Davis v. McKesson Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01157
District Judge David G Campbell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 30, 2020 at 3:54 PM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hilary Davis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cutter Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Margot P. Cutter +1 916 290 9440 +1 916 588 9330 mcutter@cutterlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd Alan Walburg +1 510 281 5881 +1 510 488 1175 twalburg@cutterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by cwazlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Curt William Clausen +1 602 285 4450 +1 602 285 4483 curt@cwazlaw.com
v.
AmerisourceBergen Corporation AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Thomas Adams +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 rtadams@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devin Kyle Ross +1 816 559 2688 +1 816 421 5547 dkross@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Xavier Fowler +1 602 382 6213 +1 602 382 6070 pfowler@swlaw.com
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Thomas Adams +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 rtadams@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devin Kyle Ross +1 816 559 2688 +1 816 421 5547 dkross@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Xavier Fowler +1 602 382 6213 +1 602 382 6070 pfowler@swlaw.com
Bayer Corporation Bayer Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/29/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/29/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/29/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Rodney Michael Hudson, Esq. +1 415 591 7500 +1 415 591 7510 rodney.hudson@dbr.com
Bayer Healthcare LLC Bayer Healthcare LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/29/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/29/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/29/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Rodney Michael Hudson, Esq. +1 415 591 7500 +1 415 591 7510 rodney.hudson@dbr.com
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/29/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/29/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/29/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Rodney Michael Hudson, Esq. +1 415 591 7500 +1 415 591 7510 rodney.hudson@dbr.com
No Logo Curascript, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "CuraScript Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw, Marsh, Still & Hinshaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/24/2018 Scott R. Kanter +1 408 861 6500 skanter@hinshaw-law.com
TERMINATED: 04/24/2018 Barry Clement Marsh +1 408 861 6500 bmarsh@hinshaw-law.com
No Logo Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Enterprise Holdings Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Thomas Adams +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 rtadams@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devin Kyle Ross +1 816 559 2688 +1 816 421 5547 dkross@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Xavier Fowler +1 602 382 6213 +1 602 382 6070 pfowler@swlaw.com
No Logo Guerbet LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KENDALL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Kendall +1 610 756 0200 +1 610 756 0202 jkendall@tkfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brad Michael Welsh +1 610 756 0200 +1 610 756 0202 bwelsh@tkfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian W. Shaffer +1 215 963 5000 +1 215 963 5001 bshaffer@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina M. Vitale +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 christina.vitale@morganlewis.com
No Logo Liebel-flarsheim Company LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KENDALL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Kendall +1 610 756 0200 +1 610 756 0202 jkendall@tkfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brad Michael Welsh +1 610 756 0200 +1 610 756 0202 bwelsh@tkfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian W. Shaffer +1 215 963 5000 +1 215 963 5001 bshaffer@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina M. Vitale +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 christina.vitale@morganlewis.com
Mallinckrodt, Inc. Mallinckrodt, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Mallinckrodt Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Thomas Adams +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 rtadams@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devin Kyle Ross +1 816 559 2688 +1 816 421 5547 dkross@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Xavier Fowler +1 602 382 6213 +1 602 382 6070 pfowler@swlaw.com
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Thomas Adams +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 rtadams@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devin Kyle Ross +1 816 559 2688 +1 816 421 5547 dkross@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Xavier Fowler +1 602 382 6213 +1 602 382 6070 pfowler@swlaw.com
No Logo Mallinckrodt Manufacturing LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Thomas Adams +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 rtadams@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devin Kyle Ross +1 816 559 2688 +1 816 421 5547 dkross@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Xavier Fowler +1 602 382 6213 +1 602 382 6070 pfowler@swlaw.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Habib Nasrullah +1 303 244 1800 +1 303 244 1879 nasrullah@wtotrial.com
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Habib Nasrullah +1 303 244 1800 +1 303 244 1879 nasrullah@wtotrial.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (160) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None Transcript - Appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Transcript
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Transcript Request
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Clerks Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion for Summary Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Transcript Request
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting 125 Motion to Remove Non-Parties from Case Docket. The Clerk shall remove Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Bayer Corporation and Bayer HealthCare LLC and their counsel from the court docket in this matter. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/29/18. (DXD) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 126 Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney) filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, 125 MOTION Remove Non-Parties from Case Docket filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Rodney M Hudson. (Hudson, Rodney) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION Remove Non-Parties from Case Docket by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudson, Rodney) *Modified event type on 11/29/2018 (DXD). (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 123 Report - Other filed by Hilary Davis. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not re-file. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        * REPORT of GENERAL CAUSATION ESI PROTOCOL by Plaintiff Hilary Davis. (Cutter, C) * Document in violation of Local Rule on 10/16/2018 (LAD). (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ORDER OF THE MULTI DISTRICT LITIGATION PANEL DENYING TRANSFER - ORDERED that the Motion for Centralization of these Actions (listed on Schedule A) is Denied. (MAP) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Daubert motions on general causation shall be filed by April 5, 2019, responses by April 19, 2019, and replies by April 26, 2019. The Court will hold oral argument on the motions on May 1, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/5/18. (MSA) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge David G Campbell: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 10/5/2018. Status of MDL application discussed. Court will enter a revised case management order. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Brooks Cutter and Curt Clausen for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Andrew Goldman and Jennifer Greenblatt for Defendant Bayer. Telephonic appearance by Paul Penticuff and Donn Alexander for Defendant Bracco Diagnostics. Telephonic appearance by Devin Ross for Defendant Mallinckrodt. Telephonic appearance by Brian Shaffer and Jamie Kendall for Defendant Guerbet and Liebel-Flarsheim. Telephonic appearance by Habib Nasrullah for Defendant McKesson (Court Reporter Christine Coaly.) Hearing held 2:00 PM to 2:18 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 10/5/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge David G Campbell. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate a telephone conference to include counsel for all parties in this case and in CV18-1159, and the Court. If a dial-in number is to be used, counsel for Plaintiff shall provide the dial-in information to counsel for all parties and the Court no later than 12:00 noon on 10/4/2018. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/24/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. (Nasrullah, Habib) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for C Brooks Cutter and Margot Cutter on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ***AMENDED BY DOC. 121 *** CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 11/2/2018. Motions due by 2/1/2019. Daubert Hearing set for 3/15/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/17/2018. (DGC, nvo) Modified on 10/5/2018 (MSA). (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
                                                                          MEMORANDUM Joint Submission of Case Management Orders from Other Courts by Plaintiff Hilary Davis. (Walburg, Todd) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Remark: as to out of state counsel Emma Elizabeh Garrison, Kevin Michael Benedicto, Brian Patrick Ziska, and John Robert Meehan removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 109 Stipulation: PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/9/2018. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER. By 3:00 pm Arizona time on July 11, 2018, the parties jointly shall file with the Court, in a single document and without further argument, copies of the case management orders entered in Lewandowski v. GE Healthcare, 18-00462 (WDPA) and any other of the 28 cases similar to this one. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7-7-18. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 07/07/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM Joint Memorandum Outlining The Parties' Proposals for Discovery by Defendants Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                    STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Requesting the Entry of A Protective Order by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Parties Proposed Language and Rationale re Disputed Provisions in [Proposed] Order)(Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/4/2018, Entered: None transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of SCHEDULING CONFERENCE proceedings held on 06/20/2018, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/2/2018. (RAP) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Hilary Davis for proceedings held on 06/20/2018, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Walburg, Todd) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          *NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 105 106 and Notices of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Guerbet LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA) *Modified on 6/25/2018 to add additional documents for same deficiency (MSA). (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
                                                                                            NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to General Order 17-08(b) filed by Defendants McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. (Nasrullah, Habib) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Discovery
                                                                                              NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. (Nasrullah, Habib) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
                                                                                                NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Hilary Davis. (Williamson, Linda) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Manufacturing LLC. (Fowler, Patrick) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Guerbet LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Conference held on 6/20/2018. Joint memorandum due 7/6/2018. (See entry for details) (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:05 PM to 4:16 PM.(TCA) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP
                                                                                                          Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Defendants Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Case Management Order)(Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Habib Nasrullah on behalf of McKesson Corporation and McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC. (Fowler, Patrick) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                * ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC.(Fowler, Patrick) *Modified to add document link on 5/24/2018 (REK). (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                  *Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated and Other Affiliate AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Fowler, Patrick) *Modified to add additional corporate entity on 5/24/2018 (REK). (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                    * ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation.(Fowler, Patrick) *Modified to correct document link on 5/24/2018 (REK). (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                      Defendants' ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint ;Affirmative Defenses by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC.(Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Robert Thomas Adams on behalf of defendants Mallinckrodt Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Brian W Shaffer on behalf of defendants Guerbet LLC and Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Devin Kyle Ross on behalf of Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 90 Stipulation of Dismissal. Defendants Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Mallinckrodt Manufacturing, LLC are dismissed without prejudice and without costs and/or fees pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/15/18. (MAW) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Brad Welsh and Jamie Kendall on behalf of defendants Guerbet LLC and Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER pursuant to 89 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: AmerisourceBergen Corporation answer due 5/23/2018; AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation answer due 5/23/2018; Enterprise Holdings Incorporated answer due 5/23/2018; Mallinckrodt Incorporated answer due 5/23/2018; Mallinckrodt LLC answer due 5/23/2018; Mallinckrodt Manufacturing LLC answer due 5/23/2018. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/15/2018. