District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

Donald J. Trump v. Deutsche Bank AG
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 19-1540

Tags
Last Updated September 11, 2019 at 11:02 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Cable News Network, Inc. Cable News Network, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacquelyn Nicole Schell +1 404 572 6927 jacquelyn.schell@bryancave.com
No Logo Politico LLC, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacquelyn Nicole Schell +1 404 572 6927 jacquelyn.schell@bryancave.com
The Associated Press The Associated Press, Movant
Officially listed as "The Associated Press ("ap")"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacquelyn Nicole Schell +1 404 572 6927 jacquelyn.schell@bryancave.com
The New York Times Company The New York Times Company, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacquelyn Nicole Schell +1 404 572 6927 jacquelyn.schell@bryancave.com
No Logo Wp Co. Llc, D/b/a The Washington Post, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacquelyn Nicole Schell +1 404 572 6927 jacquelyn.schell@bryancave.com
Capital One Financial Corporation Capital One Financial Corporation, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven David Feldman +1 212 880 3988
Space Murphy, James A +1 804 783 2003
No Logo Committee On Financial Services Of The United States House Of Representatives, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan Barbero +1 202 225 9700 megan.barbero@mail.house.gov
Space Douglas Neal Letter +1 202 225 9700
Space Josephine Morse +1 202 225 9700
Space Todd Barry Tatelman +1 202 225 9700 +1 202 226 1360 todd.tatelman@mail.house.gov
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant - Appellee
Officer/Director, Tower Automotive, Inc.
Officer/Director, Nrp, Inc.
Officer/Director, PAC West Telecomm, Inc.
Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. Officer/Director, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Officer/Director, Briazz, Inc.
Officer/Director, Dsl.net, Inc.
Officer/Director, Blockbuster, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hutchinson Technology Inc.
Officer/Director, Korea Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Brazilian Equity Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Future Germany Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Brazil Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Kemper High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Solv Ex Corp
Officer/Director, Desert Native Designs Inc
Officer/Director, Newmark Homes Corp
Officer/Director, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Officer/Director, Doblique Inc
Officer/Director, Mesa Airlines Inc
Officer/Director, Emerson Radio Corp
Officer/Director, Terrapin 3 Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Red Rock Resorts, Inc.
Officer/Director, Emachines Inc /de/
Officer/Director, First Philippine Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Rreef America L.l.c.
Officer/Director, Id Arizona Corp.
Officer/Director, DB Municipal Holdings LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C. Moyer +1 202 887 4528
Space Parvin Daphne Moyne +1 212 872 1076
Space Raphael Adam Prober +1 202 887 4319
Space Steven R. Ross +1 202 887 4343
No Logo United States House of Representatives, Permanent Select Committee On Intelligence, Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "Permanent Select Committee On Intelligence Of The United States House Of Representatives"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan Barbero +1 202 225 9700 megan.barbero@mail.house.gov
Space Douglas Neal Letter +1 202 225 9700
No Logo Constitutional Accountability Center, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brianne Gorod +1 202 296 6889
United States of America United States of America, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis Fan +1 202 514 2494
No Logo DJT Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 227 0548 +1 617 951 8736
No Logo Djt Holdings Managing Member Llc, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 227 0548 +1 617 951 8736
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Plaintiff - Appellant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 227 0548 +1 617 951 8736
No Logo Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 227 0548 +1 617 951 8736

Toggle Switch Represented by mfsllp.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Plaintiff - Appellant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump, Jr."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 227 0548 +1 617 951 8736
No Logo Trump, Eric, Plaintiff - Appellant
Officially listed as "Eric Trump"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 227 0548 +1 617 951 8736
No Logo Ivanka Trump, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 227 0548 +1 617 951 8736
No Logo Trump Acquisition Llc, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 227 0548 +1 617 951 8736
No Logo Trump Acquisition, Corp., Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 227 0548 +1 617 951 8736
Trump Organization, LLC Trump Organization, LLC, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 227 0548 +1 617 951 8736
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 227 0548 +1 617 951 8736
Nature of Suit 2890 - Other Statutory Actions
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=19-cv-3826
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=19-cv-3826
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None ?
