JENKINS v. COUNTY OF CAMDEN, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-01618-JHR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TIMOTHY B. JENKINS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by croninandmusto.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PATRICK T. CRONIN +1 856 857 1776 +1 856 857 1778 ptcesq@croninandmusto.com
v.
No Logo CITY OF CAMDEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Camden, New Jersey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DENNIS G KILLE +1 856 757 7170
No Logo City of Philadelphia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL R. RESNICK +1 215 685 5239
No Logo COUNTY OF CAMDEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARYLOU GARTY +1 856 225 5543 lgarty@camdencounty.com
No Logo HYDOW PARK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL R. RESNICK +1 215 685 5239
No Logo LEE SOLOMON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARYLOU GARTY +1 856 225 5543 lgarty@camdencounty.com
No Logo PEPE BOYD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RALPH RAYMOND KRAMER +1 856 546 1114 elpino1@aol.com
No Logo RONALD MORGAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo CITY OF CAMDEN, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Camden, New Jersey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DENNIS G KILLE +1 856 757 7170
No Logo COUNTY OF CAMDEN, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARYLOU GARTY +1 856 225 5543 lgarty@camdencounty.com
No Logo LEE SOLOMON, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARYLOU GARTY +1 856 225 5543 lgarty@camdencounty.com
No Logo PEPE BOYD, Cross-Claimant
No Logo RONALD MORGAN, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo City of Philadelphia, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL R. RESNICK +1 215 685 5239
No Logo COUNTY OF CAMDEN, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARYLOU GARTY +1 856 225 5543 lgarty@camdencounty.com
No Logo HYDOW PARK, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL R. RESNICK +1 215 685 5239
No Logo LEE SOLOMON, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARYLOU GARTY +1 856 225 5543 lgarty@camdencounty.com
No Logo RONALD MORGAN, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 3/31/1997
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Camden
Terminated 11/18/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/18/1999, Entered: 11/18/1999 Terminated Case
Case closed (femp)
    LREF
    Blank 47 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [44-1] motion for summary judgment; granting [37-1] motion to dismiss; granting [35-1] motion for summary judgment ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (femp)
      LREF
      Blank 46 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Certificate Of Service.
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TIMOTHY B. JENKINS of pltf's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by deft. City of Camden (femp)
        LREF
        Blank 45 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Certification
        CERTIFICATION of Laurel A. Musto on behalf of CITY OF CAMDEN Re: [44-1] motion for summary judgment (femp)
          LREF
          Blank 44 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999, Terminated: 9/29/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
          Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by CITY OF CAMDEN, Motion set for 5/21/99 on [44-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (femp)
            LREF
            Blank 43 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER that pltf's application to enlarge time to serve responding papers on summary judgment motion of deft. CamdenCounty is extended to 4/8/99 and that complete motion briefing packet shall be filed with the Clerk by 4/12/99 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (femp)
              LREF
              Blank 42 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999 Remark
              Letter by deft. Pepe Boyd that it will be joining in the City of Camden's Motion for Summary Judgment (femp)
                LREF
                Blank 41 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Certification
                CERTIFICATION of Patrick T. Cronin on behalf of TIMOTHY B. JENKINS pursuant to Rule 56(f) and to Certify Documents (femp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 40 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial conference 2:45 7/28/99 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 7/28/99 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 4/9/99 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (femp) Modified on 04/22/1999
                    LREF
                    Blank 39 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999 ~Notice (other)
                    Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by COUNTY OF CAMDEN, LEE SOLOMON (femp) Modified on 04/22/1999
                      LREF
                      Blank 38 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 Certification
                      CERTIFICATION of Laurel A. Musto on behalf of TIMOTHY B. JENKINS Re: [37-1] motion to dismiss (femp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 37 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999, Terminated: 9/29/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                        Notice of MOTION to dismiss by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, HYDOW PARK, Motion set for 4/16/99 on [37-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (femp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 36 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 Certificate Of Service.
