USA v. Avenatti
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cr-00374-DAB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 18, 2021 at 10:40 PM DT (15.1 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew D Podolsky +1 212 637 1947 matthew.podolsky@usdoj.gov
Space Robert Benjamin Sobelman +1 212 637 2616 robert.sobelman@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Avenatti, Michael J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Avenatti"

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Michael Avenatti (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 5/22/2019
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F WIRE FRAUD
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028A.F AGGRAVATED IDENTITY THEFT
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag ECF
  Entries (124) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/1/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/9/2020, Entered: None Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/9/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Remark
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/2/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/2/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/1/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/1/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Transfer Case
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/22/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Transfer Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Transfer Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Michael Avenatti. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/28/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Michael Avenatti re: Conference held on 5/28/19 before Judge Deborah A. Batts. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appearance Bond Entered as to Michael Avenatti in amount of $300,000.00. Agreed conditions of release; $300,000 Personal Recognizance Bond; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/CDCA with domestic travel with prior notification by PTS; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; Defendant to be released on own signature; No contact with individual identified in the indictment as Victim #1 except in presence of or through counsel. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Initial Appearance as to Michael Avenatti held on 5/28/2019. Date of Arrest: 5/28/2019, Vol. Surr. AUSA Matthew Podolsky. Defense Counsel Sylvie Levine (Federal Defenders). Proceeding: Rule 9, Presentment/Arraignment. BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $300,000 PRB; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/CDCA - with domestic travel with prior notification by PTS; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; Defendant to be released on own signature; No contact with individual identified in the indictment as Victim #1 except in presence of or through counsel. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. Conference before District Judge on 5/28/2019 at 2 p.m. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Deborah A. Batts: Pretrial Conference as to Michael Avenatti held on 5/28/2019. Defendant Michael Avenatti present with Federal Defender Sylvie Levine (For this conference only), AUSA Matthew Podolsky, Robert Soleman and Robert Boone. Special Agent Deleassa and FBI Agent Christopher Harper. Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski. Motion to make a motion DENIED (See transcript). Next conference is scheduled for Tuesday, June 18, 2019 at 10:30 AM. Time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act from today until June 18, 2019. Bail continue as set previously. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER as to Michael Avenatti. Status Conference set for 5/28/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Deborah A. Batts. (By Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 5/28/2019) (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Arraignment as to Michael Avenatti (1) Count 1,2 held on 5/28/2019. Plea entered by Michael Avenatti (1) Count 1,2 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Robert Benjamin Sobelman appearing for USA. (Sobelman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT FILED as to Michael Avenatti (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Designated ECF as to Michael Avenatti. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?