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting the parties' stipulation for dismissal of the third, fourth, and fifth cause of action without prejudice (Doc. 88 ). Plaintiff's third, fourth, and fifth cause of action are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/14/18. (EJA) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendants Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Mallinckrodt Manufacturing, LLC by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Enterprise Holdings Incorporated, Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fowler, Patrick) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: 4 Amended Complaint Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Enterprise Holdings Incorporated, Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fowler, Patrick) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Third, Fourth and Fifth Cause of Action Without Prejudice by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guerbet LLC identifying Corporate Parent Guerbet SA for Guerbet LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2018 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/1/2018. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Todd A Walburg on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 5/23/2018 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. The parties should be aware that the filing of a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) will not postpone the time for compliance with the MIDP. General Order 17-08 provides that compliance may be deferred only for motions to dismiss based on lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, lack of personal jurisdiction, sovereign immunity, or absolute or qualified immunity of a public official. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/27/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT Joint by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The consent motion for voluntary dismissal of Curascript, Inc., only 75 is granted. Curascript, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/23/2018. (REK) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Marie Vitale on behalf of Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            *NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MAP) *Modified on 4/16/2018 to Reflect Duplicate of Doc. 79 (MAP)*. (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MAP) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER Re Transfer of 3:17-cv-4377-JD from the Northern District of California to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-18-1157-PHX-DGC. (MAP) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-04377 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic transfer of case to the District of Arizona. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge James Donato re 73 Stipulation. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Dismiss For Voluntary Dismissal of Curascript, Inc., Only, filed by Curascript, Inc.. Responses due by 4/18/2018. Replies due by 4/25/2018. (Kanter, Scott) (Filed on 4/4/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hilary Davis (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 3/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to TRANSFER filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Curascript, Inc., Guerbet, LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Benedicto, Kevin) (Filed on 3/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/1/18, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (33 in 3:17-cv-07026-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/1/2018. Total Time in Court: 13 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 65 Administrative Motion to Relate Cases. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Curascript, Inc., Guerbet, LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Benedicto, Kevin) (Filed on 2/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. re 65 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should be Related (Civ. L.R. 3-12, 7-11) Amended Proof of Service (Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 2/15/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wellington Management Group LLP for McKesson Corporation. Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement (Garrison, Emma) (Filed on 2/13/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should be Related (Civ. L.R. 3-12, 7-11) filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC. Responses due by 2/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 2/9/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/5/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/30/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/16/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Devin K. Ross. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Rob T. Adams. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12001766.) filed by Mallinckrodt, Inc.. (Ross, Devin) (Filed on 1/5/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12001727.) filed by Mallinckrodt, Inc.. (Adams, Robert) (Filed on 1/5/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Patrick Ziska (Ziska, Brian) (Filed on 1/5/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Case referred to Judge James Donato for related case determination re Case 17-07026 CW, Geisse v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/3/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. As the Court advised the parties on December 18, 2017, Dkt. No. 53 in Case No. 17-4377, all deadlines and hearings have been vacated pending the case management conference set for March 1, 2018. Please do not contact our courtroom deputy, Ms. Clark, about filings or hearing dates. Please also do not file any substantive motions pending further order of the Court. Motions terminated: (14 in 3:17-cv-06273-JD) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, (13 in 3:17-cv-06375-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (1) Complaint, Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Stipulated Request for [Proposed] Order Changing Time filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., (15 in 3:17-cv-06369-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (1) Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Stipulated Request for [Proposed] Order Changing Time filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., (13 in 3:17-cv-06374-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (1) Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Stipulated Request for [Proposed] Order Changing Time filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., (13 in 3:17-cv-06309-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (1) Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Stipulated Request for [Proposed] Order Changing Time filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/2/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/21/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. The Court vacates all pending deadlines and hearings for all the related cases. The Court sets a case management conference for 3/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. In addition to the usual case management topics, the parties should be prepared to discuss whether and to what extent the related cases should be consolidated for pre-trial and trial purposes. Case management statement due by 2/22/2018. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/18/17. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Todd A. Walburg . (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 12/15/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 19 Administrative Motion to Relate Cases. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Hilary Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 12/8/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Judge James Donato granting 45 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brad Welsh. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jamie Kendall. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian W. Shaffer. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket No. 38, Docket No. 39, Docket No. 41, and Docket No. 44 filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/4/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, Inc. (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice re 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byMallinckrodt, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 42 ) (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Mallinckrodt, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/15/2017. Replies due by 12/22/2017. (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Amerisourcebergen Corporation and Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Disclosure Statement Filed Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.7.1(A) by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Amerisourcebergen Corporation and Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/15/2017. Replies due by 12/22/2017. (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice re 37 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byMallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 37 ) (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement re 37 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Disclosure Statement Filed Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.7.1(A) by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/15/2017. Replies due by 12/22/2017. (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brian Shaffer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11918481.) filed by Guerbet, LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Shaffer, Brian) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jamie Kendall ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11918444.) filed by Guerbet, LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Kendall, Jamie) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brad Welsh ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11918382.) filed by Guerbet, LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Welsh, Brad) (Filed on 12/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2018.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/27/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue filed by Guerbet, LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/11/2017. Replies due by 12/18/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Jean-Francois Blanc in Support of Def Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Massimo Carrara In Support of Motion to Dsimiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Impropert Venue Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue)(Benedicto, Kevin) (Filed on 11/27/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third, fourth and Fifth Causes ofAction and Alternatively, Strike Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Allegations and Prayer for Punitive Damages and Dismiss Plaintiff's Demand for Injunctive Relief filed by Guerbet, LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/11/2017. Replies due by 12/18/2017. (Benedicto, Kevin) (Filed on 11/27/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC (Benedicto, Kevin) (Filed on 11/27/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by Guerbet, LLC (Benedicto, Kevin) (Filed on 11/27/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/16/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/15/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Hon. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 11/15/17. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKETED IN ERROR; PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NUMBER 26 FOR CORRECTION. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Susan Illston is no longer assigned to this case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 11/15/17. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017) Modified on 11/15/2017 (srnS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKETED IN ERROR; PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NUMBER 25 FOR CORRECTION. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 11/15/17. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017) Modified on 11/15/2017 (srnS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Curascript, Inc. (Kanter, Scott) (Filed on 11/14/2017) Modified on 11/15/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint byCurascript, Inc.. (Kanter, Scott) (Filed on 11/14/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CMC set before Judge Illston has been vacated due to the recusal. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF RECUSAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/13/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 19 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to consider whether cases should be related by Hilary Davis. (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 11/8/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to consider whether cases should be related filed by Hilary Davis. Responses due by 11/13/2017. (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 11/8/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. Defendants McKesson Corporation's and McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement (Garrison, Emma) (Filed on 11/7/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages byMcKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Garrison, Emma) (Filed on 11/7/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting stipulation to respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/7/17. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Curascript, Inc.. (Kanter, Scott) (Filed on 11/6/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, Motions terminated: 12 Ex Parte Application filed by Hilary Davis. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/3/17 has been continued to 12/8/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/31/17. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 12 Ex Parte Application by Hilary Davis. (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 10/30/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte Application filed by Hilary Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 10/27/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilary Davis (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 10/4/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 10/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 8/28/17. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hilary Davis.. (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 8/24/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 9/5/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 9/5/2017. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Curascript, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Guerbet, LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Manufacturing LLC, Mallinckrodt, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filed by Hilary Davis. (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 8/4/2017) Modified on 8/9/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT for Damages; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-11597249.). Filed by Hilary Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (Amerisourcebergen Corporation, # 3 Summons Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, # 4 Summons Curascript, Inc. # 5 Summons Enterprise, # 6 Summons Guerbet, LLC, # 7 Summons Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, # 8 Summons Mallinckdrodt Manufacturing LLC, # 9 Summons Mallinckrodt LLC, # 10 Summons Mallinckrodt Inc., # 11 Summons McKesson Corporation, # 12 Summons McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.)(Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 8/2/2017) Modified on 8/2/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/16/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?