Michael Kaiser v. Cascade Capital, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 19-35151

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 20, 2019 at 2:55 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Added attorney Hillary A. Taylor for Cascade Capital, LLC Gordon, Aylworth & Tami P.C., in case 19-35151. [11240894] (CW) [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:18 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Hillary A. Taylor for Appellees Cascade Capital, LLC and Gordon, Aylworth & Tami P.C.. Date of service: 03/25/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11240865] [19-35151] (Taylor, Hillary) [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:03 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11237810] (VS) [Entered: 03/21/2019 02:16 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 03/21/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11223323] (BS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:31 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/04/2019.To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following link.Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11215712] (AD) [Entered: 03/04/2019 06:44 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Filed (ECF) Appellees Cascade Capital, LLC and Gordon, Aylworth & Tami P.C. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/04/2019. [11215532] [19-35151] (Huedepohl, Kelly) [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:29 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/26/2019.To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following link.Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11208900] (AD) [Entered: 02/26/2019 06:44 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Filed (ECF) Appellants Michael Kaiser and Margaret J. Loewen Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/26/2019. [11208114] [19-35151] (Knewtson, Bret) [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:30 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/04/2019. Transcript ordered by 03/25/2019. Transcript due 04/24/2019. Appellants Michael Kaiser and Margaret J. Loewen opening brief due 06/03/2019. Appellees Cascade Capital, LLC and Gordon, Aylworth & Tami P.C. answering brief due 07/03/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11205928] (JBS) [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:05 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?