Citation Insurance Company As Assignee of Stephanie and David Burek v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit New Bedford District Court, Case No. 1933CV000128

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Citation Insurance Company, Plaintiff
v.
Amphenol Corporation Amphenol Corporation, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
Event Scheduled Event: Case Management Conference Date: 09/26/2019 Time: 10:00 AM
    Blank 19 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
    Appearance filed On this date Jacquelyn Shore Kaplan, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Amphenol Corporation
      Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019
      Answer filed by Amphenol Corporation. to Tesla Inc.'s crossclaim
        Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019
        NOTICE OF CMC (AS TO ALL PARTIES) SENT TO ALL PARTIES. #9
          Blank 16 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019
          Cross-claim filed by Amphenol Corporation against Tesla, Inc. (Mass.R.Civ.P. 13(g) or 14). #8
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019
            Answer filed by Tesla, Inc.. #8
              Blank 14 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019
              Appearance filed On this date Michele Carlucci Sears, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Tesla, Inc.
                Blank 13 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019
                Event Scheduled Event: Case Management Conference Date: 09/26/2019 Time: 10:00 AM-- copies to parties
                  Blank 12 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019
                  Event Resulted: Case Management Conference scheduled on: 07/11/2019 10:00 AM Has been: Event Continued Hon. Douglas J Darnbrough, Presiding
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019
                    Motion to extend ti me to file responsive pleadings and to continue the case management conference filed by Citation Insurance Company As Assignee of Stephanie and David Burek, Tesla, Inc. and assented to by other party(ies).
                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019
                      Return of service on complaint and summons to Tesla, Inc.: Officer service SERVED in hand (Mass.R.Civ.P. 4(f)). 6/10/19 by Deputy Sheriff Joseph Casey
                        Blank 9 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019
                        Event Scheduled Event: Case Management Conference Date: 07/11/2019 Time: 10:00 AM
                          Blank 8 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019
                          Appearance filed On this date Meghan Leigh Riordan, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Amphenol Corporation
                            Blank 7 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019
                            Jury trial claim on all issues filed by Amphenol Corporation (G.L. c.231 ยง103; Mass.R.Civ.P. 38(b)).
                              Blank 6 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019
                              Cross-claim filed by Amphenol Corporation against Tesla, Inc. (Mass.R.Civ.P. 13(g) or 14).
                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019
                                Answer filed by Amphenol Corporation.
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019
                                  Return of service on complaint and summons to Amphenol Corporation: Certified mail returned DELIVERED: signed receipt (Mass.R.Civ.P. 4(f)).
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019
                                    Statement of damages filed by (Dist./Mun.Cts.Supp.R.Civ.P. 102A).
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019
                                      Complaint filed
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019
                                        Appearance filed On this date Diana Delaney O'Hara, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Citation Insurance Company

                                          Space Space

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 629 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?