District Appellate Supreme
Federal
District Of Columbia District Court Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit United States Supreme Court

Donald Trump, et al v. Mazars USA, LLP
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 19-5142

Tags
Last Updated November 13, 2019 at 7:16 PM ST (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States House of Representatives, Committee On Oversight & Government Reform United States House of Representatives, Committee On Oversight & Government Reform, Intervenor for Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "Committee On Oversight And Reform Of The U.s. House Of Representatives"

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roy T. Englert, Jr. +1 202 775 4503 +1 202 775 4510 renglert@robbinsrussell.com
Space Lawrence Saul Robbins +1 202 775 4501 +1 202 775 4510 lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
Space David Hunter Smith +1 203 787 3513 +1 203 789 1605 hsmith@robbinsrussell.com
Space Alan David Strasser +1 202 775 4500 +1 202 775 4510 astrasser@robbinsrussell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan Barbero +1 202 225 9700 megan.barbero@mail.house.gov
Space Brooks M. Hanner +1 202 225 9700 brooks.hanner@mail.house.gov
Space Douglas N. Letter +1 202 225 9700 douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
Space Josephine Thacher Morse +1 202 225 9700 jodie.morse@mail.house.gov
Space Todd Barry Tatelman +1 202 225 9700 +1 202 226 1360 todd.tatelman@mail.house.gov
No Logo Constitutional Accountability Center, Amicus Curiae for Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Constitutional Accountability Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ashwin P Phatak +1 202 296 6889 ashwin@theusconstitution.org
Space ELIZABETH BONNIE WYDRA +1 714 222 0144 +1 202 296 6895 elizabeth@theusconstitution.org
No Logo DJT Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefan Charles Passantino +1 202 844 3820 +1 202 347 1819 spassantino@michaelbest.com
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Plaintiff - Appellant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefan Charles Passantino +1 202 844 3820 +1 202 347 1819 spassantino@michaelbest.com
No Logo Trump Corporation, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefan Charles Passantino +1 202 844 3820 +1 202 347 1819 spassantino@michaelbest.com
Trump Old Post Office LLC Trump Old Post Office LLC, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefan Charles Passantino +1 202 844 3820 +1 202 347 1819 spassantino@michaelbest.com
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefan Charles Passantino +1 202 844 3820 +1 202 347 1819 spassantino@michaelbest.com
Trump Organization, LLC Trump Organization, LLC, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefan Charles Passantino +1 202 844 3820 +1 202 347 1819 spassantino@michaelbest.com
No Logo Duane Morley Cox, Amicus Curiae for Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Duane Morley Cox +1 801 755 3578
Mazars USA, LLP Mazars USA, LLP, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Daniel Bernstein +1 212 885 5398 +1 212 332 3766 jbernstein@blankrome.com
Space Henry F Schuelke, III +1 202 772 5815 +1 202 572 1434 hschuelke@blankrome.com
Space Lawrence H. Wechsler +1 202 772 5824 +1 202 572 8390 lwechsler@blankrome.com
United States of America United States of America, Amicus Curiae
Nature of Suit 2890 - Other Statutory Actions
Case Type Civil US
Lower Court Case https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:19-cv-01136-APM
Lower Court Case https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:19-cv-01136-APM
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 01208178954 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1815681] (in Slip Opinion format) filed denying appellants' petition for rehearing en banc [1812460-3] Before Judges: Garland, Henderson*, Rogers, Tatel, Griffith, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, Wilkins, Katsas* and Rao*. [19-5142] (Circuit Judges Henderson, Katsas, and Rao would grant the petition) (A statement by Circuit Judge Katsas, with whom Circuit Judge Henderson joins, dissenting from the denial of rehearing en banc, is attached) (A statement by Circuit Judge Rao, with whom Circuit Judge Henderson joins, dissenting in the denial of rehearing en banc, is attached)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208178945 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
    PER CURIAM ORDER [1815679] filed denying appellants' petition for rehearing [1812460-2] Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208177362 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None ?
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 01208176438 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None ?
        REPLY [1814258] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump to response [1813409-2] [Service Date: 11/04/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,592 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
          LREF
          Legal Document 01208175638 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None ?
          RESPONSE [1813835] to petition for rehearing [1812460-2], petition for rehearing en banc [1812460-3] filed by Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives [Service Date: 11/01/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3,881 Words. [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas)
            LREF
            Legal Document 01208174794 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None ?
            RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1813409] to motion to stay mandate [1812461-2] filed by Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives [Service Date: 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3385 words. [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208174190 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None ?
              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1813117] filed by Lawrence S. Robbins on behalf of Appellee Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives. [19-5142] (Robbins, Lawrence)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208173227 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208172891 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                  RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1812461] to motion to issue mandate [1811186-2] combined with a MOTION to stay mandate filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 10/24/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5,189 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 01208172888 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                    PETITION [1812460] for rehearing, for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants Donald J. Trump, Trump Organization, LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust and DJT Holdings, LLC [Service Date: 10/24/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3,881 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208170692 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1811192] filed by Roy T. Englert, Jr. and co-counsel Alan D. Strasser, Jennifer S. Windom, David Hunter Smith on behalf of Appellee Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives. [19-5142] (Englert, Roy)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208170686 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                        MOTION [1811186] to issue mandate filed by Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives (Service Date: 10/16/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2,173 Words. [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208169232 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                          CLERK'S ORDER [1810451] filed withholding issuance of the mandate. [19-5142]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 01208169229 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                            OPINION [1810450] filed (Pages: 66) for the Court by Judge Tatel, DISSENTING OPINION (Pages: 68) by Judge Rao. [19-5142]
