Bakala v. Krupa
Federal Civil Lawsuit South Carolina District Court, Case No. 9:18-cv-02590
District Judge David C Norton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 24, 2019 at 4:19 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zdenek Bakala, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Margaret Haas +1 312 705 7400 margarethaas@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew H. Schapiro +1 312 705 7400 andrewschapiro@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A Swedlow +1 312 705 7400 +1 312 705 7401 stephenswedlow@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyche Burgess Freeman & Parham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Wallace K Lightsey +1 864 242 8200 +1 864 242 8324 wlightsey@wyche.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Marshall Winn +1 864 242 8204 +1 864 235 8900 mwinn@wyche.com
v.
No Logo Adam Swart, Defendant
No Logo Crowds on Demand LLC, Defendant
No Logo Pavol Krupa, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to Pavol Krupa. (jbry, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Crowds on Demand LLC on 10/16/2018, filed by Zdenek Bakala. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service by US Mail to Crowds on Demand LLC, # 2 Copy of Envelope to Crowds on Demand LLC)(Winn, Marshall) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Adam Swart on 10/16/2018, filed by Zdenek Bakala. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service by US Mail to Adam Swart, # 2 Copy of Envelope to Adam Swart)(Winn, Marshall) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Crowds on Demand LLC c/o Legalzoom, Inc. Its Registered Agent on 10/12/2018, filed by Zdenek Bakala. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service by Mail of the Amended Complaint on Crowds on Demand)(Winn, Marshall) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Adam Swart on 10/12/2018, filed by Zdenek Bakala. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service by Mail of the Amended Complaint on Adam Swart)(Winn, Marshall) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Crowds on Demand LLC, Pavol Krupa, Adam Swart, filed by Zdenek Bakala. Service due by 1/9/2019 (Winn, Marshall) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Margaret Haas. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/05/2018. (egra, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Andrew Schapiro. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/05/2018. (egra, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Stephen Swedlow. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/05/2018. (egra, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Swedlow ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8038446) by Zdenek Bakala. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Application for Admission PHV of Stephen Swedlow, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing for Stephen Swedlow, # 3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Winn, Marshall) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Schapiro ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8038438) by Zdenek Bakala. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Schapiro, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing for Andrew Schapiro, # 3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Winn, Marshall) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Margaret Haas ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8038434) by Zdenek Bakala. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Margaret Haas, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing for Margaret Haas, # 3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Winn, Marshall) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zdenek Bakala. Crowds on Demand LLC served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service on Crowds on Demand)(Winn, Marshall) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zdenek Bakala. Adam Swart served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service on Adam Swart)(Winn, Marshall) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Amended Summons Issued as to Crowds on Demand LLC. (jbry, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Zdenek Bakala.(jbry, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8014172.), filed by Zdenek Bakala. Service due by 12/20/2018(jbry, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?