Harcourt v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG19019709

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:28 PM DT (1.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo H., B., Plaintiff
No Logo H., B. A., Plaintiff
No Logo Harcourt, Mallory, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Adams, Lindsey R., Attorney
No Logo Gokal, Alison S., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Product Liability
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None ?
Acknowledgement of Receipt of Transferred Case. New Case # (3 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None ?
    Notice of Case Transferred Out of County Filed (3 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 20 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None ?
      Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Hearing Dropped from dept: 25 date: 10/18/2019 time: 09:0
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None ?
        Order to Transfer/Reclassify Case Jurisdiction Filed (3 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None ?
          Amended Order re: Appointment of Guardian ad Litem Filed (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None ?
            Stipulation and Order Re: Transfer Out of County Filed for Tesla, Inc. (2 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Statement of Mallory Harcourt Filed (7 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 15 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Reservation Set for dept: 25 date: 10/18/2019 time: 09:00
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                  First Amended Complaint Filed (21 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None ?
                    Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                      Initial Case Management Conference 10/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 25 (2 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                        Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                          Amended Order Re: Gaurdian Ad Litem Filed (1 Page)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                            Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted (2 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                              Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                Summons Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                  Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mallory Harcourt, B. H., B. A. H. (1 Page)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                    Rejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed (2 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      Rejection Letter Issued on Civil Case Cover Sheet (2 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for B. A. H. (2 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for B. H. (2 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            Complaint - Product Liability Filed (21 Pages)

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 2,492 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?