PHILIPS, et al v. NATIONAL PIPE HANGER
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-03617-JBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FLOYD R. PHILIPS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Edward C. Logan LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD C. LOGAN +1 609 452 1100 +1 609 452 8245 edloganlaw@yahoo.com
No Logo KIMBERLY PHILIPS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Edward C. Logan LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD C. LOGAN +1 609 452 1100 +1 609 452 8245 edloganlaw@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo NATIONAL PIPE HANGER CORPORATION, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 7/17/1997
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Burlington
Terminated 6/29/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, PRETRL
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998 Terminated Case
Case closed (SETTLED) (lc)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER dismissing action without prejudice and without costs. (signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle) (lc)
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Bill Richards; Minutes of: 6.25.98; The following actions were taken, TRIAL WITH JURY CONTINUED BEFORE THE HONORABLE JEROME B. SIMANDLE. (9:25 A.M.) OUT OF PRESENCE OF JURY: Charge conference continued. Counsel report that a settlement has been reached. Edward Logan, Esq. places settlment on the record and commences voir dire of plaintiff regarding the settlment. Ordered jury discharged. Ordered trial with jury adjourned at 10:15 a.m. By Judge Jerome B. Simandle (lc)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998 Jury Trial Held
        Trial with jury concluded (lc)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998 Jury Trial Held
          Trial with jury continued. (lc)
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Bill Richards; Minutes of: 6.24.98; The following actions were taken, TRIAL WITH JURY CONTINUED BEFORE THE HONORABLE JEROME B. SIMANDLE (9:25 a.m.) David H. Wiley sworn for plaintiff. OUT OF PRESENCE OF JURY: Hearing on application of defendant for a mistrial. Ordered application denied. Oral Opinion rendered. JURY RETURN TO COURTROOM. Direct examination resumes of David H. Wiley. PLAINTIFF RESTS. Michele Miano sworn for defendant. Marc Douglas Stevens sworn for defendant. James Dragone sworn for defendant. William B. McCabe sworn for defendant. DEFENDANT RESTS. Ordered Jury excused at 12:35 p.m. to return on 6.25.98 at 9:15 a.m. OUT OF PRESENCE OF JURY: Charge conference held. Ordered trial with Jury adjourned at 3:30 p.m., to resume at 9:15 a.m. on 6.25.98. By Judge Jerome B. Simandle (lc)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998 Jury Trial Held
              Trial with jury continued. (lc)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 6/23/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Bill Richards; Minutes of: June 23, 1998; The following actions were taken: Trial with jury continued. Hearing on motion in limine. Oral Opinion Read into record. By Judge Jerome B. Simandle (mgr)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/23/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998 Jury Trial Held
                  Trial with jury continued. (mgr)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Bill Richards; Minutes of: June 22, 1998; The following actions were taken: TRIAL WITH JURY MOVED BEFORE HON. JEROME B. SIMANDLE. Hearing on application of deft. in limine. ORAL OPINION READ INTO RECORD. Ordered application denied. By Judge Jerome B. Simandle (mgr)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 Jury Trial Held
                      Trial with jury begun (mgr)
                        LREF
                        Blank 21 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 Proposed Voir Dire
                        PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS FOR THE JURY AND PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. (lc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 20 Filed: 6/12/1998, Entered: 6/15/1998 Trial Brief
                          TRIAL BRIEFS by defendant, NATIONAL PIPE HANGER (lc)
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [14-1] motion for an order admitting Lee D. Rockafellow, Esq. to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/11/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 6.9.98; The following actions were taken, granting [14-1] motion for an order admitting Lee D. Rockafellow, Esq. to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs. Terminating [14-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 7/2/98 on [14-1] motion. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen. (lc)
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998 Certificate Of Service.
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: [14-1] Notice of motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Counsel. (lc)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998 Certification
                                  CERTIFICATION of Edward C. Logan Re: [14-1] motion for an order admitting Lee D. Rockafellow, Esq. to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs. (lc)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998 Certification
                                    CERTIFICATION of Lee D. Rockafellow Re: [14-1] motion for an order admitting Lee D. Rockafellow, Esq. to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs. (lc)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998, Terminated: 6/9/1998 Motion for Limited AdmissionCourt Filing
                                      Notice of MOTION for an order admitting Lee D. Rockafellow, Esq. to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs. by FLOYD R. PHILIPS [14-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 7/2/98 on [14-1] motion (lc)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 5.20.98; The following actions were taken, TRIAL LOGISTICS CONFERENCE. TRIAL LOGISTIC CONFERENCE HELD. VIA TELEPHONE. By Judge Jerome B. Simandle. (lc)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 Jury Instructions
                                          REQUEST TO CHARGE by defendant, National Pipe Hanger Corp.(disk given to J. Simandle) (lc)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 Proposed Voir Dire
                                            VOIR DIRE questions to the Jury by defendant, NATIONAL PIPE HANGER CORP. (lc)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/29/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                              Deadline updated; reset scheduling order deadlines: Trial with jury 5/4/98 ; (mgr)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: April 24, 1998; The following actions were taken: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Trial adjourned to May 4, 1998. By Judge Jerome B. Simandle (mgr)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                  JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER filed ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                    Final Pre-trial conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 2.24.98. (lc)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/20/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      CONSENT ORDER dismissing any and all punitive damage claims, more specifically, those asserted in Count One of the Complaint. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (lc)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 12/19/1997, Entered: 12/22/1997 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Final Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 2:00 2/24/98; Trial with jury 3/16/98; (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (lc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 12/22/1997 Settlement Conference
                                                          Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 12.18.97. (lc)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/29/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 1; setting Discovery cutoff 1/30/98; Settlement conference 10:00 12/18/97; (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (lc)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997 Scheduling Conference
                                                              Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 9.24.97. (lc)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/PROOF OF MAILING re: [3-1] Answer (lc)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER, set scheduling conference for 11:00 9/24/97 (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (lc)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Answer
                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL PIPE HANGER with jury demand. (lc)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                      NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (et)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997 Complaint
                                                                        COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 225341 (et)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997 Summons Issued
                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) issued for NATIONAL PIPE HANGER ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (et)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?