USA v. VITALE

Criminal Case New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:97-cr-00573-JHR
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHELE BROWN +1 973 645 2905 michele.brown@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo FRANCIS X. VITALE, JR., Defendant

Represented by Walder Hayden and Brogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JUSTIN P. WALDER +1 973 992 5300 jpwalder@whbesqs.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Office Camden
Filed 9/30/1997
County Middlesex
Terminated 1/20/1998
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 2
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201.F ATTEMPT TO EVADE OR DEFEAT TAX
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 USCA Order (Terms Appeal)
Certified Copy Of Order from the USCA. Re: Order amending opinion (mb)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 USCA Judgment
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. Re: [11-1] appeal affirming judgment/order FRANCIS X. VITALE (1) count(s) 1, 2 (mb)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Memorandum Opinion
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. from the United States Court of Appeals. (mb)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/10/1998 Memorandum Opinion
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. from the United States Court of Appeals. (mb)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR., that Walter J. Pagano shall forthwith turnover to Sue Monico or such tax preparer as designated by Francis X. Vitale, Jr. all of the documents and work papers in his possession. The required tax returns shall be prep[ared and filed as soon as possible but no later than 2/26/99. ( Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (mb)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 8/26/98 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR., Telephone-conference held. (Court Reporter/ESR: CARL NAMI, JR.) (mb)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR., Allowing deft an extension of time to amend tax returns in accordance with the special conditions set at time of sentencing ( Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (mb)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 4/6/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998 Transcript Request
Transcript requested as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. Guilty Plea, 9/30/97. (jn)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 2/11/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal
NOTICE of Docketing ROA from USCA as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. Re: [11-1] appeal USCA Number: 98-5072 (mb)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. for dates of JANUARY 15, 1998 (mb)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 1/28/1998, Entered: 1/29/1998 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
NOTICE OF APPEAL by FRANCIS X. VITALE (1) count(s) 1, 2 re: [10-1] judgment order FILING FEE $ 105.00 paid RECEIPT # 238697 Copies mailed to USCA, JUSTIN P. WALDER, MICHELE BROWN (mb)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 1/20/1998, Entered: 1/21/1998 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT FRANCIS X. VITALE (1) count(s) 1, 2 . IMPRISONMENT 30 Months on Counts 1 and 2 to run concurrently, SUPERVISED RELEASE 24 Months on Counts 1 and 2 to run concurrently, FINE waived, SPECIAL ASSESSMENT $100.00 for Counts 1 and 2. (signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (mb)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 1/20/1998, Entered: 1/21/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 1/20/98 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR., Sentencing held. FRANCIS X. VITALE (1) count(s) 1, 2, Ordered deft. to surrender 3/3/98 to an institue to be designated by the Bureau of Prisons, Ordered bail continued (Court Reporter/ESR: CARL NAMI, JR.) (mb)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/15/1998, Entered: 8/5/2008 Judgment Index - Add Record
JUDGMENT RECORD ADDED. (gn, )
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Notice of Allocation and AssignmentCourt Filing
NOTICE OF ALLOCATION AND ASSIGNMENT in Courtroom 5D Camden ( before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (ln) Modified on 09/30/1997
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. ( Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (ln) Modified on 10/01/1997
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Plea Agreement
Plea Agreement as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. (ln)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Application/Petition
APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION TO ENTER A PLEA OF GUILTY by FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. (ln)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
NOTICE of Appearance for FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. by Attorney JUSTIN P. WALDER, Esq. (ln)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Waiver of Indictment
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. (ln)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 9/30/97 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez as to FRANCIS X. VITALE JR., Initial Appearance held. (Defendant informed of rights.) , Bond set to $10,000.00 unsecured with conditions for FRANCIS X. VITALE. , set Sentencing for 10:30 1/9/98 for FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. (Court Reporter/ESR: Carl Jr.) (ln) Modified on 10/01/1997
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Information - Felony
INFORMATION as to FRANCIS X. VITALE (1) count(s) 1, 2 (ln) Modified on 10/01/1997
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Bond
BAIL/BOND executed by FRANCIS X. VITALE JR. in the Amount of $10,000 unsecured (ln) Modified on 10/01/1997
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 Plea Entered
PLEA of Guilty: FRANCIS X. VITALE (1) count(s) 1, 2 ; Court accepts plea. (ln)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 75 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?