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208169218 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                              PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1810446] filed that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause be affirmed for the reasons in the accompanying opinion. Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 01208155182 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                APPELLEE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF [1802970] filed by Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives [Service Date: 08/20/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3997 words. [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 01208155169 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                  APPELLANT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF [1802960] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 08/20/2019 ] Length of Brief: 2,473 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208154415 Filed: 8/16/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                    PER CURIAM ORDER [1802536] filed granting motion to exceed word limits [1802081-2]. The responses to the brief amicus curiae of the United States Department of Justice may not exceed 4,000 words each, and are due by 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, August 20, 2019. Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208153509 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      MOTION [1802081] to exceed response filed by Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives (Service Date: 08/14/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 505 words. [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 01208151357 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        AMICUS BRIEF [1800932] filed by USA United States [Service Date: 08/06/2019 ] Length of Brief: 5,196 Words. [19-5142] (Sinzdak, Gerard)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208149494 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          RESPONSE [1799866] to letter Rule 28j authorities [1799323-2], letter [1799323-3] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, LLC, Donald J. Trump and Trump Organization, Inc. [Service Date: 07/31/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 349 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208149430 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                            PER CURIAM ORDER [1799846] filed directing response to letter Rule 28j authorities [1799323-2]. Response due by 4:00 p.m. on August 1, 2019. In addition to electronic filing, paper copies of the submission are to be delivered to the court by the time and date due. Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208148396 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              LETTER [1799323] pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives [Service Date: 07/26/2019 ] [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208147214 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                PER CURIAM ORDER [1798596] filed granting appellants' motion for leave to file a responsive letter [1798189-2]; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged responsive letter [1798286-2] . Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208146596 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  LETTER [1798286] regarding oral argument matter filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 07/19/2019 ] [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208146727 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    LETTER [1798355] filed by Duane Morley Cox [Service Date: 07/15/2019 ] [19-5142]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208146386 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      MOTION [1798189] for leave to file letter filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump (Service Date: 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 202 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 01208145260 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        LETTER [1797542] regarding oral argument matter [Response to Questions as Directed by the Court at Oral Argument] filed by Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives [Service Date: 07/16/2019 ] [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208144333 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208144030 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                            ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208143511 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                              NOTICE [1796602] sent regarding 7/12/19 public advisory. [19-5142]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208143401 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1796503] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 07/09/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,468 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                  FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, William S. Consovoy, on behalf of Appellants DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information). [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, William S. Consovoy, on behalf of Appellants DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information). [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Douglas N. Letter, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information). [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208141874 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                        PER CURIAM ORDER [1795668] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants - 30 Minutes, Appellee Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives - 30 Minutes; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 07/05/2019 [19-5142]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208141282 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                          NOTICE [1795361] advising that a brief will not be filed filed by Mazars USA, LLP [Service Date: 07/01/2019 ] [19-5142] (Bernstein, Jerry)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 01208141059 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                            APPELLEE BRIEF [1795251] filed by Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives [Service Date: 07/01/2019 ] Length of Brief: 10,920 Words. [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 01208141052 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                              CONSENT AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1795248] filed by Constitutional Accountability Center [Service Date: 07/01/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,486 words. [19-5142] (Wydra, Elizabeth)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208141016 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                NOTICE [1795219] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Constitutional Accountability Center [Service Date: 07/01/2019 ] [19-5142] (Wydra, Elizabeth)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  PER ABOVE ORDER lodged amended Amicus brief [1794179-2] is filed. [19-5142]
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208140291 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                    PER CURIAM ORDER [1794825] filed granting motion to amend amicus brief [1794178-2]; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged amended brief [1794179-2]. The court will not accept any further amendments to the brief of amicus curiae Cox. Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208139061 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1794179] lodged by Duane Morley Cox [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ] Length of Brief: 5,410 words. [19-5142]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208139058 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        MOTION [1794178] for leave to amend amicus brief filed by Duane Morley Cox (Service Date: 06/17/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 4 pages. [19-5142]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208135196 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          APPELLANT BRIEF [1791954] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] Length of Brief: 12,799 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208135188 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            JOINT APPENDIX [1791951] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 05/22/2019 ] [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              PER ABOVE ORDER lodged Amicus brief [1791159-2] is filed [19-5142]
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208135163 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                PER CURIAM ORDER [1791939] filed granting motion of Duane Morley Cox to participate as amicus curiae [1791158-2]; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged amicus brief [1791159-2] Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208133701 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1791159] filed by Duane Morley Cox [Service Date: 05/24/2019 ] Length of Brief: 24 pages. [19-5142]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208133695 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    MOTION [1791158] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Duane Morley Cox [Service Date: 05/24/2019 ] [19-5142]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 01208130132 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                      PER CURIAM ORDER [1789247] filed considering motion to expedite case [1789081-2], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/10/2019. APPENDIX due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/01/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 07/09/2019, scheduling oral argument on Friday, 07/12/2019. Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142]
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 01208129870 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION [1789081] to expedite case filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump (Service Date: 05/22/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 281 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208129261 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL [1788738] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01136-APM filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc. and Trump Organization, LLC. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5142. [19-5142]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5142]
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 486 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?