COUNTY OF CAMDEN v. FARRIS
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-03297-SMO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo COUNTY OF CAMDEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McElroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WALTER F. TIMPONE +1 973 993 8100 wtimpone@mdmc-law.com
v.
No Logo RAHN J. FARRIS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANTHONY VALENTI +1 856 824 1001 +1 856 824 1008 avalenti@curetoncaplan.com
No Logo COUNTY OF CAMDEN, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McElroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WALTER F. TIMPONE +1 973 993 8100 wtimpone@mdmc-law.com
No Logo Gallagher & Associates, Inc., Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "GALLAGHER ASSOCIATES, INC."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cahill, Wilinski, Rhodes & Joyce, Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Marshall Joyce +1 856 428 2100 dmj@cahill-law.com
No Logo GEORGE E. NORCROSS, III, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown & Connery LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI +1 856 854 8900 +1 856 858 4967 wtambuss@brownconnery.com
No Logo Jack Gallagher, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CAHILL, WILINSKI, RHODES & JOYCE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Marshall Joyce +1 856 428 2100 dmj@cahill-law.com
No Logo JOHN ADLER, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by EARP COHN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD F. BORDEN, JR. +1 856 354 7700 eborden@earpcohn.com
No Logo JOSEPH BENTON, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kissel Pesce Hirsch & Wilmer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT AARON GREENBERG +1 856 429 1700 rgreenberg@akplaw.net
No Logo JUDY PALUMBI, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MOUNTAIN VIEW OFFICE PARK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN STUART FURLONG +1 609 882 0288 +1 609 883 2551 jackfurlongesq@aol.com
No Logo LOUIS BESSIGE, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANTHONY J ZARRILLO, JR. +1 856 751 0300
No Logo PHYLLIS PEARL, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KEARNEY & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN B. KEARNEY +1 856 547 7733
No Logo THE CAMDEN COUNTY DEMOCRATIC ORGANIZATION, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown & Connery LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI +1 856 854 8900 +1 856 858 4967 wtambuss@brownconnery.com
No Logo THOMAS MITCHELL, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo RAHN J. FARRIS, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cureton Clark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DARRYL S. CAPLAN +1 856 824 1001 dcaplan@curetoncaplan.com
Office Camden
Filed 6/26/1997
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Camden
Terminated 6/30/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, LEAD, SCHEDO
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, setting scheduling order deadlines: Status conference 3:30 8/31/98, etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 6/30/1998 Terminated Case
    Case closed (ar1)
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 6/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting defendants [7-1] motion to dismiss or, in the alternative to require plaintiff to plead with more specificity under lead case No. 97cv3297(SMO) and reopening member case No. 97cv5069(SMO). ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 6/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
        OPINION ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
          LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #636; Minutes of: 6/26/98; The following actions were taken, Status conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 5/4/98 ; Settlement conference 2:00 6/26/98 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/29/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Status Conference
              Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 4/28/98. (ar1)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 4/14/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time , and setting answer due for defendant Louis Bezich on 5/4/98. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1) Modified on 04/16/1998
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/16/1998 Answer
                  ANSWER to Complaint by LOUIS BESSIGE; jury demand (ar1) Modified on 04/16/1998
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998 Miscellaneous Document
                    Rico Case Statement Filed by RAHN J. FARRIS (ar1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Answer
                      ANSWER to Complaint by PHYLLIS PEARL; jury demand (ar1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint by JOSEPH BENTON; jury demand (ar1)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 2/6/1998, Entered: 2/9/1998 Answer
                          ANSWER to Complaint by THE CAMDEN COUNTY, GEORGE E. NORCROSS III; jury demand (ar1)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998 Clerks Entry of Default*
                            DEFAULT ENTERED as to consolidated defendant THE CAMDEN COUNTY DEMOCRATIC ORGANIZATION for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ar1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998 request for default
                              REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AND AFFIDAVIT by Darryl S. Caplan, Esquire for consolidated plaintiff RAHN J. FARRIS AGAINST consolidated defendant THE CAMDEN COUNTY DEMOCRATIC ORGANIZATION for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ar1) Modified on 02/04/1998
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998 request for default
                                REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AND AFFIDAVIT BY Darryl S. Caplan, Esquire for consolidated plaintiff RAHN J. FARRIS AGAINST consolidated defendant GEORGE E. NORCROSS III for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ar1) Modified on 02/04/1998
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998 Certificate Of Service.
                                  AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RAHN J. FARRIS; re: plaintiff's request to enter default and affidavit against defendants The Camden County Democratic Organization and George E. Norcross, III sent to counsel. (ar1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/27/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                    RICO CASE ORDER FILED. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference 2:00 4/28/98. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER, consolidating cases 97cv3297(SMO) and 97cv5069(SMO) for all purposes under 97cv3297(SMO). ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                                          Consolidated Lead Case (ar1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 11/14/1997, Entered: 11/14/1997 Letter
                                            LETTER By Anthony Valenti, Esquire for defendant RAHN J. FARRIS; re: Requesting oral argument on motion filed on October 30, 1997. (ar1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997 Certificate Of Service.
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RAHN J. FARRIS; Re: Reply Brief in support of motion. (ar1)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997 Certification
                                                CERTIFICATION of Robert G. Millenky, Esquire on behalf of COUNTY OF CAMDEN; Re: in opposition to [7-1] motion to dismiss or, in the alternative to require plaintiff to plead with more specificity. (COPY) (ar1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997 Certification
                                                  CERTIFICATION of Anthony Valenti, Esquire on behalf of RAHN J. FARRIS Re: [7-1] motion to dismiss or, in the alternative to require plaintiff to plead with more specificity. (ar1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997, Terminated: 6/29/1998 Motion to Dismiss
                                                    Notice of MOTION to dismiss or, in the alternative to require plaintiff to plead with more specificity by defendant RAHN J. FARRIS, Motion hearing set for 9:00 11/21/97 on [7-1] motion . (All Briefs/PO Subm) ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED (ar1) Modified on 11/14/1997
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 8/27/1997, Entered: 8/27/1997 Certification
                                                      AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATION of SERVICE by JOHN P. PERKINS on behalf of COUNTY OF CAMDEN Re: service of summons and complaint (jm1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/27/1997, Entered: 8/27/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                        Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by deft. RAHN J. FARRIS (mgr)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/6/1997, Entered: 8/6/1997 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
                                                          APPLICATION by RAHN J. FARRIS and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 8/26/97 for RAHN J. FARRIS (ar1) Modified on 08/19/1997
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 7/1/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                            NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (et) Modified on 07/01/1997
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/1/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 Summons Issued
                                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for RAHN J. FARRIS ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (et)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 Order
                                                                ORDER, appointing special process server (William T. Walsh) (et)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 224244 (et)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?