CURED DEFECTIVE Motion for Leave to Intervene, [172], on behalf of Movant Cable News Network, Inc., POLITICO LLC, The Associated Press ("AP"), The New York Times Company and WP Co. LLC, FILED.[2653136] [19-1540]
    LREF
    Legal Document 00207096398 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None ?
    MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE, on behalf of Movants Cable News Network, Inc., POLITICO LLC, The Associated Press ("AP"), The New York Times Company and WP Co. LLC, FILED. Service date09/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2653049] [19-1540]--[Edited 09/11/2019 by EM]
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207096181 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None ?
    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion to intervene, unseal judicial records, [168], on behalf of Movant Cable News Network, Inc., POLITICO LLC, The Associated Press ("AP"), The New York Times Company and WP Co. LLC, FILED.[2652951] [19-1540]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None ?
      NEW PARTY, Movants The Associated Press ("AP"), Cable News Network, Inc., The New York Times Company, POLITICO LLC and WP Co. LLC, ADDED.[2652926] [19-1540]
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None ?
        MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE, on behalf of Movants The Associated Press ("AP"), Cable News Network, Inc., The New York Times Company, POLITICO LLC and WP Co. LLC , FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2652598] [19-1540]
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207073155 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None ?
          LETTER, on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, response to the Committees August 27, 2019 letter, RECEIVED. Service date 08/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2644218] [19-1540]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 00207069391 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None ?
            SEALED LETTER, dated 08/27/2019, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, RECEIVED. Service date 08/27/2019 by hand delivery.[2642764] [19-1540]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207067394 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None ?
              LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Capital One Financial Corporation, in response to the questions raised by the Court at oral argument and its order dated August 26, it does not posses any tax returns responsive to the Capital One Subpeona, RECEIVED. Service date 08/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2641975] [19-1540]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207067378 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                REDACTED LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, in response to the Court's order directing the Bank to inform the Court "whether it has in its possession any tax returns of any of the individuals or entities named or referred to (directly or indirectly) in paragraph 1 of the subpoenas" served on the Bank on April 15, 2019 by the House Committee on Financial Services and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence (the"Subpoenas"). ECF No. 156 (Aug. 26, 2019). RECEIVED. Service date 08/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2641969] [19-1540]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 00207067339 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                  LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, states a non-redacted letter filed under seal has been submitted to the Court, RECEIVED. Service date 08/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2641956] [19-1540]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207066869 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                    LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, responds to questions raised by the Court during the August 23, 2019 oral argument, RECEIVED. Service date 08/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2641782] [19-1540]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207066428 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                      ORDER, dated 08/27/2019, An order issued 08/26/2019 directs that Defendants-Appellees Deutsche Bank AG and Capital One Financial Corporation each file a letter with the Court by 4 p.m. Tuesday, 08/27/2019. It is further ordered that if Defendants-Appellees file an unredacted letter under seal with the Court, the redacted version of the letter served on the Intervenor-Committees also be served on Plaintiffs-Appellants and filed on the public docket, by JON, PWH, DAL, FILED.[2641621] [19-1540]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207064286 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                          CASE, before JON, PWH, DAL, HEARD.[2640051] [19-1540]
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                            CASE, before JON, PWH, DAL, HEARD.[2640051] [19-1540]
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207058495 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 08/21/2019 by CM/ECF.[2638601] [19-1540]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207058290 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 08/21/2019 by CM/ECF.[2638525] [19-1540]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207052387 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                  MOTION ORDER, granting motion for leave to respond [138] filed by Appellant Ivanka Trump, Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization LLC, DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp. and Donald J. Trump, Jr., FILED. [2636414][145] [19-1540]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207050724 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                    AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae United States of America, FILED. Service date 08/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2635768] [19-1540]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae United States of America, ADDED.[2635765] [19-1540]
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207050274 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of United States of America, FILED. Service date 08/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2635591] [19-1540]--[Edited 08/19/2019 by TW]--[Edited 08/19/2019 by TW]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207049849 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          MOTION, for leave to respond, on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 08/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2635414] [19-1540]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207046087 Filed: 8/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            MOTION ORDER, granting motion for leave to respond [134] filed by Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. [2633924][137] [19-1540]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207041618 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              MOTION, for leave to respond, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 08/14/2019 by CM/ECF. [2632240] [19-1540]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Moyer for Deutsche Bank AG, in case 19-1540 , [130], ADDED.[2631254] [19-1540]
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  ATTORNEY, Parvin Daphne Moyne for Deutsche Bank AG, in case 19-1540 , [128], ADDED.[2631249] [19-1540]
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    ATTORNEY, Steven R. Ross for Deutsche Bank AG, in case 19-1540 , [127], ADDED.[2631244] [19-1540]
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207038574 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2631110] [19-1540]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        ATTORNEY, Raphael A. Prober, [127], in place of attorney Parvin D. Moyne, SUBSTITUTED.[2631105] [19-1540]
