Minh Le v. Tesla, Inc. which will do business in California as Tesla Motors, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 19SC078907

Tags
Last Updated March 10, 2021 at 9:00 PM ST (1.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Le, Minh Quang, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla, Inc. which will do business in California as Tesla Motors, Inc."
Case Type Small Claims $1501 - $5000
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Judgment Satisfaction
in FULL.
    Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)
        Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Request: Postponement (Small Claims)
          Request to Postpone Trial
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
            Cert Mail. Hrg: 07/19/19.
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant
                #7018 1830 0000 8279 1849.

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 52 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?