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TIMOTHY B. JENKINS of pltf's Opposition to deft Ronald Morgan's motion for summary judgment (femp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 35 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999, Terminated: 9/29/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
                            Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by RONALD MORGAN, Motion set for 3/19/99 on [35-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (femp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 34 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 ~Notice (other)
                              Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by RONALD MORGAN (jm1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 33 Filed: 12/17/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 Letter
                                LETTER By counsel for TIMOTHY B. JENKINS that parties have agreed to extend time to answer County's Motion to 1/11/99 (femp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 32 Filed: 11/17/1998, Entered: 11/18/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                  Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by RONALD MORGAN (femp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 31 Filed: 11/16/1998, Entered: 11/16/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                    Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, HYDOW PARK (femp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 30 Filed: 11/12/1998, Entered: 11/12/1998 Letter
                                      LETTER By counsel for pltf. TIMOTHY B. JENKINS re extension of time to answer motion for summary judgment to 12/14/98 (femp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 29 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                        CONSENT ORDER for the deposition of the Plaintiff, etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (er)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 28 Filed: 4/29/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Remark
                                          Offer of Judgment by deft. Ronald Morgan (femp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 27 Filed: 4/9/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998 Remark
                                            Offer of Judgment by defts. County of Camden and Solomon (femp)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 26 Filed: 4/1/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                              FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 5/29/98 ; Pretrial conference 3:30 12/16/98 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 12/16/98 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 11/30/98 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (femp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/26/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Status Conference
                                                Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/25/98. (femp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Substitution of Attorney
                                                  Substitute attorney for PEPE BOYD ; Terminated attorney DENNIS G KILLE for PEPE BOYD ; Added, RALPH R. KRAMER (femp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/8/1997, Entered: 12/8/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                    Deadline updated; setting scheduling order deadlines: Discovery deadline on 4/30/98 (er)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: 12/3/1997, Terminated: 11/18/1999 Answer
                                                      ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by RONALD MORGAN against RONALD MORGAN (femp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 12/1/1997, Entered: 12/1/1997 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff for 4/30/97; Pretrial conference set for10:00AM on 11/16/98; Status conferenceset for 10:00AM on 2/19/98; Dispositive Motion due on or before 10/30/98 ( signed Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (er)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/19/1997, Entered: 12/1/1997 Scheduling Conference
                                                          Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/19/97. (er)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 10/16/1997, Entered: 10/21/1997 Answer
                                                            ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by CITY OF CAMDEN, PEPE BOYD against COUNTY OF CAMDEN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, HYDOW PARK, LEE SOLOMON, RONALD MORGAN (femp)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 10/15/1997, Entered: 10/21/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [5-1] motion to extend time to serve summons and complaint ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (jm1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 10/15/1997, Entered: 10/21/1997 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by ; Minutes of: 10.15.97; The following actions were taken, granting [5-1] motion to extend time to serve summons and complaint; and terminating [5-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 10/17/97 on [5-1] motion By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (jm1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/2/1997 Answer
                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, HYDOW PARK (femp)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/2/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE of attorney appearance for HYDOW PARK by MICHAEL R. RESNICK (femp)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/1/1997, Entered: 10/2/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for CITY OF PHILADELPHIA by MICHAEL R. RESNICK (femp) Modified on 10/02/1997
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                        Minute entry: Minutes of: 9/29/97; The following actions were taken, withdrawing [3-1] dismiss/dismissal notice Call for Dismissal By Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez (femp)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 9/26/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
                                                                          APPLICATION by CITY OF CAMDEN, PEPE BOYD and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 10/16/97 for PEPE BOYD, for CITY OF CAMDEN (femp)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 9/26/1997, Entered: 9/29/1997 Certification
                                                                            CERTIFICATION of Timothy Jenkins (femp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/24/1997 Certification
                                                                              CERTIFICATION of Patrick T. Cronin on behalf of TIMOTHY B. JENKINS Re: [5-1] motion to extend time to serve summons and complaint (femp)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/24/1997 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED as to HYDOW PARK 9/17/97 Answer deadline projected for 11/16/97 for HYDOW PARK (femp)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER, set scheduling conference for 10:30 11/18/97 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (femp)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                    ANSWER by COUNTY OF CAMDEN, LEE SOLOMON to all Crossclaims (femp)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997 Answer
                                                                                      ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by COUNTY OF CAMDEN, LEE SOLOMON against COUNTY OF CAMDEN, LEE SOLOMON (femp)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/19/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA 9/10/97 Answer due on 9/30/97 for CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (femp)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/19/1997 Certification
                                                                                          CERTIFICATION of Patrick T. Cronin on behalf of TIMOTHY B. JENKINS Re: [5-1] motion to extend time to serve summons and complaint (femp)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/12/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to COUNTY OF CAMDEN, CITY OF CAMDEN, LEE SOLOMON, PEPE BOYD 9/10/97 Answer due on 9/30/97 for PEPE BOYD, for LEE SOLOMON, for CITY OF CAMDEN, for COUNTY OF CAMDEN (femp)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 9/12/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997 Certification
                                                                                              CERTIFICATION of Patrick T.Cronin on behalf of TIMOTHY B. JENKINS Re: [5-1] motion to extend time (femp)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 9/12/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997, Terminated: 10/15/1997 Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                Notice of MOTION to extend time to serve summons and complaint by TIMOTHY B. JENKINS [5-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion hearing set for 9:30 10/17/97 on [5-1] motion . ORAL ARGUMENT (femp) Modified on 09/16/1997
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: 9/2/1997 Summons Issued
                                                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for COUNTY OF CAMDEN, CITY OF CAMDEN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, LEE SOLOMON, RONALD MORGAN, PEPE BOYD ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (femp)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997, Terminated: 9/30/1997 Notice of Call for dismissal
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Call for Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41.1(a) Motion hearing set for 9:30 9/29/97 (ln)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 9/2/1997 Remark
                                                                                                      Request by pltf. for summons to be issued (femp)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: 4/1/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate ROBERT B. KUGLER (et)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/1/1997 Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 224762 (et)
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 126 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?