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207038557 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2631103] [19-1540]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207038539 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2631096] [19-1540]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207038525 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2631091] [19-1540]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207032213 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Douglas Neal Letter for Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 08/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2628695] [19-1540]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207031621 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                  ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Patrick Strawbridge, Esq. for Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 08/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2628450] [19-1540]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207015681 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                    FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 08/01/2019, on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, RECEIVED. Service date 08/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2622414] [19-1540]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 00207007290 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                      SEALED, Subpoenas, filed on behalf of Appellee in response to letter dated 07/26/2019, FILED.[2619242] [19-1540]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207005355 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                        FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 07/26/2019, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, RECEIVED. Service date 07/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2618467] [19-1540]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207004307 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                          LETTER, requesting counsel for Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives promptly file with the Court, under seal if appropriate, unredacted copies of the subpoena, in paper and digital format, that each Committee served on Deutsche Bank AG, SENT.[2618090] [19-1540]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206996966 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                            MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [51] filed by Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. [2615343][104] [19-1540]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206996841 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                              MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [50] filed by Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. [2615293][103] [19-1540]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206996793 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [52] filed by Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. [2615277][102] [19-1540]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG , WAIVED. [2612514] [19-1540]
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 00206989052 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2612268] [19-1540]
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      CURED DEFECTIVE : BRIEF, [85], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Constitutional Accountability Center, FILED.[2611610] [19-1540]
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206986607 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2611330] [19-1540]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206986304 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          AMICUS BRIEF, Amicus Curiae Constitutional Accountability Center, FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2611220] [19-1540]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206986269 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, AMICUS BRIEF , [76], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Constitutional Accountability Center, FILED.[2611199] [19-1540]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Constitutional Accountability Center, ADDED.[2611198] [19-1540]
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 00206986252 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2611195] [19-1540]
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206985572 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  LETTER, requesting counsel for Appellee Deutsche Bank AG and Capital One Financial Corporation attend oral argument to be available to respond to questions the panel may have, SENT.[2610937] [19-1540]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206985527 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    LETTER, to the Solicitor General of the United States asking whether the United States would like to submit its views on the issues raised on appeal, SENT.[2610920] [19-1540]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206985402 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Amicus Constitutional Accountability Center, FILED. Service date 07/17/2019 by CM/ECF. [2610873] [19-1540]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206985422 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2610872] [19-1540]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Constitutional Accountability Center, FILED. Service date 07/17/2019 by CM/ECF. [2610643] [19-1540]
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206974415 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Capital One Financial Corporation , WAIVED. [2606730] [19-1540]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              CURED DEFECTIVE : LETTER,[71], on behalf of Appellee Capital One Financial Corporation, FILED.[2606714] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206974273 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Capital One Financial Corporation, takes no position with respect to the instant appeal , will not file an appellate brief, does not request any time to addres the Court at oral argument, RECEIVED. Service date 07/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2606672] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206973899 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [64], on behalf of Appellee Capital One Financial Corporation, FILED.[2606527] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206973850 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, states they take no position with respect to Plaintiffs'- Appellants' brief, nor on the legal issues raised by Plaintiffs-Appellants and Intervenor Defendants-Appellees in connection therewith, RECEIVED. Service date 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2606511] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206973847 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2606510] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Capital One Financial Corporation, FILED. Service date 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2606333] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY, Josephine Morse for Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives, in case 19-1540 , [61], ADDED.[2605408] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY, Todd Barry Tatelman for Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives, in case 19-1540 , [60], ADDED.[2605403] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206970690 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2605345] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206970682 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2605343] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206968743 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 07/10/2019 by CM/ECF. [2604613] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206964434 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                    LETTER, dated 07/07/2019, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives, request that the Court waive the attorney admission requirements and enter notices of appearances for Todd B. Tatelman, Josephine Morse, additionally request that the Court waive any readmission requirements for Douglas N. Letter, RECEIVED. Service date 07/09/2019 by email.