Border Protections and USDHS in 18-55474, Attorney Mr. H. Thomas Byron, III for Appellees USDHS, U.S. Customs and Border Protections, Kirstjen Nielsen and Kevin K. McAleenan in 18-55475, 18-55476. [10906136] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (Byron, H. Thomas) [Entered: 06/12/2018 03:26 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Terminated Galen N. Thorp for Kevin K. McAleenan, USDHS, U.S. Customs and Border Protections and Kirstjen Nielsen in 18-55474, USDHS, U.S. Customs and Border Protections, Kirstjen Nielsen and Kevin K. McAleenan in 18-55475 and USDHS, U.S. Customs and Border Protections, Kirstjen Nielsen and Kevin K. McAleenan in 18-55476 (for failure to register for CM/ECF). [10902518] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (RY) [Entered: 06/08/2018 02:50 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Added attorney H. Thomas Byron III for USDHS Kevin K. McAleenan U.S. Customs and Border Protections Kirstjen Nielsen. [10902333] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (JFF) [Entered: 06/08/2018 02:01 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of H. Thomas Byron III for Appellees Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Customs and Border Protections and USDHS in 18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476. Date of service: 06/08/2018. [10902297] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (Byron, H. Thomas) [Entered: 06/08/2018 01:51 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Noah Golden-Krasner for Appellants CCC and People of the State of California in 18-55476. [10892413] [18-55476, 18-55474, 18-55475] (Golden-Krasner, Noah) [Entered: 05/31/2018 04:26 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Notice of Oral Argument on Tuesday, August 7, 2018 - 09:00 A.M. - Courtroom 3 - Pasadena CA.View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case here.Be sure to review the GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible).When you have reviewed the calendar, download the ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form, complete the form, and file it via Appellate ECF or return the completed form to: PASADENA Office.[10889329] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (DJW) [Entered: 05/30/2018 10:59 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Added attorney Edward Henry Ochoa for People of the State of California CCC. [10877595] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (RL) [Entered: 05/18/2018 10:47 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Edward H. Ochoa for Appellant People of the State of California in 18-55476. Date of service: 05/18/2018. [10877304] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (Ochoa, Edward) [Entered: 05/18/2018 09:14 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Filed 4 paper copies of joint excerpts of record [13] in 3 volume(s) filed by Appellants. (Sent to Panel) [10876321] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (KWG) [Entered: 05/17/2018 12:53 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Received 7 paper copies of the Joint Opening Brief [12] filed by Appellants. [10876172] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (Sent to Panel) (RG) [Entered: 05/17/2018 11:44 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Filed clerk order: The joint opening brief [12] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the joint excerpts of record [13] submitted by appellants. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10873075] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (KWG) [Entered: 05/15/2018 01:13 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Center for Biological Diversity in 18-55474, Appellants ALDF, DOW, Sierra Club in 18-55475, Appellants CCC, People of the State of California in 18-55476. Date of service: 05/14/2018. [10872213] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct party filers. 05/15/2018 by RY] (Cayaban, Michael) [Entered: 05/14/2018 07:18 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Center for Biological Diversity in 18-55474, Appellants ALDF, DOW and Sierra Club in 18-55475, Appellants CCC and People of the State of California in 18-55476. Date of service: 05/14/2018. [10872210] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of brief. 05/15/2018 by RY] (Cayaban, Michael) [Entered: 05/14/2018 06:55 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in Pasadena.Please review the Pasadena sitting dates for August 2018 at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions. If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please inform the court immediately, using CM/ECF (Type of Document: File Correspondence to Court; Subject: regarding availability for oral argument).When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date.If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter immediately, using CM/ECF (Type of Document: File Correspondence to Court; Subject: request for mediation). [10851742] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (AKM) [Entered: 04/26/2018 10:08 AM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Filed order (RICHARD C. TALLMAN and MARY H. MURGUIA) The unopposed motion to expedite these consolidated appeals is granted (Docket Entry No. [10840631-1] in appeal No. 18-55476). The consolidated opening brief and excerpts of record are due May 14, 2018; the consolidated answering brief is due June 25, 2018; and the consolidated, optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. All parties on a side are ordered to file a single, joint brief. The length of the joint, consolidated opening brief may not exceed 17,000 words. The length of the joint, consolidated answering brief may not exceed 17,000 words. The length of the optional, joint, consolidated reply brief may not exceed 8,500 words. No requests to exceed the page or type volume limits, pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 32-2 or otherwise, will be entertained. No streamlined extensions will be approved under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a). No written motions for extensions of time under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b) will be granted absent extraordinary and compelling circumstances. The Clerk shall calendar these cases before a panel of all Ninth Circuit Judges in August 2018. See 9th Cir. Gen. Ord. 3.3(h). [10851722] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (JMR) [Entered: 04/26/2018 10:02 AM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [10845974] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (VS) [Entered: 04/23/2018 08:45 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Center for Biological Diversity in 18-55474 response joining motion ([10840631-2] Motion (ECF Filing), [10840631-3] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to expedite case). Date of service: 04/20/2018. [10844361] [18-55474, 18-55476, 18-55475] (Segee, Brian) [Entered: 04/20/2018 10:36 AM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: FG): The court sua sponte consolidates appeal Nos. 18-55474, 18-55475, and 18-55476. The court is in receipt of the motion to expedite filed by appellants in appeal No. 18-55476 (Docket Entry No. [10840631-1] in appeal No. 18-55476). Appellants indicate that appellees do not oppose the motion. Appellants in appeal Nos. 18-55474 and 18-55475 shall file a response or notice of non-opposition to the motion to expedite by Tuesday, April 24, 2018. Briefing is stayed pending further order. [10843758] [18-55474, 18-55475, 18-55476] (JMR) [Entered: 04/19/2018 04:29 PM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Added attorney Courtney Dixon for USDHS Kevin K. McAleenan U.S. Customs and Border Protections Kirstjen Nielsen, in case 18-55474. [10841712] (NAC) [Entered: 04/18/2018 01:46 PM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Courtney L. Dixon for Appellees Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Customs and Border Protections and USDHS. Date of service: 04/18/2018. [10841507] [18-55474] (Dixon, Courtney) [Entered: 04/18/2018 12:30 PM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Center for Biological Diversity Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/17/2018. [10839980] [18-55474] (Segee, Brian) [Entered: 04/17/2018 01:30 PM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Added attorney Benjamin M. Shultz for USDHS Kevin K. McAleenan U.S. Customs and Border Protections Kirstjen Nielsen, in case 18-55474. [10833938] (NAC) [Entered: 04/12/2018 09:59 AM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Benjamin M. Shultz for Appellees Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Customs and Border Protections and USDHS. Date of service: 04/12/2018. [10833717] [18-55474] (Shultz, Benjamin) [Entered: 04/12/2018 08:43 AM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/18/2018. Transcript ordered by 05/09/2018. Transcript due 06/08/2018. Appellant Center for Biological Diversity opening brief due 07/18/2018. Appellees Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Customs and Border Protections and U.S. Department of Homeland Security answering brief due 08/20/2018. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [10833075] (RT) [Entered: 04/11/2018 02:30 PM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?