George Hauptman v. Midland Credit Management, Inc
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 19-1374

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 20, 2019 at 2:53 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Encore Capital Group, Inc., Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP INCORPORATED"

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 312-704-3000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained David M. Schultz, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 312-704-3966

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Todd P. Stelter, Attorney
No Logo Midland Credit Management Inc, Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INCORPORATED"

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 312-704-3000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained David M. Schultz, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 312-704-3966

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Todd P. Stelter, Attorney
Midland Funding LLC Midland Funding LLC, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 312-704-3000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained David M. Schultz, Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 312-704-3966

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained Todd P. Stelter, Attorney
No Logo GEORGE HAUPTMAN, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 630-575-8181

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained James C. Vlahakis, Attorney
Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David M. Schultz for Appellees Encore Capital Group Incorporated, Midland Credit Management, Incorporated and Midland Funding, LLC. [8] [6990415] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1374]--[Edited 03/13/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Schultz is added to the docket.] (Schultz, David) [Entered: 03/13/2019 11:08 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant George Hauptman. [7] [6989803] [19-1374] (Vlahakis, James) [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:06 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER: The appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the correct date that the judgment was entered on the district court docket. The statement is due on or before March 14, 2019. (See order for details.) DW [6] [6989552] [19-1374] (CAG) [Entered: 03/08/2019 09:41 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Docketing Statement filed by Appellant George Hauptman. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [6989238] [19-1374] (Vlahakis, James) [Entered: 03/06/2019 08:28 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James C. Vlahakis for Appellant George Hauptman. [4] [6989236] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1374] (Vlahakis, James) [Entered: 03/06/2019 07:26 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/22/2019 for George Hauptman. Appellees' brief due on or before 05/22/2019 for Encore Capital Group Incorporated, Midland Credit Management, Incorporated and Midland Funding, LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/12/2019 for Appellant George Hauptman. RJS [6989200] [19-1374] (AG) [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:13 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Friday, March 22, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [2] [6989197] [19-1374] (AG) [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:09 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant George Hauptman by 03/08/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 03/15/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/10/2019 for George Hauptman. [1] [6988174] [19-1374] (AG) [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:33 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 2 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?