Avila v. Reliant Capital Solutions, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 18-3637

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 20, 2019 at 2:50 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Annmarie Avila, FILED. Service date 03/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2520790] [18-3637] [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:03 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file late reply brief, [63] filed by Appellant Annmarie Avila, FILED. [2519981][68] [18-3637]--[Edited 03/18/2019 by WD] [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:07 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CURED DEFECTIVE Motion to file late, [63], on behalf of Appellant Annmarie Avila, FILED.[2519184] [18-3637] [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:35 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION, to file late, on behalf of Appellant Annmarie Avila, FILED. Service date 03/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2519172] [18-3637] [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:30 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to file late, [60], on behalf of Appellant Annmarie Avila, FILED.[2519160] [18-3637] [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:23 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Annmarie Avila, FILED. Service date 03/14/2019 by CM/ECF. [2518549] [18-3637] [Entered: 03/14/2019 06:29 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/28/2019, PROPOSED.[2517288] [18-3637] [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:54 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Philip D. Stern, Esq. for Appellant Annmarie Avila, FILED. Service date 03/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2514006] [18-3637] [Entered: 03/08/2019 03:37 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [53], on behalf of Appellee Reliant Capital Solutions, LLC, FILED.[2511432] [18-3637] [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:29 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ATTORNEY, David A. Grassi Jr. for Reliant Capital Solutions, LLC, in case 18-3637, [53], ADDED.[2511429] [18-3637] [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:28 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 1 time.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?