[2603034] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206963334 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 07/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2602618] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206962202 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                        ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2602202] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206958157 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                          MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by email.[2600754] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206956684 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                            MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by email.[2600206] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206956658 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                              MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by email.[2600196] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 08/23/2019, SET.[2599034] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  CURED DEFECTIVE : APPENDIX, BRIEF [37] [2597208], on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC and Trump Organization, Inc., FILED.[2599029] [19-1540]--[Edited 07/02/2019 by TW]--[Edited 07/02/2019 by TW]
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206951623 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                    JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-160), on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 06/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2598263] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206951146 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-160), [34], on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC and Trump Organization, Inc., FILED.[2598070] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206948914 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 06/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2597208] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-160), on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 06/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2597202] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY, Patrick Strawbridge for Trump Organization LLC DJT Holdings LLC Trump Acquisition LLC Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC Trump Acquisition, Corp. Trump Organization, Inc., in case 19-1540 , [17], ADDED.[2597193] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206947911 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                              NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[2596843] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206947431 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, brief, joint appendix, [28], [27], on behalf of Appellant Donald Trump, Jr., Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED.[2596671] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 06/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2589811] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-160), on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr., Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 06/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2589810] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206928890 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC and Trump Organization, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2589576] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY, Cameron Thomas Norris for Ivanka Trump Donald J. Trump Eric Trump, in case 19-1540 , [24], ADDED.[2589424] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206927962 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 06/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2589206] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY, Megan Barbero for Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, in case 19-1540 , [22], ADDED.[2589139] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206927392 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives and Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 06/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2588995] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206927338 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives and Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 06/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2588975] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206926380 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, to Appellee Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the United States House of Representatives and Committee on Financial Services of the United States House of Representatives, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2588590] [19-1540]--[Edited 06/18/2019 by DGB]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY, Marc Lee Mukasey for Ivanka Trump Donald J. Trump Eric Trump, in case 19-1540 , [18], ADDED.[2588587] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206925630 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Acquisition LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC and DJT Holdings LLC, FILED. Service date 06/17/2019 by CM/ECF. [2588309] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206925151 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, Eric Trump and Ivanka Trump, FILED. Service date 06/17/2019 by CM/ECF.[2588113] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206917593 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Capital One Financial Corporation, FILED. Service date 06/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2585178] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 08/19/2019, PROPOSED.[2583054] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206909540 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 06/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2582103] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY, Steven David Feldman for Capital One Financial Corporation, in case 19-1540 , [11], ADDED.[2581070] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206906616 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Capital One Financial Corporation, FILED. Service date 06/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2580978] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206894029 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206884306 Filed: 5/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION, to expedite appeal, on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC and Trump Organization, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/25/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2572636] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC and Trump Organization, Inc., district court receipt # ANYSDC-16950902, FILED.[2572581] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206884123 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2572574] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206884117 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2572571] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00206884054 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                              INTERLOCUTORY NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant DJT Holdings LLC, DJT Holdings Managing Member LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump Acquisition LLC, Trump Acquisition, Corp., Trump Organization LLC and Trump Organization, Inc., FILED. [2572546] [19-1540]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 313 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?