Robinson et al v. Marshall et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 2:19-cv-00365-MHT-SMD
District Judge Myron H. Thompson, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 29, 2020 at 11:27 AM DT (11.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alabama Women's Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Alabama, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brock Boone +1 334 420 1743 bboone@aclualabama.org
Space Randall C. Marshall +1 334 265 2754 +1 334 269 5666 rmarshall@aclualabama.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexa Kolbi-Molinas +1 212 549 2633 +1 212 549 2650 akolbi-molinas@aclu.org
No Logo Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Alabama, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brock Boone +1 334 420 1743 bboone@aclualabama.org
Space Randall C. Marshall +1 334 265 2754 +1 334 269 5666 rmarshall@aclualabama.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Planned Parenthood Federation of America Inc- DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carrie Y. Flaxman +1 202 973 4800 carrie.flaxman@ppfa.org
No Logo Reproductive Health Services, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Alabama, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brock Boone +1 334 420 1743 bboone@aclualabama.org
Space Randall C. Marshall +1 334 265 2754 +1 334 269 5666 rmarshall@aclualabama.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexa Kolbi-Molinas +1 212 549 2633 +1 212 549 2650 akolbi-molinas@aclu.org
No Logo West Alabama Women's Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Alabama, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brock Boone +1 334 420 1743 bboone@aclualabama.org
Space Randall C. Marshall +1 334 265 2754 +1 334 269 5666 rmarshall@aclualabama.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexa Kolbi-Molinas +1 212 549 2633 +1 212 549 2650 akolbi-molinas@aclu.org
No Logo Yashica Robinson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Alabama, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brock Boone +1 334 420 1743 bboone@aclualabama.org
Space Randall C. Marshall +1 334 265 2754 +1 334 269 5666 rmarshall@aclualabama.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexa Kolbi-Molinas +1 212 549 2633 +1 212 549 2650 akolbi-molinas@aclu.org
v.
No Logo Ashley Rich, Defendant
No Logo Danny Carr, Defendant
No Logo Daryl D. Bailey, Defendant
No Logo Hays Webb, Defendant
No Logo James H. Walburn, Defendant
No Logo Mark H. LeQuire, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Broussard, Defendant
No Logo Scott Harris, Defendant
No Logo Steven Marshall, Defendant
Office Montgomery
Filed 5/24/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Madison
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Extension of Deadline
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Judgment
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/12/2020, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/12/2020, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Extension of Deadline
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/5/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/5/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/4/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Clarify
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Daryl D. Bailey, Robert L. Broussard, Danny Carr, Scott Harris, Mark H. LeQuire, Steven Marshall, Ashley Rich, James H. Walburn, Hays Webb and mailed CMRRR w/copy of [1] Complaint. (am, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                              Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Alabama Women's Center. (am, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Yashica Robinson. (am, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                  Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by West Alabama Women's Center. (am, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                    Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Reproductive Health Services. (am, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                      Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc. (am, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Daryl D. Bailey, Robert L. Broussard, Danny Carr, Scott Harris, Mark H. LeQuire, Steven Marshall, Ashley Rich, James H. Walburn, & Hays Webb, filed by Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., West Alabama Women's Center, Yashica Robinson, Reproductive Health Services, & Alabama Women's Center. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 4602053655.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet, # (3) Receipt)(am, )
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 38 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?