Richard Hogue v. Silver State Schools Credit Un
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 18-15204

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 25, 2019 at 11:41 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [10803027] (VS) [Entered: 03/19/2018 10:16 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 03/07/2018, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [10769208] (VS) [Entered: 02/20/2018 10:44 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Added attorney Miles Clark for Richard B. Hogue, in case 18-15204. [10763024] (QDL) [Entered: 02/13/2018 04:36 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Miles Newbold Clark for Appellant Richard B. Hogue. Date of service: 02/13/2018. [10763007] [18-15204] (Clark, Miles) [Entered: 02/13/2018 04:32 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Added attorney Matthew I. Knepper for Richard B. Hogue, in case 18-15204. [10762855] (QDL) [Entered: 02/13/2018 03:44 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew I. Knepper for Appellant Richard B. Hogue. Date of service: 02/13/2018. [10762814] [18-15204] (Knepper, Matthew) [Entered: 02/13/2018 03:31 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Filed (ECF) Appellant Richard B. Hogue Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/13/2018. [10762441] [18-15204] (Krieger, David) [Entered: 02/13/2018 01:14 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/15/2018. Appellant Richard B. Hogue opening brief due 04/10/2018. Appellee Silver State Schools Credit Union answering brief due 05/10/2018. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [10756702] (RT) [Entered: 02/08/2018 01:56 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 14 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?